blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2372968

EP2372968 - Method for authorizing mobile communication apparatus by femtocell base station and femtocell base station [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2014
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.05.2014  [2014/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Askey Computer Corp.
10F., No. 119, Chienkang Road
Chung-Ho, Taipei 23585 / TW
[2011/51]
Former [2011/40]For all designated states
Askey Computer Corp.
10F, No. 119 Chienkang Rd. Chung-Ho
T'ai pei 23585 / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Hsieh, Ching-Feng
2F., No.8, Alley 1, Lane 92, Guangjhou St.
Wanhua District
Taipei City 108, Taiwan / TW
02 / Wu, Wei-Lin
Room 202, No.31 Lane 465, Sixian Rd.,
Songjiang District
Shanghai / CN
 [2011/40]
Representative(s)Perani, Aurelio, et al
Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
[2011/40]
Application number, filing date10171934.204.08.2010
[2011/40]
Priority number, dateTW1991001006001.04.2010         Original published format: TW 099110060
[2011/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2372968
Date:05.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2372968
Date:21.12.2011
[2011/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2011
ClassificationIPC:H04L29/06, H04W12/08, H04L29/12
[2011/40]
CPC:
H04L63/101 (EP,KR,US); H04W12/06 (KR); H04W12/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/20 (EP,KR,US); H04W84/045 (EP,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Autorisierung einer mobilen Kommunikationsvorrichtung durch eine Femtozellenbasisstation, und Femtozellenbasisstation[2011/40]
English:Method for authorizing mobile communication apparatus by femtocell base station and femtocell base station[2011/40]
French:Procédé d'autorisation d'un appareil de communication mobile par une station de base à femtocellules, et station de base à femtocellules[2011/40]
Examination procedure04.08.2010Examination requested  [2011/40]
04.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/22]
21.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.08.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201304   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); UTRAN architecture for 3G Home Node B (HNB); Stage 2 (3GPP TS 25.467 version 8.4.0 Release 8)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20100101), no. V8.4.0, XP014045481 [X] 12-14 * page 11 - page 12; figures 5.1.2-1 . * [I] 1-11
 [A]  - 3GPP, "3GPP TR 33.820 V8.3.0; Technical Specification Group Service and System Aspects;Security of H(e)NB;(Release 8)", 3rd Generation Partnership Project, (20091201), pages 1 - 99, URL: http://www.quintillion.co.jp/3GPP/Specs/33820-830.pdf, XP002650893 [A] 1-14 * page 23, paragraph point 18 * * paragraph [06.9] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.