Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2420410

EP2420410 - Method for presenting an image in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2018  [2018/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH
Becker-Göring-Strasse 16
76307 Karlsbad / DE
[2012/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Mauderer, Hans-Peter
Oberer Holzbrunnenweg 9
76571, Gaggenau / DE
02 / Huebner, Klaus
Mädachäckerweg 22
75181, Pforzheim / DE
 [2012/08]
Representative(s)Bertsch, Florian Oliver
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Bertsch, Florian Oliver
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date10173373.119.08.2010
[2012/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2420410
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/00
[2012/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Darstellung eines Bildes in einem Fahrzeug[2012/08]
English:Method for presenting an image in a vehicle[2012/11]
French:Procédé de présentation d'une image d'un véhicule[2012/08]
Examination procedure06.04.2011Examination requested  [2012/08]
09.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/31]
27.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
23.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE202008012289U  (TECH CAST MFG CORP [TW]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10-12,14,19 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015]; figure - * [I] 3,6-9,13,15-18;
 [XAI]DE10234824  (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE] WEBASTO AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,10,11,19 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020]; figure -; claims 1-3 * [A] 9,15,18 [I] 2-4,6-8,12-14,16,17;
 [I]WO2005039926  (GOMEZ MONZON JOAQUIN FERMIN [ES]) [I] 1,2,5,7-12,16-19 * page 1, line 4 - line 17; claim - * * figure - *