Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2244394

EP2244394 - Method and apparatus for maximizing the use of available capacity in a communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.09.2015
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 29.11.2017  [2017/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2010/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Tiedemann, Edward G., Jr.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / Lundby, Stein, A.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2014/46]
Former [2010/43]01 / Tiedemann, Edward G., Jr.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / Lundby, Stein, A.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2010/43]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date10172546.306.03.2000
[2010/43]
Priority number, dateUS1999026443508.03.1999         Original published format: US 264435
[2010/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2244394
Date:27.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2244394
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26, H04L1/08
[2010/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2010/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Maximierung der Verwendung der vorhandenen Kapazität in einem Kommunikationssystem[2010/43]
English:Method and apparatus for maximizing the use of available capacity in a communication system[2010/43]
French:Procédé et appareil pour maximiser l'utilisation de la capacité disponible dans un système de communication[2010/43]
Examination procedure26.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/23]
11.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2014Fee for grant paid
29.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00917754.4  / EP1159792
EP03023329.0  / EP1394967
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000917754) is  27.05.2003
Opposition(s)13.08.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
11.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
11.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
11.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
11.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
11.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.11.2014
BE12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IE06.03.2015
LU06.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
[2017/48]
Former [2016/07]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
IE06.03.2015
LU06.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
LU06.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
LU06.03.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
MC12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/34]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
DK12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/26]AT12.11.2014
CY12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/25]AT12.11.2014
FI12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/24]FI12.11.2014
SE12.11.2014
GR13.02.2015
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI12.11.2014
PT12.03.2015
Former [2015/22]PT12.03.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO9835514  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-3,15,16 * abstract * * page 7, line 6 - line 35 * * page 11, line 20 - line 36 * * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 27 * * page 18, line 11 - line 17 * * page 22, line 1 - line 6; claim 20 * [I] 17;
 [A]US5581575  (ZEHAVI EPHRAIM [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 26 - line 62 * * column 6, line 9 - line 45 * * column 13, line 59 - column 14, line 13; figures 1,2; claim 1 *
 [A]  - LIU Z ET AL, "CHANNEL ACCESS AND INTERFERENCE IN MULTI-CODE DS-CDMA WIRELESS PACKET (ATM) NETWORKS", WIRELESS NETWORKS,US,ACM, (19960801), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1022-0038, pages 173 - 192, XP000625337 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01201052
 [A]  - SAMPATH A ET AL, "ACCESS CONTROL OF DATA IN INTEGRATED VOICE/DATA CDMA SYSTEMS: BENEFITS AND TRADEOFFS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19971001), vol. 15, no. 8, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 1511 - 1526, XP000721282 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.634790
by applicantUS4901307
 US19970842993
 US19970969319
 US19970798951