Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2283960 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2283960



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 482
31.03.2020 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
30.03.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.03.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.03.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.03.2020 Communication about missing proof of delivery Appeal 1
13.02.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.02.2020 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
03.02.2020 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.02.2020 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.01.2020 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
31.01.2020 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
31.01.2020 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
03.01.2020 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
03.01.2020 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.01.2020 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
03.01.2020 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
03.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.12.2019 Authorisation Appeal 1
18.12.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.12.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
13.12.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 3
30.10.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.10.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
24.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
24.10.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
21.10.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.10.2019 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
16.10.2019 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.10.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
13.11.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.07.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
19.04.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.04.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
07.03.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
23.02.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.02.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.02.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
11.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
21.12.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
21.12.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
21.12.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
02.11.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
02.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
11.03.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
11.03.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.07.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.07.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
27.02.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.02.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
12.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
12.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
12.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
06.02.2015 Request for documents Opposition 1
28.01.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
23.04.2014 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
02.04.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.03.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
17.03.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
17.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.01.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
10.01.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.01.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.01.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
22.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
22.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.01.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.01.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.08.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
12.08.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.08.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
12.08.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
12.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.08.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.02.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.01.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 4
20.12.2010 European search report Search / examination 3
15.10.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
05.10.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
05.10.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
04.08.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.08.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
04.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
04.08.2010 Description Search / examination 24
04.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2010 Drawings Search / examination 9
04.08.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4