Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2254259

EP2254259 - Method and device for transferring signals representative of a pilot symbol pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V.
Capronilaan 46
1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2010/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Hara, Yoshitaka
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE
1 allée de Beaulieu
CS 10806
35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR
02 / Mottier, David
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE
1 allée de Beaulieu
CS 10806
35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR
03 / Brunel, Loïc
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE
1 allée de Beaulieu
CS 10806
35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR
04 / Fukui, Noriyuki
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE
1 allée de Beaulieu
CS 10806
35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR
 [2016/45]
Former [2010/47]01 / Hara, Yoshitaka
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806
35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR
02 / Mottier, David
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806
35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR
03 / Brunel, Loïc
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806
35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR
04 / Fukui, Noriyuki
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806
35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR
Representative(s)Cabinet Le Guen Maillet
3, impasse de la Vigie
CS 71840
35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/45]Le Guen-Maillet
5, place de Newquay
BP 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
Former [2010/47]Maillet, Alain
Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5 Place Newquay B.P. 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date10175964.522.09.2006
[2010/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2254259
Date:24.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2254259
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005, H04W52/32
[2010/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/45]
Former [2010/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Signalen, die Pilotensymbolmuster entsprechen[2010/47]
English:Method and device for transferring signals representative of a pilot symbol pattern[2010/47]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour le transfert de signaux représentatifs de symboles pilotes[2010/47]
Examination procedure13.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/26]
20.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2016Fee for grant paid
14.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06019911.4  / EP1903689
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060019911) is  03.07.2008
Opposition(s)10.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
16.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
20.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
26.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.09.2006
AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CY09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU22.09.2006
AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2018/29]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/35]AT09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV09.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0991204  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, paragraph 31 - paragraph 33 * * page 4, paragraph 39 - paragraph 46 * * tables 2-4 * * figures 1,4-6 *;
 [X]US6285663  (ESMAILZADEH RIAZ [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 14 - line 47 * * column 4, line 59 - line 64 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 9 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 21 * * figures 1-5,7,10,11 *;
 [A]US2003027587  (PROCTOR JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, paragraph 27 - paragraph 28 * * page 3, paragraph 35 - paragraph 36 * * page 4, paragraph 43 - paragraph 44 * * figures 2,3,6,7 *;
 [A]US2004077370  (DICK STEPHEN G [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0056] *
by applicantUS6285663