Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2296279

EP2296279 - Clock data recovery with selectable phase control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2011/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Chang, Kun-Yung K.
Rambus Inc.
4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
02 / Wei, Jason C.
Rambus Inc.
4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
03 / Perino, Donald V.
Rambus Inc.
4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
 [2019/33]
Former [2011/11]01 / Chang, Kun-Yung K.
Rambus Inc. 4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
02 / Wei, Jason C.
Rambus Inc. 4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
03 / Perino, Donald V.
Rambus Inc. 4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[2019/33]
Former [2011/11]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date10172886.323.08.2002
[2011/11]
Priority number, dateUS2001094107928.08.2001         Original published format: US 941079
[2011/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2296279
Date:16.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2296279
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2296279
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H03L7/085, H04L7/02, H03L7/07, H03L7/08, H03L7/081, H03L7/089, H03L7/091, H04L7/00, H04L7/033, H04L7/10
[2014/33]
Former International [2011/11]H03L7/085, H04L7/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2019/33]
Former [2011/11]DE,  FR,  GB 
TitleGerman:Taktrückgewinnungsschaltung mit wählbarer Phasenregelung[2011/11]
English:Clock data recovery with selectable phase control[2011/11]
French:Recupération de données d'horloge au moyen d'une commande de phase sélectionable[2011/11]
Examination procedure24.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/13]
21.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2019Fee for grant paid
08.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02757315.3  / EP1423918
EP08157859.3  / EP1962426
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020757315) is  02.12.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP0980163  (NEC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-4,9-11 * figure 1 * [Y] 5-8,12-15;
 [I]US6075416  (DALMIA KAMAL [US]) [I] 1-4,9-11 * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US6188286  (HOGL ERIK [US], et al) [Y] 5-8,12-15 * figure 3 *;
 [I]  - SAVOJ B RAZAVI J, Clock and data recovery architectures, HIGH-SPEED CMOS CIRCUITS FOR OPTICAL RECEIVERS, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 21 - 93, (20010101), XP002306705 [I] 1,9 * page 32 - page 34; figure 3.35. *