Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2322174

EP2322174 - Combined use of valsartan and calcium channel blockers for therapeutic purposes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  27.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis Pharma AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
[2015/37]
Former [2011/20]For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Inventor(s)01 / de Gasparo, Marc
Es Planches 123a
2842, Rossemaiso / CH
02 / Webb, Randy Lee
17 Honeyman Drive
Flemington, NJ 08822 / US
 [2015/39]
Former [2011/20]01 / de Gasparo, Marc
Es Planches 123a
2842, Rossemaiso / CH
02 / Webb, Randy Lee
17 Honeyman Drive
Flemington, NM 08822 / US
Representative(s)Warner, James Alexander , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2015/39]
Former [2011/20]Warner, James Alexander , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date10177093.109.07.1999
[2011/20]
Priority number, dateUS1998011389310.07.1998         Original published format: US 113893
[2011/20]
Previously filed application, dateEP2007010517909.07.1999
[2011/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2322174
Date:18.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2322174
Date:27.07.2011
[2011/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2322174
Date:23.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/41, A61K31/44, A61K45/06, A61P9/00, A61P9/12
[2011/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2015/39]
Former [2011/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesRO27.01.2012
SI27.01.2012
TitleGerman:Kombinierte Verwendung von Valsartan und Calcium-Kanalblockern zu therapeutischen Zwecken[2011/20]
English:Combined use of valsartan and calcium channel blockers for therapeutic purposes[2011/20]
French:Utilisation combinée de valsartane et bloqueurs du canal de calcium à but thérapeutique[2011/20]
Examination procedure27.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/10]
07.03.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
18.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2015Fee for grant paid
12.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
21.08.2015Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07105179.1  / EP1870098
EP99934647.1  / EP1096932
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990934647) is  04.09.2003
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  04.03.2019  WITHDRAWN
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 06  23.06.2016  29.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  WITHDRAWN
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  07.02.2019  INTERVENTION WITHDRAWN
Betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Kobelweg 95
86156 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2019/16]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  04.03.2019  WITHDRAWN
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 06  23.06.2016  29.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  WITHDRAWN
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  07.02.2019  INTERVENTION WITHDRAWN
Betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Kobelweg 95
86156 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2019/15]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  04.03.2019  WITHDRAWN
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 06  23.06.2016  29.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  07.02.2019  INTERVENTION WITHDRAWN
Betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Kobelweg 95
86156 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2019/12]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 06  23.06.2016  29.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  27.07.2017  INTERVENTION WITHDRAWN
Betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Kobelweg 95
86156 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2019/03]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 06  23.06.2016  29.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  27.07.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Kobelweg 95
86156 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2019/02]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  23.06.2016  29.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  27.07.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Kobelweg 95
86156 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2018/51]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  07.11.2018  WITHDRAWN
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  27.07.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Kobelweg 95
86156 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2018/46]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  26.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  27.07.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Kobelweg 95
86156 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2017/35]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  26.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstraße 2
80336 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  27.07.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Kobelweg 95
86156 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2017/34]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  26.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstraße 2
80336 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  29.06.2017  INTERVENTION
Betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Kobelweg 95
86156 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2017/32]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  26.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstraße 2
80336 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  29.06.2017  INTERVENTION
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories (UK) Limited/ betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
6 Riverview Road/ Kobelweg 95
Beverley/Augsburg
East Yorkshire HU17 0LD GB/86156 DE / GB
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2017/31]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  26.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Johnson, Stephen William, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 06  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstraße 2
80336 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 08  06.06.2017  29.06.2017  INTERVENTION
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories (UK) Limited/ betapharm Arzneimittel GmbH
6 Riverview Road/ Kobelweg 95
Beverley/Augsburg
East Yorkshire HU17 0LD GB/86156 DE / GB
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2017/02]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  26.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Veneçuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Johnson, Stephen William, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 06  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstraße 2
80336 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016  04.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2016/31]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  26.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Teipel, Stephan
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016  24.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Venezuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca des Valles (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Johnson, Stephen William, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 06  23.06.2016  30.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstraße 2
80336 München / DE
 07  23.06.2016   
Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2016/30]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  26.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Teipel, Stephan
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  21.06.2016   
Pi, Rafael
Huarte & Pi
C/ Veneçuela, 67 (La Torreta)
08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES
Opponent's representative
Pi, Rafael, et al
Huarte & Pi
C/Venezuela, 67
(La Torreta)
08430 La Roca des Valles (Barcelona) / ES
 05  23.06.2016   
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Johnson, Stephen William, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 06  23.06.2016   
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstraße 2
80336 München / DE
Former [2016/29]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016  26.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Teipel, Stephan
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  09.06.2016  14.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2016/21]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  19.04.2016   
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
49131 Petach-Tikva / IL
Opponent's representative
Teipel, Stephan
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2016/15]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2016  10.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC EHF
Reykjavikurvegur 76-78
220 Hafnarfjordur / IS
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
03.08.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.12.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.09.2017Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
08.02.2018Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
11.03.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/36]
26.07.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.04.2018Appeal received No.  T0403/18
15.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
11.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
11.04.2018Appeal received No.  T0403/18
14.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
11.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
04.04.2018Appeal received No.  T0403/18
13.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
11.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
18.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0403/18
21.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
11.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
18.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0403/18
16.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
11.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
14.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0403/18
11.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
22.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0403/18
11.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
06.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
11.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
21.03.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
18.05.2012Request for further processing filed
18.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.06.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9749394  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]; WAGNER ROBERT FRANK [US]; KATAKUSE YOSHIMITSU [JP]) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * claims 1-11,27 *;
 [Y]US5492904  (WONG PANCRAS C B [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * column 1, line 35 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 3 *;
 [Y]EP0628313  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP] TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * claims 1,18,19 *;
 [Y]US4654372  (MARCOUX FRANK W [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * column 2, lines 30-39 * * column 3, lines 5-15 * * tables 3-5 *;
 [Y]WO9524901  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]; GASPARO MARC DE [CH]; LEVENS NIGEL [CH]) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * claims 1-6 *;
 [XY]  - COREA L ET AL, "VALSARTAN, A NEW ANGIOTENSIN II ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF ESSENTIAL HYPERTENSION: A COMPARATIVE STUDY OF THE EFFICACY AND SAFETY AGAINST AMLODIPINE", CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, US, (19960901), vol. 60, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0009-9236(96)90061-2, ISSN 0009-9236, pages 341 - 346, XP008008438 [X] 12-15 * abstract * * page 342, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 343, column 2, paragraph 3 * * table II * [Y] 1-5,8-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-9236(96)90061-2
 [XY]  - FUJIMURA Y ET AL, "Antihypertensive effect of a combination of valsartan and hydrochlorothiazide, nifedipine or propranolol in spontaneously hypertensive rats", JAPANESE PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS 1995 JP, (1995), vol. 23, no. 12, ISSN 0386-3603, pages 87 - 93, XP002640547 [X] 12-14 * abstract * * figure 4 * [Y] 1-5,8-15
 [Y]  - SEVER P S, "CLINICAL PROFILE OF THE NOVEL ANGIOTENSIN II TYPE I BLOCKER CANDESARTAN CILEXETIL", JOURNAL OF HYPERTENSION, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, LTD, US / UK, (19971201), vol. 15, no. SUPPL. 06, ISSN 0263-6352, pages S09 - S12, XP008058911 [Y] 1-5,8-15 * abstract * * page 11, column 2, paragraph 2 *
 [Y]  - OLIVAN J ET AL, "[Effect of the treatment with amlodipine on left ventricular hypertrophy in hypertensive patients]", MEDLINE,, (19961101), XP002582089 [Y] 1-5,8-15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - GRANIER P ET AL, "Improvement in left ventricular hypertrophy and left ventricular diastolic function following verapamil therapy in mild to moderate hypertension", MEDLINE,, (19900101), XP002582090 [Y] 1-5,8-15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - MAKRILAKIS K ET AL, "New therapeutic approaches to achieve the desired blood pressure goal", CARDIOVASCULAR REVIEWS AND REPORTS, CARDIOVASCULAR REVIEWS AND REPORTS, GREENWICH, CT, US, (19971201), vol. 18, no. 12, ISSN 0197-3118, pages 10 - 16, XP009133487 [Y] 1-5,8-15 * page 12, column 2, paragraph 5 - page 13, column 2, paragraph 2 *
 [Y]  - TARIF N ET AL, "Preservation of renal function: the spectrum of effects by calcium-channel blockers", NEPHROLOGY DIALYSIS TRANSPLANTATION, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, (19971101), vol. 12, no. 11, ISSN 0931-0509, pages 2244 - 2250, XP002582091 [Y] 1-5,8-15 * abstract * * page 2248, column 2, paragraph 2 *
 [Y]  - MARKHAM A ET AL, "VALSARTAN. A REVIEW OF ITS PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTIC USE IN ESSENTIAL HYPERTENSION", DRUGS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, NZ, (19970801), vol. 54, no. 2, doi:DOI:10.2165/00003495-199754020-00009, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 299 - 311, XP002051903 [Y] 1-5,8-15 * page 303, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 304, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 307, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-199754020-00009
 [T]  - BELCHER G ET AL, "Candesartan cilexetil: safety and tolerability in healthy volunteers and patients with hypertension", JOURNAL OF HUMAN HYPERTENSION, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (19970901), vol. 11, no. suppl. 2, ISSN 0950-9240, pages S85 - S89, XP009133334
 [T]  - ALLEN T J ET AL, "Effect of combination therapy (Ang II antagonist, valsartan and a calcium channel blocker) in a hypertensive model of diabetic nephropathy", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HYPERTENSION; FIFTEENTH SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HYPERTENSION; NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA; MAY 16-20, 2000, ELSEVIER, (20000401), vol. 13, no. 4 Part 2, ISSN 0895-7061, page 288A, XP002582092
 [T]  - PHILIPP ET AL, "Two multicenter, 8-week, randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled, parallel-group studies evaluating the efficacy and tolerability of amlodipine and valsartan in combination and as monotherapy in adult patients with mild to moderate essential hypertension", CLINICAL THERAPEUTICS, EXCERPTA MEDICA, PRINCETON, NJ, US, (20070401), vol. 29, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.CLINTHERA.2007.03.018, ISSN 0149-2918, pages 563 - 580, XP022142115

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clinthera.2007.03.018
Examination   - NEUTEL ET AL, "Combination therapy with diuretics: An evolution of understanding", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, EXCERPTA MEDICA, INC, UNITED STATES, (19960930), vol. 101, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0002-9343(96)00269-0, ISSN 0002-9343, pages 61S - 70S, XP005065434

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9343(96)00269-0
    - "THE SIXTH REPORT OF THE JOINT NATIONAL COMMITTEE ON PREVENTION, DETECTION, EVALUATION, AND TREATMENT OF HIGH BLOOD PRESSURE", ARCHIVES OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, CHICAGO, IL, US, (19971101), vol. 157, no. 21, doi:10.1001/ARCHINTE.157.21.2413, ISSN 0003-9926, pages 2413 - 2446, XP000885619

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.157.21.2413
otherEP1096932
OppositionEP2322174
 WO0002543
 WO9749394
 EP0244944
 WO9220342
 US5492904
 EP0628313
 US4654372
 WO9524901
    - COREA et al., "VALSARTAN, A NEW ANGIOTENSIN II ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF ESSENTIAL HYPERTENSION: A COMPARATIVE STUDY OF THE EFFICACY AND SAFETY AGAINST AMLODIPINE", Clinical Pharmacology & Therapeutics, (19960900), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 341 - 346, XP008008438

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-9236(96)90061-2
    - PRASAD et al., "D12 A pharmacokinetic interaction between an angiotensin II receptor blocker (Valsartan) and a calcium channel blocker (Amlodipine)", American Journal of Hypertension, (19970101), vol. 10, no. 4, page 107a, XP027358623
    - MARKHAM et al., "VALSARTAN. A REVIEW OF ITS PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTIC USE IN ESSENTIAL HYPERTENSION", Drugs, (19970000), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 299 - 311, XP002051903

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-199754020-00009
    - MAKRILAKIS et al., "New therapeutic approaches to achieve the desired blood pressure goal", Cardiovascular Reviews and Reports, (19971200), vol. 18, pages 10 - 16, XP009133487
    - EPSTEIN et al., "Newer Approaches to Antihypertensive Therapy Use of Fixed-Dose Combination Therapy", Arch Intern Med, (19960000), vol. 156, pages 1969 - 1978, XP055273578

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.156.17.1969
    - "The Sixth Report of the Joint National Committee on Prevention, Detection, Evaluation, and Treatment of High Blood Pressure", Arch Intern Med ., (19970000), vol. 157, pages 2413 - 2446, XP000885619

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.157.21.2413
    - Anonymous, "New products", Monthly Index of Medical Specialties, (19980500), pages 46, 58, 70 - 72, 74, 376, XP003034331
    - SEVER, P.S., "CLINICAL PROFILE OF THE NOVEL ANGIOTENSIN II TYPE I BLOCKER CANDESARTAN CILEXETIL", Journal of Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 15, no. Suppl. 6, pages S9 - S12, XP008058911
    - PHILIPP et al., "55 Dose-finding study of candesartan cilexetil and hydrochlorothiazide in combination in patients with mild to moderate hypertension", Journal of Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 10, no. 4, page 90A, XP027359434
    - FARSANG et al., "H13 ANTIHYPERTENSIVE EFFECTS AND TOLERABILITY OF CANDESARTAN CILEXETIL, AMLODIPINE AND THEIR COMBINATION", American Journal of Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 10, no. 4, page 80A, XP000866499

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0895-7061(97)88934-0
    - "Norvasc (amlodipine besylate Tablets)", Patient leaflet of Norvasc, (19950000), XP003034332
    - Neutel Joel M. et al, "Combination therapy with diuretics: An evolution of understanding", The American Journal of medicine, (19960000), vol. 101, no. 3A, pages 61S - 70S, XP005065434

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9343(96)00269-0
    - M.R. Weir, "Antihypertensive combination therapy", Drugs of Today, (19980000), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 5 - 9, XP055292204

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dot.1998.34.1.485192
    - Belcher, G. et al, "Candesartan cilexetil: safety and tolerability in healthy volunteers and patients with hypertension.", Journal of Human Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 11, no. 2, pages S85 - S89, XP009133334
    - Farsang, Cs. et al, "ANTIHYPERTENSIVE EFFECTS AND TOLERABILITY OF CANDESARTAN CILEXETIL, AMLODIPINE AND THEIR COMBINATION", American Journal of hypertension, (19970000), vol. 10, no. 4. Part 2, page 80A, XP000866499

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0895-7061(97)88934-0
    - Fujimura, Yoko, "Antihypertensive effect of a combination of valsartan and hydrochlorothiazide, nifedipine or propranolol in spontaneously hypertensive rats", Japanese Pharmacology and Therapeutics, (19950000), vol. 23, no. 12, pages 87 - 93, XP055292228
    - Anthony Markham et al, "Valsartan. A Review of its Pharmacology and Therapeutic Use in Essential Hypertension", Drugs, (19970000), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 299 - 311, XP002051903

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-199754020-00009
    - Corea, L. et al, "Valsartan, a new angiotensin II antagonist for the treatment of essential hypertension: A comparative study of the efficacy and safety against amlodipine", Clinical Pharmacology & Therapeutics, (19960000), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 341 - 346, XP008008438

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-9236(96)90061-2
    - Prasad P. et al, "D12 A pharmacokinetic interaction between an angiotensin II receptor blocker (Valsartan) and a calcium channel blocker (Amlodipine)", American Journal of Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 10, no. S2, page 107A, XP001113153

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0895-7061(97)89040-1
    - COREA et al., "VALSARTAN, A NEW ANGIOTENSIN II ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF ESSENTIAL HYPERTENSION: A COMPARATIVE STUDY OF THE EFFICACY AND SAFETY AGAINST AMLODIPINE", Clinical Pharmacology and Therapeutics, (19960000), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 341 - 346, XP008008438

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-9236(96)90061-2
    - FUJIMURA et al., "Antihypertensive effect of a combination of valsartan and hydrochlorothiazide, nifedipine or propranolol in spontaneously hypertensive rats", Japanese Pharmacology and Therapeutic, (19950000), vol. 23, no. 12, pages 87 - 93, XP055292228
    - SEVER et al, "CLINICAL PROFILE OF THE NOVEL ANGIOTENSIN II TYPE I BLOCKER CANDESARTAN CILEXETIL", Journal of Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 15, no. suppl 6, pages S09 - S12, XP008058911
    - OLIVAN et al., Medline, (19960000), XP002582089
    - GRANIER et al., Medline, (19900000), XP002582090
    - MAKRILAKIS et al., Cardiovascular Reviews and Reports, (19970000), vol. 18, no. 12, pages 10 - 16, XP009133487
    - TARIF et al., "Nephrology, Dialysis, Transplantation: Official Publication of the European Dialysis and Transplant Association", European Renal Association, (19970000), vol. 12, no. 11, pages 2244 - 2250, XP002582091
    - MARKHAM et al., "002051903 VALSARTAN. A REVIEW OF ITS PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTIC USE IN ESSENTIAL HYPERTENSION", Drugs, (19970000), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 299 - 311, XP002051903

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-199754020-00009
    - PHILIPP et al., "Two multicenter, 8-week, randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled, parallel-group studies evaluating the efficacy and tolerability of amlodipine and valsartan in combination and as monotherapy in adult patients with mild to moderate essential hypertension", Clinical Therapeutics, (20070000), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 563 - 580, XP022142115

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clinthera.2007.03.018
    - ALLEN et al., "Effect of combination therapy (Ang II antagonist, valsartan and a calcium channel blocker) in a hypertensive model of diabetic nephropathy", American Journal of Hypertension, (20000000), vol. 13, no. 4, page 288A, XP002582092
    - NEUTEL et al., "Combination therapy with diuretics: An evolution of understanding", American Journal of Medicine, (19960000), vol. 101, no. 3, pages 61S - 70S, XP005065434

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9343(96)00269-0
    - "THE SIXTH REPORT OF THE JOINT NATIONAL COMMITTEE ON PREVENTION, DETECTION, EVALUATION, AND TREATMENT OF HIGH BLOOD PRESSURE", Archives of Internal Medicine, (19970000), vol. 157, no. 21, pages 2413 - 2446, XP000885619

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.157.21.2413
    - BAUER et al., "The Angiotensin II Type 1 Receptor AntagonistsA New Class of Antihypertensive Drugs", Arch Intern Med, (19950000), vol. 155, no. 13, pages 1361 - 1368, XP000918736

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.155.13.1361
    - BAKRIS et al., "CLINICAL EFFICACY AND SAFETY PROFILES OF AT1 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS", Cardiovascular Reviews and Reports, (19990000), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 77 - 100, XP000866263
    - FARSANG, "ANTIHYPERTENSIVE EFFECTS AND TOLERABILITY OF CANDESARTAN CILEXETIL, AMLODIPINE AND THEIR COMBINATION", American Journal of Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 10, no. 4, page S80A, XP000866499

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0895-7061(97)88934-0
    - Astra Merck Inc., "Atacand (candesartan) SBA", FDA Medical Review Part 3, (19980406), pages 108 - 123, XP055293570
    - "Diovan (TM) valsartan Capsules Prescribing Information C96-70 (Rev. 12/96)", Department of Health and Human Services, (19960000), XP055293586
    - "1999 WHO - International Society of Hypertension Guidelines for the Management of Hypertension", Journal of Hypertension, (19990000), vol. 17, pages 151 - 183, XP055293591
    - "Medical Review of the FDA prepared during the approval of valsartan (DIOVAN®) and covering letter", Food and Drug Administration, page 1 and 19
    - FOGARI et al., "Valsartan addition to amlodipine is more effective than losartan addition in hypertensive patients inadequately controlled by amlodipine", Vascular Health and Risk Management, (20100000), vol. 6, pages 87 - 93, XP055293604

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/VHRM.S9404
    - "Antihypertensives", Monthly Index of Medical Specialties, (19980500), page 46,58,70,72, XP055293609
    - COREA et al., "VALSARTAN, A NEW ANGIOTENSIN II ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF ESSENTIAL HYPERTENSION: A COMPARATIVE STUDY OF THE EFFICACY AND SAFETY AGAINST AMLODIPINE", Clin. Pharmacol. Therap., (19960000), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 341 - 346, XP008008438

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-9236(96)90061-2
    - PRASAD et al., "D12 A pharmacokinetic interaction between an angiotensin II receptor blocker (Valsartan) and a calcium channel blocker (Amlodipine)", Am. J. Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 10, no. 4, XP027358623
    - "1993 Guidelines for the management of mild hypertension. Memorandum from a WHO/ International Society of Hypertension meeting", Hypertension, (19930000), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 392 - 403, XP055273555
    - "The Sixth Report of the Joint National Committee on Prevention, Detection, Evaluation, and Treatment of High Blood Pressure", Arch. Intern. Med., (19970000), vol. 157, no. 21, pages 2413 - 2446, XP000885619

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.157.21.2413
    - EPSTEIN et al., "Newer Approaches to Antihypertensive Therapy Use of Fixed-Dose Combination Therapy", Arch. Intern. Med., (19960000), vol. 156, pages 1969 - 1978, XP055273578

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.156.17.1969
    - WAEBER et al., "Combination antihypertensive therapy: Does it have a role in rational therapy?", Am. J. Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 10, no. 7, pages 131S - 137S, XP055273560

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0895-7061(97)00101-5
    - MAKRILAKIS et al., "New therapeutic approaches to achieve the desired blood pressure goal", Cardiovascular Reviews and Reports, (19970000), vol. 18, no. 12, pages 10 - 16, XP009133487
    - COREA et al., "VALSARTAN, A NEW ANGIOTENSIN II ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF ESSENTIAL HYPERTENSION: A COMPARATIVE STUDY OF THE EFFICACY AND SAFETY AGAINST AMLODIPINE", Clinical Pharmacology & Therapeutics, (19960000), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 341 - 346, XP008008438

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-9236(96)90061-2
    - PRASAD et al., "D12 A pharmacokinetic interaction between an angiotensin II receptor blocker (Valsartan) and a calcium channel blocker (Amlodipine)", American Journal of Hypertension, (19970400), vol. 10, no. 4, XP027358623
    - MAKRILAKIS et al., "New therapeutic approaches to achieve the desired blood pressure goal", Cardiovascular Reviews and Reports, (19971200), vol. 18, no. 12, pages 10 - 16, XP009133487
    - R. W. GIFFORD, "Drug Combinations as Rational Antihypertensive Therapy", Arch Intern Med, (19740600), vol. 133, no. 6, pages 1053 - 1057, XP055293657
    - "THE SIXTH REPORT OF THE JOINT NATIONAL COMMITTEE ON PREVENTION, DETECTION, EVALUATION, AND TREATMENT OF HIGH BLOOD PRESSURE", Arch Intern Med, (19970000), vol. 157, no. 21, pages 2413 - 2446, XP000885619

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.157.21.2413
    - "1993 guidelines for the management of mild hypertension. Memorandum from a World Health Organization/International Society of Hypertension meeting", Hypertension, (19930000), vol. 22, pages 392 - 403, XP055273555
    - James L Wofford, "History of Fixed-Dose Combination Therapy for Hypertension", Arch Intern Med, (19970000), vol. 157, page 1044, XP055273556
    - P.S. SEVER et al., "CLINICAL PROFILE OF THE NOVEL ANGIOTENSIN II TYPE I BLOCKER CANDESARTAN CILEXETIL", Journal of Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 15, no. 6, pages S9 - S12, XP008058911
    - "Patient leaflet Norvasc", Pfizer, (19950000), XP055293660
    - "Diovan (TM) valsartan Capsules Prescribing Information C96-70 (Rev. 12/96)", Department of health and Human Services, (19960000), XP055293586
    - PRASAD P.P. et al., "A pharmacokinetic interaction between an angiotensin II receptor blocker (valsartan) and a calcium channel blocker (amlodipine)", American Journal of Hypertension, (19970000), vol. 10, no. 4, page D12, XP027358623
    - COREA L. et al., "Valsartan, a new angiotensin II antagonist for the treatment of essential hypertension: A comparative study of the efficacy and safety against amlodipine", Clinical Pharmacology & Therapeutics, (19960000), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 341 - 346, XP008008438

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-9236(96)90061-2
    - MARKHAM A. et al., "Valsartan: a review of its pharmacology and therapeutic use in essential hypertension", Drugs, (19970000), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 299 - 311, XP002051903

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-199754020-00009
    - "Glossary Definition of ''Phase"", Clinical Trials, (20160615), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/help/glossary/phase, XP055293663
    - FUJIMURA, Y. et al., "Antihypertensive effect of a combination of valsartan and hydrochlorothiazide, nifedipine or propranolol in spontaneously hypertensive rats", Yakuri to Chiryo, (19950000), vol. 23, no. 12, pages 3241 - 3247, XP055292228
    - WALDRON, J. M. et al., "The treatment of diastolic hypertension with a fixed combination of hypotensive drugs", The American Journal of the Medical Sciences, (19550000), vol. 230, no. 5, pages 551 - 557, XP055293666

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00000441-195523050-00011
    - EPSTEIN M. et al., "Newer approaches to antihypertensive therapy - Use of fixed-dose combination therapy", Arch Intern Med, (19960000), vol. 156, pages 1969 - 1978, XP055273578

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.156.17.1969
    - PHILIPP T. et al., "Two multicenter, 8-week, randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled, parallel-group studies evaluating the efficacy and tolerability of amlodipine and valsartan in combination and as monotherapy in adult patients with mild to moderat essential hypertension", Clinical Therapeutics, (20070000), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 563 - 580, XP022142115

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clinthera.2007.03.018
    - WOFFORD J.L. et al., "History of fixed-dose combination therapy for hypertension", Arch Intern Med, (19970000), vol. 157, page 1044, XP055273556
    - "Lotrel", Physician's Desk Reference, (19960000), pages 840 - 843, XP055391030