Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2266586

EP2266586 - Compositions and method for alleviating inflammation and oxidative stress in a mammal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.04.2015  [2015/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lifeline Nutraceuticals Corporation
6400 South Fiddler's Green Circle, Suite 1970
Englewood, CO 80111 / US
[2010/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Myhill, Paul R.
3466 Willowrun Court
Castle Rock, CO 80109 / US
02 / Driscoll, William J.
6367 S. Jamaica Ct
Englewood, CO 80111 / US
 [2011/09]
Former [2011/02]01 / Myhill, Paul R.
3466 Willowrun Ct
Englewood, CO 8011 / US
02 / Driscoll, William J.
6367 S. Jamaica Ct
Englewood, CO 80111 / US
Representative(s)Stephen, Robert John
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/52]Stephen, Robert John
Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date10179008.723.03.2005
[2010/52]
Priority number, dateUS20040555802P23.03.2004         Original published format: US 555802 P
US20040590528P23.07.2004         Original published format: US 590528 P
US20040604638P26.08.2004         Original published format: US 604638 P
US20040607648P07.09.2004         Original published format: US 607648 P
US20040610749P17.09.2004         Original published format: US 610749 P
US20050643754P13.01.2005         Original published format: US 643754 P
US20050646707P25.01.2005         Original published format: US 646707 P
[2010/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2266586
Date:29.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/68
[2010/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/52]
TitleGerman:Zuammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Linderung von Entzündungen und Oxydatives Stress in Säugetieren.[2010/52]
English:Compositions and method for alleviating inflammation and oxidative stress in a mammal[2010/52]
French:Composition et méthode pour alléger l'inflammation et stress oxydatif dans les Mammifèrs.[2010/52]
Examination procedure01.03.2011Observations by third parties
07.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/28]
05.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/17]
15.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05734279.2  / EP1740196
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050734279) is  08.02.2007
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
05.10.2011Request for further processing filed
05.10.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.10.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201107   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]US6495170  (SMIT HOBBE FRISO ET AL) [X] 11-15 * examples 1,2,6 *;
 [X]US2003072823  (FLEISCHNER ALBERT M) [X] 11-15 * paragraph [0015] *;
 [XY]US5494668  (PATWARDHAN BHUSHAN [IN]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * abstract * * column 5, line 4 - column 7, line 24 * * column 15, line 42 - column 16, line 57 * * claims 1, 9, 11, 12 * [Y] 6
 [YDA]  - REDDY A C PULLA ET AL, "Effect of dietary turmeric (Curcuma longa) on iron-induced lipid peroxidation in the rat liver", FOOD AND CHEMICAL TOXICOLOGY, (1994), vol. 32, no. 3, ISSN 0278-6915, pages 279 - 283, XP002341129 [YD] 6 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,7-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0278-6915(94)90201-1
by applicant   - PAULING L., N ENGL J MED., (19800320), vol. 302, no. 12, pages 694 - 5
    - D'SOUZA ET AL., PHYTOTHERAPY RES., (2002), vol. 16, pages 197 - 8
    - KAR ET AL., J. ETHNOPHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 81, pages 281 - 5
    - ALBERT MA., "The role of C-reactive protein in cardiovascular disease risk", CURR CARDIOL REP, (2000), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 274 - 9
    - YUAN G, "Expression of C5aR (CD88) of synoviocytes isolated from patients with rheumatoid arthritis and osteoarthritis", CHIN MED J, (200309), vol. 116, no. 9, pages 1408 - 12
    - CHAUDHRI, G.; CLARK, 1. A., J IMMUNOL, (1989), vol. 143, no. 4, pages 1990 - 1294
    - BAEUERLE, P. A.; BALTIMORE, D., SCIENCE, (198810), vol. 242
    - STAAL, F. J. T ET AL., PROC. NAT). ACAD. SCI., USA, (199012), vol. 87, pages 9943 - 9947
    - DUH, E. J. ET AL., PROC. NAIL. SCI. ACAD., USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 5974 - 5978
    - MORROW D; RIFAI N; ANTMAN EM, "C-reactive protein is a potent predictor of mortality independently of and in combination with troponin T in acute coronary syndromes: a TIMI 11A substudy. Thrombolysis in Myocardial Infarction", J AM COLL CARDIOL, (1998), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 1460 - 5
    - BOGATY P; POIRIER P; SIMARD S ET AL., "Biological profiles in subjects with recurrent acute coronary events compared with subjects with long-standing stable angina", CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 103, no. 25, pages 3062 - 8
    - BOLIBAR I; VON ECKARDSTEIN A; ASSMANN G ET AL., "The ECAT Angina Pectoris Study Group: European Concerted Action on Thrombosis and Disabilities", THROMB HAEMOST, (2000), vol. 84, no. 6, pages 955 - 60
    - CIRCULATION, (1999), vol. 99, no. 2, pages 237 - 42
    - HAVERKATC F; THOMPSON SG; DUCKERT F., "Haemostasis factors in angina pectoris; relation to gender, age and acute-phase reaction", THROMB HAEMOST, (1995), vol. 73, no. 4, pages 561 - 7
    - MOUKARBEL GV; AMAOUT MS; ALAM SE., "C-reactive protein is a marker for a complex culprit lesion anatomy in unstable angina", CLIN CARDIOL, (2001), vol. 24, no. 7, pages 506 - 10
    - RIFAI N; RIDKER PM., "High-sensitivity C-reactive protein: a novel and promising marker of coronary heart disease", CLIN CHEM, (2001), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 403 - 11
    - STEFFENS S., INFLAMMATION AND ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (200412), vol. 29, no. G, pages 741 - 748
    - SAGAR ET AL., MOL CELL BIOCHEM., (199204), vol. 111, no. 1-2, pages 103 - 8
    - HERNANDEZ, R.H., "Calcium antagonists and atherosclerosis protection in hypertension", AM J THER., (200311), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 409 - 14
    - FRASER A., "Turnover of type 11 collagen and aggrecan in cartilage matrix at the onset of inflammatory arthritis in humans: relationship to mediators of systemic and local inflammation", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (200311), vol. 48, no. 11, pages 3085 - 95
    - DAWES, P.T., "Rheumatoid arthritis: treatment which controls the C-reactive protein and erythrocyte sedimentation rate reduces radiological progression", THE BRITISH JOURNAL OF RHEUMATOLOGY, vol. 25, pages 44 - 49
    - DESSEIN PH, "Cardiovascular risk in rheumatoid arthritis versus osteoarthritis: acute phase response related decreased insulin sensitivity and high-density lipoprotein cholesterol as well as clustering of metabolic syndrome features in rheumatoid arthritis", ARTHRITIS RES., (2002), vol. 4, no. 5, page R5
    - SOWERS M., "C-reactive protein as a. biomarker of emergent osteoarthritis", OSTEOARTHRITIS CARTILAGE, (200208), vol. 10, no. 8, pages 595 - 601
    - STURMER T., "Severity and extent of osteoarthritis and low grade systemic inflammation as assessed by high sensitivity C reactive protein", ANN RHEUM DIS., (200402), vol. 63, no. 2, pages 200 - 5
    - MCKEOWN, DJ., "The relationship between circulating concentrations of C-reactive protein, inflammatory cytokines and cytokine receptors in patients with non-small-cell lung cancer", BR J CANCER., (20041213), vol. 91, no. 12, pages 1993 - 5
    - MCARDLE PA, "The relationship between interleukin-6 and C-reactive protein in patients with benign and malignant prostate disease", BR J CANCER., (20041115), vol. 91, no. 10, pages 1755 - 7
    - SADDLER, D., "C-reactive protein elevation and the risk of colorectal cancer", GASTROENTEROL NURS, (200409), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 246 - 7
    - ALEXANDRALDS, MG, "The relation between bone marrow angiogenesis and the proliferation index Ki-67 in multiple myeloma", J CLIN PATHOL., (200408), vol. 57, no. 8, pages 856 - 60
    - KLINE K, "Vitamin E and breast cancer", J NUTR., (200412), vol. 134, no. 12, pages 3458S - 3462S
    - WRIGHT ME, "Development of a comprehensive dietary antioxidant index and application to lung cancer risk in a cohort of male smokers", AM J EPIDEMIOL., (20040701), vol. 160, no. 1, pages 68 - 76
    - ANDERSON K, "Differential response of human ovarian cancer cells to induction of apoptosis by vitamin E Succinate and vitamin E analogue, alpha-TEA", CANCER RES., (20040615), vol. 64, no. 12, pages 4263 - 9
    - AL-SHAER MH., "C-reactive protein and risk of colon cancer", JAMA, (20040616), vol. 291, no. 23, page 2819
    - SKRZYDLEWSKA E, "Lipid peroxidation and antioxidant status in colorectal cancer", WORLD J GASTROENTEROL., (20050121), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 403 - 6
    - BOYD-KIMBAII D, "Rodent Abeta(I-42) exhibits oxidative stress properties similar to those of human Abeta(1-42): Implications for proposed mechanisms of toxicity", J ALZHEIMER'S DIS., (200410), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 515 - 25
    - DEMOPOULOS ET AL., FED. PROC., (1973), vol. 32, pages 1859 - 1861
    - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 84, pages 1404 - 1407
    - MASSEY, K. D.; BURTON, K. P., AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1989), vol. 256, no. 25, pages H1192 - H1199
    - TILL, G.O., AM J. PATHOL., (198907), vol. 1325, no. 1, pages 195 - 202
    - BOSE, B, BIOTECHNOL APPL. BIOCHEM, (1990), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 557 - 61
    - SOMER, E., SHAPE MAGAZINE, (199211), pages 33 - 35
    - HAMANKA, H., J. DEMLATOL, (1990), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 595 - 8
    - FUCHS, J., J. INVEST DEMATOL, (198912), vol. 93, no. 6, pages 769 - 73
    - PELLE, E., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (199012), vol. 283, no. 2, pages 234 - 40
    - YUKIE, N., DEMATOLGICA, (1989), vol. 179, pages 101 - 106
    - BARBOSA DS, "Decreased oxidative stress in patients with ulcerative colitis supplemented with fish oil omega-3 fatty acids", NUTRITION, (200310), vol. 19, no. 10, pages 837 - 42
    - EUR J CLIN INVEST., (198208), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 351 - 9
    - FANTONE, J. C.; WARD, P. A., AM. J, OF PATH., (1982), vol. 107, no. 3, pages 397 - 418
    - BAKER, C. H. ET AL., CIRC. SHOCK, (1986), vol. 20, pages 127 - 139
    - POWELL, J. ET AL., CRITICAL CARE MED., (1991), vol. 19, no. 5
    - HURD, T. C. ET AL., ARCHIVES OF SURG., (1988), vol. 123
    - MCKECHNIE, K. ET AL., CIRC. SHOCK, (1986), vol. 19, pages 429 - 439
    - FISCHMAN, C. M., THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1981), vol. 127, no. 6, pages 2257 - 2262
    - HAMILOS, D. L.; WEDNER, H., JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 135, no. 4
    - ECK, H.-P; DROGE, W., BIO. CHEM. HOPPE-SEYLER, vol. 370, pages 109 - 113
    - ECK, H. -P ET AL., BIOL. CHEM. HOPPE-SEYLER, vol. 370, pages 101 - 108
    - KALEBIC, T. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1991), vol. 88, pages 986 - 90
    - ROEDER, M. ET AL., PORC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., vol. 87, pages 4884 - 4888
    - LIPSKY, P. E., J. CLIN, INVEST., (1984), vol. 73, page 53
    - EL-HAG, A. ET AL., J. OF IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 136, no. 9
    - MEERHOF, L. J.; ROOS, D., RETICULENDOTHEL. SOC., vol. 28, page 419
    - KRAUT, E. H.; SAGONE, A. L., J. OF LAB. CLIN. MED., (198111), pages 697 - 703
    - WEISS, S. J., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 225, pages 9912 - 9917
    - HEBBEL, R. P. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1982), vol. 70, pages 1253 - 1259
    - VINCENT, ENDOCR REV, (200408), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 612 - 28
    - VINCENT ET AL., ENDOCR REV., (200408), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 612 - 28
    - PASAOGLU ET AL., TOHOKU J EXP MED., (200407), vol. 203, no. 3, pages 211 - 8
    - NOMIKOS ET AL., IMMUNOL CELL BIOL, (1989), vol. 67, pages 85 - 87
    - DRASH AL ET AL., AM J CARDIOL, (1988), vol. 62, pages 27B - 30B
    - TABATABAIE ET AL., FEBS LETT, (1997), vol. 407, pages 148 - 152
    - LENZEN ET AL., FREE RADICAL BIOL. MED., (1996), vol. 20, pages 463 - 466
    - RABINOVITCH ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (1996), vol. 81, pages 3197 - 3202
    - OHKAWA ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEMO, (1979), vol. 95, pages 351 - 358
    - MCCORD ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1969), vol. 244, pages 6049 - 6055
    - BEERS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1952), vol. 195, pages 133 - 140
    - CARRILLO ET AL., LIFE SCI., (1991), vol. 48, pages 517 - 521
    - BHATTACHARYA ET AL., PHYTOIHER, RES., (2000), vol. 14, pages 174 - 179
    - SOTO ET AL., CONIP BIOCHEM. PHYSIOL C. TOXICOL. PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 136, pages 205 - 212
    - BHATTACHARYA ET AL., INDIAN J. EXP. BIOL., (1997), vol. 35, pages 236 - 239
    - BRIDI ET AL., PHYTOTHER. RES., (2001), vol. 15, pages 449 - 451
    - LUCZAJ ET AL., J. TOXICOL. ENVIRON. HEALTH A, (2004), vol. 67, pages 595 - 606
    - REDDY ET AL., FOOD CHEM., TOXICOL., (1994), vol. 32, pages 279 - 283
    - SINGH ET AL., PHYTOMEDICINE, (2000), vol. 7, pages 209 - 219
    - NAIDU ET AL., INDIAN J. EXP. BIOL., (2002), vol. 40, pages 894 - 900
    - BHATTACHARYA ET AL., PHYTOTHER, RES., (2000), vol. 14, pages 174 - 179
    - SOTO ET AL., COMP BIOCHEM. PHYSIOL C. TOXICOL. PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 136, pages 205 - 212
    - SKUKLA ET AL., PHYTOTHER. RES., (1999), vol. 13, pages 50 - 54
    - OHKAWA ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1979), vol. 95, pages 351 - 358
    - BEERS, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1952), vol. 195, pages 133 - 140
    - GUTTERIDGE, J. APPL. BIOCHEM., (1983), vol. 5, pages 293 - 299
    - LIU ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 245, pages 161 - 166
    - GUTTERIDGE ET AL., 1. APPL. BIOCHEM., (1983), vol. 5, pages 293 - 299
    - WALTER ET AL., J. AM. COLL. CARDIOL., (2004), vol. 44, pages 1996 - 2002
    - MCCORD, FREE RADICAL BIOL. MED., (1988), vol. 4, pages 9 - 14
    - KONO, J BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 257, pages 5751 - 5754
    - BLUM ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1985), vol. 240, pages 500 - 508
    - BRAY ET AL., BIOCHEM. J, (1974), vol. 139, pages 43 - 48
    - LARINI ET AL., FREE RADIC. RES., (2004), vol. 38, pages 509 - 516
    - LI., J., "Is hypertension an inflammatory disease?", MED HYPOTHESES, (2005), vol. 64, no. 2, pages 236 - 240
    - SCHIFFRIN EL., "Vascular stiffening and arterial compliance: implications for systolic blood pressure", AM J HYPERTENS, (200412), vol. 17, pages 39S - 48S
other   - "Kushta Gau Danti", TKDL, Database accession no. MA3/528, XP003024336
    - MOHAMMAD KABIRUDDIN, Bayaaz-e-Kabir, (1938), page 142
    - "Brähmi", TKDL, Database accession no. RS/3318A, XP003024337
    - MADANAPÄLA, Madanapälanighantauh, (1998), page 52
    - "Dawa Barae Amraaz-e-Dimagh Wa Junoon", TKDL, Database accession no. NA2504H, XP003024338
    - GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), page 784
    - "Chai", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/324, XP003024339
    - GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), pages 342 - 343
    - "Kankar/Harshaf", TKDL, Database accession no. MH2/128, XP003024340
    - ZIYAAL-DIN ABDULLAH IBN AL BANTAR, Al-Jaam'c-li-Mufradaat-al-Advia- wal-Aghzia, (1874), page 87
    - "Brähmigunaäh 2", TKDL, Database accession no. RS/4749, XP003024341
    - Brhat Nighantu Ratnäkara, (1997), page 349
    - "Dawa-e-deegar", TKDL, Database accession no. Ja7/319W, XP003024342
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1887), page 166
    - "Nuskha-e-zulal", TKDL, Database accession no. FA1/328E1, XP003024343
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1899), page 175
    - "Haridra Arka Gunah", TKDL, Database accession no. AK14/51B, XP003024344
    - LANKAPATIRÄVANA, Arkaprakäsah, (1995), page 44