Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2261252

EP2261252 - Method for the purification of antibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacher Strasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2010/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Falkenstein, Roberto
Wastl-Witt-Strasse 5
80689 München / DE
02 / Kolb, Burkard
Ludwig-März-Straße 27
82377 Penzberg / DE
03 / Smida, Maria
Attachinger Weg 37
85356 Freising / DE
 [2010/50]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/52]Vossius & Partner
P.O. Box 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2010/50]Burger, Alexander , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (TR-E) Postfach 11 52
82372 Penzberg / DE
Application number, filing date10175706.023.05.2006
[2010/50]
Priority number, dateEP2005001130225.05.2005         Original published format: EP 05011302
[2010/50]
Previously filed application, dateWO2006EP0486323.05.2006
[2010/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2261252
Date:15.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2261252
Date:23.03.2011
[2011/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2261252
Date:25.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/06, C07K16/28, C07K16/32, B01D15/36, G01N30/34
[2012/08]
Former International [2010/50]C07K16/00, G01N30/34, C07K1/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON ANTIKÖRPERN[2015/47]
English:Method for the purification of antibodies[2010/50]
French:MÉTHODE DE PURIFICATION D'ANTICORPS[2015/47]
Former [2010/50]Verfahren zur Reinigung von Antikörpern
Former [2010/50]Méthode de purification d'anticorps
Examination procedure14.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/44]
25.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2012Fee for grant paid
04.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06753791.0  / EP1888636
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060753791) is  19.06.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.04.2013  27.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2013/37]
Opponent(s)01  24.04.2013  27.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/31]
Opponent(s)01  24.04.2013  27.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Bassett, Richard Simon
Potter Clarkson LLP
Park View House
58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/22]
Opponent(s)01  24.04.2013   
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
04.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.12.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.04.2015
23.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
08.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.12.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition19.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0122/16
15.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.10.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/44]
23.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.05.2006
AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
MC25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
IE23.05.2013
LU23.05.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/20]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
MC25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
IE23.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
MC25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/34]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/22]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/21]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/15]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/13]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/12]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/11]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
PL25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/10]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/09]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT25.07.2012
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2004024866  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 5; claims 1-46 *;
 [Y]  - ISHIHARA T ET AL, "Optimization of monoclonal antibody purification by ion-exchange chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (20050325), vol. 1069, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2004.10.040, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 99 - 106, XP004790339 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2004.10.040
 [Y]  - Lottspeich F & Zorbas H, Bioanalytik, Heidelberg, Berlin, Spektrum Akademischer Verlag, (19980101), pages 202 - 204, ISBN 3-8274-0041-4, XP002621496 [Y] 1-8 * page 202 - page 204 *
 [Y]  - TISHCHENKO GA ET AL, "Effect of salt concentration gradient on separation of different types of specific immunoglobulins by ion-exchange chromatography on DEAE cellulose", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B, (19980227), vol. 706, no. 1, pages 157 - 166, XP002621497 [Y] 1-8 * pages 161-166 *
 [Y]  - JISKOOT W ET AL, "TWO-STEP PURIFICATION OF A MURINE MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY INTENDED FOR THERAPEUTIC APPLICATION IN MAN OPTIMISATION OF PURIFICATION CONDITIONS AND SCALING UP", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (19890101), vol. 124, doi:DOI:10.1016/0022-1759(89)90196-8, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 143 - 156, XP002905852 [Y] 1-8 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(89)90196-8
 [Y]  - STABY A ET AL, "Comparison of chromatographic ion-exchange resins", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (20050325), vol. 1069, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2004.11.094, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 65 - 77, XP004790336 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2004.11.094
by applicantWO8905157
 WO03102132
 WO9219973
 WO9400561
 WO2004024866
 WO2004076485
 EP0530447
 US4983722
 WO9516037
 EP1084136
 US5429746
 WO2005023872
 WO9957134
    - VIJAYALAKSHMI, M.A., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECH., (1998), vol. 75, pages 93 - 102
    - NECINA, R. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1998), vol. 60, pages 689 - 698
    - DANIELSSON, A. ET AL., J. IMMUN. METH., (1988), vol. 115, pages 79 - 88
    - RAWEERITH, R. ET AL., J. IMMUN. METH., (2003), vol. 282, pages 63 - 72
    - FOLLMAN, D.K.; FAHRNER, R.L., "reported a factorial screening of antibody purification processes using three chromatography steps without protein A", J. CHROM. A, (2004), vol. 1024, pages 79 - 85
    - MHATRE, R. ET AL., J. CHROM. A, (1995), vol. 707, pages 225 - 231
    - SCHWARZ, A. ET AL., LABORPRAXIS, (1997), vol. 21, pages 62 - 66
    - ISHIHARA, T. ET AL., J. CHROM., (2005), vol. 1069, pages 99 - 106
    - HUSTON, J.S. ET AL., PNAS USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883
    - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426
    - HUNKAPILLER; HOOD, NATURE, (1986), vol. 323, pages 15 - 16
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC.
    - MERRICK, H.; HAWLITSCHEK, G., BIOTECH FORUM EUROPE, (1992), vol. 9, pages 398 - 403