Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2302127

EP2302127 - Door for a laundry care appliance, method of manufacturing such door and method of operating such door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2012
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.03.2012  [2012/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2011/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Wezyk, Pawel
Zawiszy 13/60
91-829 Lodz / PL
 [2011/13]
Application number, filing date10177248.117.09.2010
[2011/13]
Priority number, dateEP2009017116824.09.2009         Original published format: EP 09171168
[2011/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2302127
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:D06F39/14, B29C45/00
[2011/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Türe für einen Wäschetrockner, Herstellungsverfahren für eine solche Tür und Verfahren zu ihrem Betrieb[2011/13]
English:Door for a laundry care appliance, method of manufacturing such door and method of operating such door[2011/13]
French:Porte pour sèche-linge, procédé de fabrication d'une telle porte et procédé de fonctionnement associé[2011/13]
Examination procedure05.10.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/13]
11.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2012/13]
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1474558  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,13 * paragraphs [0032] , [0039]; figure 2 * [I] 2-12,14,15;
 [A]WO2008058972  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [A] 3,5-11,14,15 * page 5, line 15 - page 9, line 29; figures 2,3; claims 1,13,14,15 *;
 [A]GB941134  (ASS ELECT IND) [A] 1,3,4,13 * page 2, line 6 - line 24; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0521801  (EUROP EQUIP MENAGER [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,13 * column 2, line 3 - line 44 *;
 [A]WO2008052988  (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [A] 1,5-10,13-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3723073  (LOEWE OPTA GMBH [DE]) [A] 5-10,13,14 * figure 1; claims 1-5 *
by applicantGB2237293
 EP1474558
 WO2008058972
 GB941134