Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2290236

EP2290236 - Method and system for extracting inertial energy from a wind turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Opposition withdrawnpublished on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2011/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Scholte-Wassink, Hartmut
Im Wiesengrund 9
49828, Lage / DE
 [2013/42]
Former [2011/09]01 / Scholte-Wassink, Hartmut
Im Wiesengrund 9
49828, Lage / DE
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Zimmermann & Partner
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Former [2013/42]Bedford, Grant Richard
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Former [2011/09]Bedford, Grant Richard
Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date10173289.918.08.2010
[2011/09]
Priority number, dateUS2009055012328.08.2009         Original published format: US 550123
[2011/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2290236
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2290236
Date:16.03.2011
[2011/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2290236
Date:16.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:F03D11/00, F03D7/02, F03D9/02
[2011/11]
Former International [2011/09]F03D11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/09]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Aufnahme von Trägheitsenergie aus einer Windturbine[2011/09]
English:Method and system for extracting inertial energy from a wind turbine[2011/09]
French:Procédé et système pour l'extraction de l'énergie inertielle d'une éolienne[2011/09]
Examination procedure14.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/43]
11.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2013Fee for grant paid
06.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.01.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 02  11.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
 03  15.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
 04  16.07.2014  19.08.2014  WITHDRAWN
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
 [2019/52]
Former [2016/47]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 02  11.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
 03  15.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB
von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
 04  16.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2016/26]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 02  11.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
 03  15.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
SENVION SE
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB
von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
 04  16.07.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2014/35]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2014   
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  11.07.2014   
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  15.07.2014   
SENVION SE
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
 04  16.07.2014   
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2014/34]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2014   
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  11.07.2014   
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  15.07.2014   
SENVION SE
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
26.08.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.02.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition04.05.2017Appeal received No.  T0761/17
07.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
27.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0761/17
06.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
28.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0761/17
22.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
08.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.08.2010
AL16.10.2013
AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MK16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
SM16.10.2013
TR16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
GB18.08.2014
IE18.08.2014
LU18.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU18.08.2010
AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MK16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
SM16.10.2013
TR16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
GB18.08.2014
IE18.08.2014
LU18.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2016/33]HU18.08.2010
AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
SM16.10.2013
TR16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
GB18.08.2014
IE18.08.2014
LU18.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2016/32]HU18.08.2010
AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
SM16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
GB18.08.2014
IE18.08.2014
LU18.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2016/28]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
MT16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
SM16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
GR17.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
GB18.08.2014
IE18.08.2014
LU18.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2016/22]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
SM16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
GB18.08.2014
IE18.08.2014
LU18.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2015/38]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
GB18.08.2014
IE18.08.2014
LU18.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
GB18.08.2014
IE18.08.2014
LU18.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/36]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
GB18.08.2014
LU18.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/20]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
LU18.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/19]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
LU18.08.2014
Former [2015/18]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
MC16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
Former [2015/14]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
Former [2014/38]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
IT16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
Former [2014/37]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
PL16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
Former [2014/36]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
Former [2014/28]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
PT17.02.2014
Former [2014/26]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/25]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
LV16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/24]AT16.10.2013
BE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/23]BE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
HR16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
IS16.02.2014
Former [2014/22]FI16.10.2013
LT16.10.2013
NL16.10.2013
SE16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
Former [2014/20]LT16.10.2013
NO16.01.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007085343  (FORTMANN JENS [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0019] , [0050] - [0055] - [0066] - [0068] - [0075] , [0092] , [0094] - [0096] - [0098]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4426192  (CHERTOK ALLAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1,4,7,8 * column 3, line 48 - line 64 *;
 [X]WO2008131775  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]; ANDERSEN BRIAN W [DK]; MIRANDA ERIK CARL [DK]) [X] 1-9 * page 3, line 1 - line 5 * * page 4, line 4 - line 12 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 12; figures 3a,3b *;
 [A]EP1990539  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 2,3,5,8,9 * paragraphs [0007] , [0024] , [0030] , [0032] - [0034] *;
 [A]US4525633  (WERTHEIM MAX M [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 32 - line 50 * * column 3, line 4 - line 10 *;
 [A]DE102007008761  (SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] *;
 [A]EP2075890  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] *