Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2264047

EP2264047 - High purity lipopeptides, lipopeptide micelles and processes for preparing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.05.2015
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2017New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC
Weystrasse 20
6000 Lucerne 6 / CH
[2016/51]
Former [2016/02]For all designated states
Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US
Former [2015/41]For all designated states
Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC
65 Hayden Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
Former [2015/26]For all designated states
Cubist Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
65 Hayden Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
Former [2010/51]For all designated states
Cubist Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
65 Hayden Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kelleher, Thomas J.
57 Shell Caste Club
Palmas del Mar, Humacao
00791, Puerto Rico / PR
02 / Lai, Jan-Ji
5 Roy Street
Westborough, MA 01581 / US
03 / Decourcey, Joseph P.
757 Main Street 55
South Portland, ME 04106 / US
04 / Zenoni, Maurizio
Via Fleming 7
20067, Paullo, Milan / IT
05 / Tagliani, Auro R.
Via Marangoni 1
27100, Pavia / IT
 [2015/26]
Former [2010/51]01 / Kelleher, Thomas J.
57 Shell Caste Club Palmas del Mar, Humacao
00791, Puerto Rico / PR
02 / LAI, Jan-Ji
5 Roy Street
Westborough, MA 01581 / US
03 / Decourcey, Joseph P.
757 Main Street 55
South Portland, ME 04106 / US
04 / Zenoni, Maurizio
Via Fleming 7
20067, Paullo, Milan / IT
05 / Tagliani, Auro R.
Via Marangoni 1
27100, Pavia / IT
Representative(s)Oates, Edward Christopher , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2015/26]
Former [2012/49]Cockerton, Bruce Roger , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2010/51]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date10174862.218.01.2001
[2010/51]
Priority number, dateUS20000177170P20.01.2000         Original published format: US 177170 P
US2000073519128.11.2000         Original published format: US 735191
[2010/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2264047
Date:22.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2264047
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/08, C07K5/097, A61K38/10, A61P31/04
[2010/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2010/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Hochreine Lipopeptide, Lipopeptid Mizellen, und deren Herstellung[2010/51]
English:High purity lipopeptides, lipopeptide micelles and processes for preparing same[2010/51]
French:Lipopeptides à haute pureté, micelles de lipopeptides et procédés de préparation[2010/51]
Examination procedure22.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/31]
21.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
21.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2013Observations by third parties
30.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.05.2015
13.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2015Fee for grant paid
13.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
19.05.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01903121.0  / EP1252179
EP05015374.1  / EP1586580
EP09014616.8  / EP2159229
Divisional application(s)EP15173312.8  / EP2940034
EP15173324.3  / EP2940036
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010903121) is  09.12.2002
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.03.2016  08.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Hospira UK Limited
Horizon Honey Lane
Hurley
Maidenhead
Surrey SL6 6RJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Vickers, Edward John Ross
Taylor Wessing LLP
5 New Street Square
London EC4A 3TW / GB
 [2016/20]
29.04.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.11.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.06.2014Request for further processing filed
17.06.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.06.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
21.02.2013Request for further processing filed
21.02.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.03.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
01.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
01.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
01.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
01.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
01.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201313   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[YD]US5912226  (BAKER PATRICK J [US], et al) [YD] 1-24 * examples 3-5 *;
 [YD]EP0095295  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [YD] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0178152  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0337731  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [YD]EP0294990  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [YD] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0629636  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-24 * claim - *;
 [Y]US4331594  (HAMILL ROBERT L, et al) [Y] 1-24 * examples 4,5 *;
 [Y]US4874843  (BAKER PATRICK J [US]) [Y] 1-24 * claim - *
 [Y]  - DEBONO M ET AL, "Enzymatic and chemical modifications of lipopeptide antibiotic A21978C: the synthesis and evaluation of daptomycin (LY146032)", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION. TOKYO, JP, (1988), vol. 41, no. 8, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 1093 - 1105, XP002171833 [Y] 1-24 * figure 2; table 4 *
 [Y]  - LIN S-C ET AL, "General approach for the development of high-performance liquid chromatography methods for biosurfactant analysis and purification", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, (19981106), vol. 825, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 149 - 159, XP004144788 [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(98)00709-2
 [Y]  - LIN E.A., "Recovery and purification of the lipopeptide biosurfactant of Bacillus subtilis by ultrafiltration", BIOTECHNOLOGY TECHNIQUES, (199706), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 413 - 416, XP001035187 [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018468723132
 [YD]  - TALLY F P ET AL, "DAPTOMYCIN: A NOVEL AGENT FOR GRAM-POSITIVE INFECTIONS", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS,GB,ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, (199908), vol. 8, no. 8, ISSN 1354-3784, pages 1223 - 1228, XP000891801 [YD] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.8.8.1223
 [Y]  - THIMON E.A., "Surface-active properties of antifungal lipopeptides produced by Bacillus subtilis", JAOCS, (1992), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 92 - 93, XP002181598 [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02635884
Examination   - DEBONO M ET AL, "A21978C, a complex of new acidic peptide antibiotics: isolation, chemistry, and mass spectral structure elucidation", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JP, (19870601), vol. 40, no. 6, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 761 - 777, XP008081673
by applicantUSRE32333E
 USRE32455E
 US4800157
 US4885243
 USRE32310E
 USRE32311E
 US4537717
 US4482487
 US4524135
 US4874843
 US5912226
 US5629288
 US5202309
 WO0008197
 US5756680
 US4865729
 US4840730
 US4708782
 US4452775
 US5239660
 US3854480
 US5041567
 WO9505384
    - TAILY ET AL., EXP. OPIN. INVEST. DRUGS, (1999), vol. 8, pages 1223 - 1238,
    - BALTZ, Biotechnology of Antibiotics, 2nd Ed.,, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., pages 415 - 435,
    - KIRSCH, PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1989), vol. 6, pages 387 - 393,
    - THEODORA W. GREENE, Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY AND SONS,
    - "Salt Cloud Method", GENETIC ENGINEERING NEWS, (19991115), vol. 19, no. 20, page 1,34,43,
    - TSUGE ET AL., ARCH. MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 165, pages 243 - 51,
    - M. ASH AND I. ASH,, Handbook of Pharmaceutical Additives: An International Guide to More than 6000 Products by Trade Name, Chemical, Function, and Manufacturer, ASHGATE PUBLISHING CO.,
    - K. PARFITT,, Martindale: The Complete Drug Reference,
    - L. S. GOODMAN ET AL., Goodman & Giiman's The Pharmaceutical Basis of Therapeutics, PERGAMON PRESS,
    - FOSTEL ET AL., DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2000), vol. 5, pages 25 - 32,
 US20000547357
 US19990170943
 US19990170946
 US19990170945
 US20000208222
 US19990406568
 US19980101828
 US19990125750
otherUS4874843
 USRE39071E
Opposition   - LIN et al., "Recovery and purification of the lipopeptide biosurfactant of Bacillus subtilis by ultrafiltration", Biotechnology Techniques, (19970600), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 413 - 416, XP002448988

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lwt.2004.03.001
    - "Surfactants and Interfacial Phenomena", Extracts from Rosen, (19890000),
    - DESAI et al., "Microbial Production of Surfactants and Their Commercial Potential", Microbiology and Molecular Biology Reviews, (19970300), pages 47 - 64, XP002209696
    - LIN et al., "Structural and Immunological Characterisation of a Biosurfactant Produced by Bacillus licheniformis JF-2", Applied and Environmental Microbiology, (19940100), pages 31 - 38, XP055270973
    - MULLIGAN et al., "Recovery of Biosurfactants by Ultrafiltration", J. Chem. Tech . Biotechnol., (19900000), vol. 47, pages 23 - 29, XP000249028
    - LAKEY et al., "Fluorescence Indicates a Calcium-Dependent Interaction between the Lipopeptide Antibiotic LY146032 and Phospholipid Membranes", Biochemistry, (19880000), vol. 27, pages 4639 - 4645, XP055270974

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00413a009
    - BALTZ, "Lipopeptide Antibiotics Produced by Streptomyces roseosporus and Streptomyces fradiae", Biotechnology of Antibiotics (Drugs and the Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19970000), pages 415 - 435, XP055201803
    - MIAO et al., "Daptomycin biosynthesis in Streptomyces roseosporus: cloning and analysis of the gene cluster and revision of peptide stereochemistry.", Microbiology, (20050000), vol. 151, pages 1507 - 1523, XP055103297

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.27757-0