Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2420552

EP2420552 - Use of phenothiazine derivatives in lubricating oil compositions in EGR equipped diesel engines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/08]EGR Equipped Diesel Engines and Lubricating Oil Compositions
[2017/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineum International Limited
P.O. Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon
Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
[2012/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Hartley, Joseph Peter
Infineum UK Ltd
PO Box 1 Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
 [2012/08]
Representative(s)Lewis, Pauline Therese
Milton Hill Business and Technology Centre
PO Box 1
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
[2017/51]
Former [2012/08]Lewis, Pauline Therese
Milton Hill Business and Technology Centre, PO Box 1
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
Application number, filing date10173450.719.08.2010
[2012/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2420552
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2420552
Date:20.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:C10M135/36, // C10N30/04, C10N30/10, C10N40/25
[2012/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Phenothiazinederivaten in Schmierölzusammensetzungen in EGR-Dieselmotoren[2017/32]
English:Use of phenothiazine derivatives in lubricating oil compositions in EGR equipped diesel engines[2017/32]
French:Utilisation de dérivés de phenothiazine dans des compositions d'huile lubrifiante dans des moteurs diesel équipés d'EGR[2017/32]
Former [2012/08]EGR-Dieselmotoren und Schmierölzusammensetzungen
Former [2012/08]EGR Equipped Diesel Engines and Lubricating Oil Compositions
Former [2012/08]Moteurs diesel équipés d'EGR et compositions d'huile lubrifiante
Examination procedure14.07.2011Examination requested  [2012/08]
02.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
16.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2017Fee for grant paid
08.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2017
Opposition(s)21.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
16.11.2012Request for further processing filed
16.11.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.12.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SI20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
IE19.08.2018
LU19.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
[2019/33]
Former [2019/21]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SI20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
LU19.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SI20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2019/13]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SI20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/24]FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/21]FI20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
NO20.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2781318  (CYPHERS ELMER B) [X] 15 * the whole document * [I] 1-15;
 [Y]US3218256  (DESCAMP EDWARDS ERIC, et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5731273  (FIELD IAN PETER [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * col. 1, lines 7-18,64-67; col. 2, lines 1-4,54-59 ; col. 4, line 25 to col. 5, line 34;.;; example 1; claims 1,4,5,13,16,17,22 *;
 [Y]US3518194  (MCGRATH JOSEPH J, et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, lines 15-17; page 16, lines 9-22; page 29, .lines 2-5;;; claims 20,24,27,28,32,33,35-37,39 *;
 [Y]GB2449363  (AFTON CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * col. 2, lines 34-43,50-72; *
ExaminationUS2007006855
by applicantEP1741772
 US3632511
 US3442808
 US3087936
 US3254025
 US4839071
 US4839072
 US4579675
 US3185704
 US4663064
 US4612132
 US5334321
 US5356552
 US5716912
 US5849676
 US5861363
 US5328622
 US5026495
 US5085788
 US5259906
 US5407591
 US4686054
 US4867890