Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2261917

EP2261917 - Information storage medium, information playback method and apparatus and information recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2016  [2016/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
[2010/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Ando, Hideo
890-1-205, Arai Hino-shi
Tokyo 191-0022 / JP
02 / Yoshioka, You
C/O Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
 [2011/25]
Former [2011/12]01 / Ando, Hideo
890-1-205, Arai Hino-shi
Tokyo 191-0022 / JP
02 / Yoshioka, You
C/O Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chrome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Former [2011/07]01 / Ando, Hideo
890-1-205, Arai Hino-shi
Tokyo 191-0022 / JP
02 / Yoshioka, You
606, Pureseransu-Tsurumi 1-12, Mukaicho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa-ken 230-0037 / JP
Former [2010/50]01 / Ando, Hideo
890-1-205, Arai Hino-shi
Tokyo 191-0022 / JP
02 / Yoshioka, You
606, Pureseransu-Tsurumi 1-12, Mukaicho, Tsurumi-
Kanagawa-ken 230-0037 / JP
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/50]Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel
Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date10173629.623.02.1999
[2010/50]
Priority number, dateJP1998004087623.02.1998         Original published format: JP 4087698
JP1998004087723.02.1998         Original published format: JP 4087798
JP1998004087923.02.1998         Original published format: JP 4087998
[2010/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2261917
Date:15.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2261917
Date:09.03.2011
[2011/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/10, G11B27/034, G11B27/32
[2011/10]
Former International [2010/50]G11B27/10, G11B27/034, G11B27/30, G11B27/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2010/50]
TitleGerman:Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, Informationswiedergabeverfahren und -vorrichtung, und Informationsaufzeichnungsverfahren[2010/50]
English:Information storage medium, information playback method and apparatus and information recording method[2010/50]
French:Support d'enregistrement d'informations, procédé et appareil de reproduction d'informations, procédé d'enregistrement d'informations[2010/50]
Examination procedure20.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/50]
09.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/06]
29.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/06]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99905279.8  / EP1065665
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990905279) is  29.02.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201517   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0737975  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 16; figure 12 *;
 [X]EP0752705  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 8, line 17 - column 9, line 23 *;
 [X]EP0795872  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * figure 10 *;
 [X]EP0797204  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 12, line 22 - page 13, line 16 *;
 [A]  DEVELOPER PRESS ET AL, "QUICKTIME FILE FORMAT SPECIFICATION", INTERNET CITATION, (199605), XP007901171 [A] 1-5 * page 56 *