EP2285152 - GENERATING ENTRIES FOR A DATABASE SUPPORTING A POSITIONING OF A MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/07] | Generating entries for a database supporting a positioning of a mobile terminal | ||
[2016/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Syrjärinne, Paula Yliopistonkatu 45 K 115 33500, Tampere / FI | [2017/04] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
Syrjärinne, Paula Yliopistonkatu 45 K 115 33500, Tampere / FI | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2017/04] |
Former [2011/07] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10173955.5 | 01.12.2003 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | US20020309746 | 03.12.2002 Original published format: US 309746 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285152 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285152 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
G01S19/06 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
G01S2205/008 (EP,US);
H04W64/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | H04W16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2011/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON EINTRÄGEN FÜR EINE EINE ORTSBESTIMMUNG FÜR EIN MOBILES GERÄT UNTERSTÜTZENDE DATENBANK | [2017/04] | English: | GENERATING ENTRIES FOR A DATABASE SUPPORTING A POSITIONING OF A MOBILE TERMINAL | [2016/35] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'ENTRÉES POUR UNE BASE DE DONNÉES PRENANT EN CHARGE LE POSITIONNEMENT D'UN TERMINAL MOBILE | [2016/35] |
Former [2011/07] | Erzeugung von Einträgen für eine Datenbank mit Ortsbestimmung für Mobile Geräte | ||
Former [2011/07] | Generating entries for a database supporting a positioning of a mobile terminal | ||
Former [2011/07] | Génération d'entrées pour une base de données prenant en charge le positionnement d'un terminal mobile | Examination procedure | 25.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 03.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03775670.7 / EP1567950 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030775670) is 14.09.2005 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2003 | AT | 25.01.2017 | CY | 25.01.2017 | CZ | 25.01.2017 | DK | 25.01.2017 | EE | 25.01.2017 | ES | 25.01.2017 | FI | 25.01.2017 | IT | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | NL | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | SE | 25.01.2017 | SI | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | TR | 25.01.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | GR | 26.04.2017 | PT | 25.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.12.2003 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.12.2003 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9625830 (EUROPOLITAN AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 2, line 12 - page 4, line 23 *; | [I]WO0118765 (KUEHL DETLEF [DE]) [I] 1-16 * page 3, line 1 - page 8, line 10; figure 2 *; | [A]US6219544 (SUUTARINEN JARI [FI]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1204290 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0020] , [0023]; figures 2,4 *; | [XI]WO02071781 (CELLULAR DESIGN SERVICES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,13,16 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 13; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-12,14,15; | [E]WO2004004397 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [E] 1-16* page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 31; figures 3-8 * | Examination | US2001041554 | US2002080063 | EP1237009 | by applicant | EP1237009 |