Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2289505

EP2289505 - Nutritional composition and food supplement containing such a nutritional composition. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alpiflor S.R.L.
Via Donatori Di Sangue
12026 Piasco (CN) / IT
[2011/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Scatolero, Daniele
c/o ALPIFLOR S.R.L.
Via Donatori Di Sangue
12026 Piasco (CN) / IT
 [2012/40]
Former [2011/09]01 / Scatolero, Daniele
c/o ALPIFLOR S.R.L. VIA DONATORI DI SANGUE
12026, PIASCO (CN) / IT
Representative(s)Robba, Pierpaolo
Interpatent S.R.L.
Via Caboto, 35
10129 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]Robba, Pierpaolo
Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto 35
10129 Torino / IT
Former [2011/09]Robba, Pierpaolo
Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto 35
10129 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date10171504.330.07.2010
[2011/09]
Priority number, dateIT2009CN0000826.08.2009         Original published format: IT CN20090008
[2011/09]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2289505
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2289505
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/19, A61K31/70, A61K31/7016, A61K31/702, A61K31/715, A23L1/30, A61P1/14
[2011/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/09]
TitleGerman:Nährstoffzusammensetzung und die Nährstoffzusammensetzung enthaltender Lebensmittelzusatz[2016/19]
English:Nutritional composition and food supplement containing such a nutritional composition.[2011/09]
French:Composition nutritionnelle et complément alimentaire contenant ladite composition nutritionnelle[2011/09]
Former [2011/09]Nährstoffzusammensetzung und die Nährungstoffzusammensetzung enthaltender Lebensmittelzusatz
Examination procedure02.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/41]
09.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2012Fee for grant paid
11.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.08.2016Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.11.2013  13.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
 [2019/30]
Former [2014/02]
Opponent(s)01  29.11.2013   
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
20.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.02.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition06.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0816/16
31.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2010
AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MK06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
SM06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
IE30.07.2013
LU30.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MK06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
SM06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
IE30.07.2013
Former [2015/30]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
SM06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
IE30.07.2013
Former [2015/24]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
SM06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
IE30.07.2013
Former [2014/33]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
IE30.07.2013
Former [2014/14]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
Former [2014/09]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
Former [2013/50]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
Former [2013/44]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
Former [2013/41]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
Former [2013/38]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
Former [2013/37]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
Former [2013/36]AT06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT06.03.2013
NO06.06.2013
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2004026316  (DANISCO [DK], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 18, paragraph 1 * * claim 1 * * page 11, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]JP2007131541  (KAO CORP) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0006] , [0013] *;
 [A]DE10244359  (NUTRINOVA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0006] *
 [Y]  - STROWSKI M Z ET AL, "Probiotic carbohydrates reduce intestinal permeability and inflammation in metabolic diseases", GUT 2009 BMJ PUBLISHING GROUP GBR, (200908), vol. 58, no. 8, pages 1044 - 1045, XP008119617 [Y] 1-15 * page 1044, column 3 *
 [Y]  - NILSSON ULF ET AL, "Bifidobacterium lactis Bb-12 and Lactobacillus salivarius UCC500 modify carboxylic acid formation in the hindgut of rats given pectin, inulin, and lactitol", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (200608), vol. 136, no. 8, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 2175 - 2180, XP008119610 [Y] 1-15 * page 2175, column 1 - page 2176, column 1, paragraph 2 *
 [Y]  - FRANCESCHI FRANCESCO ET AL, "Role of probiotics in patients with Helicobacter pylori infection", HELICOBACTER, (200711), vol. 12, no. Suppl. 2, ISSN 1083-4389, pages 59 - 63, XP002571863 [Y] 1-15 * page 59, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1523-5378.2007.00565.x
 [Y]  - WILLIAMS L ET AL, "Dietary fiber and other alternative therapies and irritable bowel syndrome", TOPICS IN CLINICAL NUTRITION 2009 LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS AND WILKINS USA, (200907), vol. 24, no. 3, ISSN 0883-5691, pages 262 - 271, XP002571864 [Y] 1-15 * page 267, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 269, column 2, paragraph 3 * * table 1 *
by applicantWO2004026316
otherWO0064277
 US6426099
 WO2005074718
 WO2010066397
    - ASSISI, R.F et al., "Combined butyric acid/mesalazine treatment in ulcerative colitis with mild-moderate activity", Minerva Gastroenterol Dietol, (20080900), vol. 54, no. 3, pages 231 - 238, XP055298479
    - Cortex Italia, "Actibutir plus", List of Products, (20080627), page 20, URL: http://pwp.alliance-healthcare.it/pdf/lp_lug08.pdf, XP055298485
    - Cortex Italia, "Actibutir plus /English translation enclosed/", Farmaprice, (20080000), pages 1 - 3, XP055298530