blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2287001

EP2287001 - Droplet ejecting head, droplet ejecting apparatus, piezoelectric device, and ceramic [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2011/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Yonemura, Takayuki
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi
Nagano 392-8502 / JP
 [2012/13]
Former [2011/08]01 / Yonemura, Takayuki
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi
Nagano 392-8502 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/13]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2011/08]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10173040.617.08.2010
[2011/08]
Priority number, dateJP2009018982719.08.2009         Original published format: JP 2009189827
JP2010005488511.03.2010         Original published format: JP 2010054885
[2011/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2287001
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2287001
Date:28.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2010
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/14, H01L41/187
[2011/08]
CPC:
B41J2/14233 (EP,US); B41J2/1433 (US); C04B35/453 (US);
H10N30/8561 (EP,US); B41J2202/03 (EP,US); H10N30/078 (EP,US);
H10N30/2047 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/08]
TitleGerman:Tropfenausgabekopf, Tropfenausgabevorrichtung, piezoelektrische Vorrichtung und Keramik[2011/08]
English:Droplet ejecting head, droplet ejecting apparatus, piezoelectric device, and ceramic[2011/08]
French:Tête d'éjection de gouttelettes, appareil d'éjection de gouttelettes, dispositif piézoélectrique et céramique[2011/08]
Examination procedure18.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/40]
27.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2012Fee for grant paid
08.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2011
Opposition(s)03.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.08.2010
AL28.03.2012
AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
MK28.03.2012
MT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
SM28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE17.08.2012
LU17.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
[2015/32]
Former [2014/34]HU17.08.2010
AL28.03.2012
AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
MT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
SM28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE17.08.2012
LU17.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2014/27]AL28.03.2012
AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
MT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
SM28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE17.08.2012
LU17.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2014/21]AL28.03.2012
AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
MT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE17.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/51]AL28.03.2012
AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
MT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE17.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/40]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE17.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/33]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE17.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/22]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/16]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/11]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2013/01]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2012/50]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
Former [2012/49]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
Former [2012/48]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/46]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/39]FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/36]HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1990326  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0054] - [0056] - [0063] , [0069] , [0083] *;
 [A]US2009085445  (KOBAYASHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* paragraphs [0014] , [0027] , [0028] , [0035] *
by applicantJP2001223404
 JP2008069051
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.