Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2247107

EP2247107 - Distributed TV access system. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.11.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2014  [2014/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Digital Keystone, Inc.
1975 El Camino Real, Suite 306
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
[2010/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Vantalon, Luc
868 Helena Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / Siccardo, Paolo
22261 Ainsworth Drive
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
 [2010/44]
Representative(s)Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[2012/49]
Former [2010/44]Texier, Christian , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date10172137.110.12.2008
[2010/44]
Priority number, dateUS20070018130P31.12.2007         Original published format: US 18130 P
US20070018134P31.12.2007         Original published format: US 18134 P
US20070018124P31.12.2007         Original published format: US 18124 P
[2010/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2247107
Date:03.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173
[2010/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/44]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verteiltes TV-Zugriffssystem[2010/44]
English:Distributed TV access system.[2010/44]
French:Système d'accès à la TV distribuée[2010/44]
Examination procedure06.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/44]
16.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/50]
30.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/50]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08869558.0  / EP2238754
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080869558) is  16.03.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
30.05.2011Request for further processing filed
30.05.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.06.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
16.05.2011Request for further processing filed
16.05.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.06.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6463585  (HENDRICKS JOHN S [US] ET AL) [X] 1-17 * figures 1,2,8 * * column 3, line 30 - line 39 * * column 9, line 48 - line 58 * * column 11, line 30 - line 32 * * column 21, line 66 - column 22, line 4 * * column 4, line 12 - line 17 * * column 4, line 25 - line 42 * * abstract *;
 [A]US2003139980  (HAMILTON ROBERT DOUGLAS [CA]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] * * paragraph [0067] * * figures 4,6,8a,8b * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0069] *;
 [A]US2007214480  (KAMEN YAKOV [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] *;
 [A]US2005172317  (JEONG JEE-WON [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] * * figures 3,5a,5b *;
 [A]WO0165862  (TIVO INC [US]; BARTON JAMES M [US]; PLATT DAVID C [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 1, lines 6-10 * * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 3 *
by applicantUS20060446427
 US20070823194