Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2315227 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2315227



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 284
18.08.2021 Payment submission rejected Search / examination 1
19.08.2020 Payment submission rejected Search / examination 1
20.08.2019 Payment submission rejected Search / examination 1
24.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.06.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 1
19.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.06.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
18.06.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.05.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
09.05.2019 Submission concerning representation Appeal 8
07.05.2019 Submission concerning representation Appeal 8
02.05.2019 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Appeal 1
02.05.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 5
29.03.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.03.2019 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
22.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
22.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
22.02.2019 Claims Appeal 2
22.02.2019 General authorisation Appeal 1
22.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
22.02.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
04.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.01.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.01.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 14
15.01.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.01.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
10.01.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.09.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.05.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.02.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
17.02.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
16.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
16.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
16.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
16.01.2014 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
16.01.2014 Claims Appeal 2
16.01.2014 Claims Appeal 2
16.01.2014 Claims Appeal 2
16.01.2014 Description Appeal 1
16.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.01.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
16.01.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
15.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
15.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
15.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
15.01.2014 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
15.01.2014 Claims Appeal 2
15.01.2014 Claims Appeal 2
15.01.2014 Claims Appeal 2
15.01.2014 Description Appeal 1
15.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.01.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
11.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.11.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.09.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
06.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.09.2013 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
06.09.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
06.09.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
29.08.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.08.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.08.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
05.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.07.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
01.07.2013 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
05.12.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.12.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.11.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.07.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
06.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.07.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.03.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.03.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.10.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
31.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
31.10.2011 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
25.10.2011 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
02.05.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.03.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Declaration that a search is not possible Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 1
20.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.01.2011 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 2
12.11.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Invitation to indicate the subject-matter to be searched Search / examination 2
11.10.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
04.10.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
02.08.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
02.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
02.08.2010 Description Search / examination 22
02.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Drawings Search / examination 4
02.08.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5