EP2254259 - Method and device for transferring signals representative of a pilot symbol pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hara, Yoshitaka MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | 02 /
Mottier, David MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | 03 /
Brunel, Loïc MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | 04 /
Fukui, Noriyuki MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | [2016/45] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
Hara, Yoshitaka MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | ||
02 /
Mottier, David MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | |||
03 /
Brunel, Loïc MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | |||
04 /
Fukui, Noriyuki MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC R&D CENTRE EUROPE 1 allée de Beaulieu CS 10806 35708, RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 3, impasse de la Vigie CS 71840 35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Le Guen-Maillet 5, place de Newquay BP 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/47] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5 Place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10175964.5 | 22.09.2006 | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2254259 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2254259 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04W52/32 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
H04W52/325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2010/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Signalen, die Pilotensymbolmuster entsprechen | [2010/47] | English: | Method and device for transferring signals representative of a pilot symbol pattern | [2010/47] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le transfert de signaux représentatifs de symboles pilotes | [2010/47] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 20.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06019911.4 / EP1903689 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060019911) is 03.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2006 | AT | 09.11.2016 | BE | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | ES | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | IT | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | NL | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.09.2006 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.09.2006 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0991204 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, paragraph 31 - paragraph 33 * * page 4, paragraph 39 - paragraph 46 * * tables 2-4 * * figures 1,4-6 *; | [X]US6285663 (ESMAILZADEH RIAZ [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 14 - line 47 * * column 4, line 59 - line 64 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 9 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 21 * * figures 1-5,7,10,11 *; | [A]US2003027587 (PROCTOR JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, paragraph 27 - paragraph 28 * * page 3, paragraph 35 - paragraph 36 * * page 4, paragraph 43 - paragraph 44 * * figures 2,3,6,7 *; | [A]US2004077370 (DICK STEPHEN G [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0056] * | by applicant | US6285663 |