Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2308659

EP2308659 - Device and method for aligning workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOMAG GmbH
Homagstrasse 3-5
72296 Schopfloch / DE
[2016/41]
Former [2011/15]For all designated states
Homag Holzbearbeitungssysteme AG
Homagstrasse 3-5
72296 Schopfloch / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lorenz, Andreas
Lenzhalde 2/1
72280, Dornstetten / DE
02 / Höhn, Rolf
In den Gräben 18
72275, Alpirsbach / DE
 [2011/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/15]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10177849.621.09.2010
[2011/15]
Priority number, dateDE2009104844207.10.2009         Original published format: DE102009048442
[2011/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2308659
Date:13.04.2011
Language:DE
[2011/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:B27B31/06, B27G1/00, B27M1/08
[2011/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Ausrichten von Werkstücken[2011/15]
English:Device and method for aligning workpieces[2011/15]
French:Dispositif et procédé destinés à aligner des pièces à usiner[2011/15]
Examination procedure25.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/38]
02.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.05.2017
17.05.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination30.06.2017Appeal received No.  T2351/17
28.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.02.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
16.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
25.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
24.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
23.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP2030725  (HOMAG HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [YD] 1,2,11,12 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] - [0028]; figure - *;
 [Y]WO9961212  (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR PANELHANDLING [FI]; SIMOLIN KARI [FI]) [Y] 1,2,11,12 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2124144  (KOCKUMATION AB) [A] 1,2,11,12 * abstract *;
 [A]US5911302  (JACKSON JAMES G [CA]) [A] 1,2,11,12 * abstract *