Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2296108

EP2296108 - Portable electronic device and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.09.2013
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.10.2013  [2013/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
[2011/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Sekiya, Satoshi
Toshiba Corporation
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
 [2012/46]
Former [2011/11]01 / Sekiya, Satoshi
Toshiba Corporation c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Representative(s)Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2011/11]Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date10172695.813.06.2007
[2011/11]
Priority number, dateJP2006016604615.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006166046
JP2006017669927.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006176699
[2011/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2296108
Date:16.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2296108
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/073, G06F21/24, G06K7/10
[2012/23]
Former International [2011/11]G06K19/073, G06F21/24
Designated contracting statesFR [2011/11]
TitleGerman:Tragbares elektronisches Gerät und Steuerverfahren dafür[2011/11]
English:Portable electronic device and control method thereof[2011/11]
French:Dispositif électronique portable et sa méthode de commande[2011/11]
Examination procedure12.08.2010Examination requested  [2011/11]
12.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2012Fee for grant paid
04.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07745530.1  / EP2033145
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070745530) is  02.03.2010
Opposition(s)15.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2005122071  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 8, line 13 - page 9, line 19 * * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 24 * * page 15, line 10 - line 15 *;
 [A]EP1457915  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM JP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5896325  (FUJIOKA SHUZO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * column 6, line 29 - line 62 *
by applicantJPS60207957
 JPH11282991
 WO0122359