Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2368577

EP2368577 - Methods for treating interleukin-6 related diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.11.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
17.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo 115 / JP
[2011/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Okuda, Osamu
c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-Chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 1048301 / JP
02 / Yoshida, Noriaki
c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-Chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8324 / JP
03 / Maini, Ravinder Nath
151 Castelnau Barnes
London, SW13 9EW / GB
 [2011/39]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/39]Dempster, Robert Charles
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date10180308.828.04.2004
[2011/39]
Priority number, dateGB2003000961928.04.2003         Original published format: GB 0309619
[2011/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2368577
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2368577
Date:14.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395
[2011/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Behandlung von Erkrankungen im Zusammenhang mit Interleukin-6[2011/39]
English:Methods for treating interleukin-6 related diseases[2011/39]
French:Procédés permettant de traiter les maladies associées à l'interleukine 6[2011/39]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure14.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/43]
09.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2016Observations by third parties
01.04.2016Observations by third parties
29.04.2016Observations by third parties
02.05.2016Observations by third parties
18.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.06.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination11.08.2016Appeal received No.  T2468/16
12.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04730090.0  / EP1617869
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040730090) is  07.01.2008
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.11.2015Request for further processing filed
19.11.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.12.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.11.2013Request for further processing filed
01.11.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.11.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
15.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
16.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
16.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
09.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
19.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
16.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - MAINI R N ET AL, "THERAPEUTIC EFFICACY OF MULTIPLE INTRAVENOUS INFUSIONS OF ANTI-TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR ALPHA MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY COMBINED WITH LOW-DOSE WEEKLY METHOTREXATE IN RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, (19980901), vol. 41, no. 9, doi:10.1002/1529-0131(199809)41:9<1552::AID-ART5>3.0.CO;2-W, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 1552 - 1563, XP009037353 [X] 1-3,9,12-14 * abstract * [Y] 4-8,10,11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1529-0131(199809)41:9<1552::AID-ART5>3.0.CO;2-W
 [A]  - MAINI RAVINDER N ET AL, "How does infliximab work in rheumatoid arthritis?", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH 2002 LNKD- PUBMED:12110154, (2002), vol. 4 Suppl 2, ISSN 1465-9913, pages S22 - S28, XP002667776 [A] 1-14 * figure 2a *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar549
 [Y]  - NN, "Late Phase II clinical trial results of MRA for Rheumatoid Arthritis", (20020528), Chugai press release, URL: http://www.chugai-pharm.co.jp/hc/ss/downloads/pre00216.pdf?blobheader=application%2Fpdf&blobheadername1=content-disposition&blobheadervalue1=inline%3Bfilename%3Dpre00216.pdf&blobwhere=1259614737714&ssbinary=true, (20120123), XP002667777 [Y] 4-8,10,11 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - NN, "Late Phase II clinical trial results of MRA for Rheumatoid Arthritis announced at 66th Annual Scientific Meeting of the American College of Rheumatology", (20021029), Chugai press release, URL: http://www.chugai-pharm.co.jp/hc/ss/downloads/pre00237.pdf?blobheader=application%2Fpdf&blobheadername1=content-disposition&blobheadervalue1=inline%3Bfilename%3Dpre00237.pdf&blobwhere=1259616367568&ssbinary=true, (20120123), XP002667778 [Y] 4-8,10,11 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - NISHIMOTO N ET AL, "Safety and efficacy of repetitive treatment with humanized anti-interleukin-6 receptor antibody (MRA) in rheumatoid arthritis", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, (20020101), vol. 44, no. S9-191, ISSN 0004-3591, page S84, XP002298380 [Y] 4-8,10,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - CHOY E H S ET AL, "Therapeutic benefit of blocking interleukin-6 activity with an anti-interleukin-6 receptor monoclonal antibody in rheumatoid arthritis: a randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled, dose-escalation trial", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, (20021201), vol. 46, no. 12, doi:10.1002/ART.10623, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 3143 - 3150, XP002298379 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.10623
 [A]  - MIHARA M ET AL, "HUMINIZED ANTIBODY TO HUMAN INTERLEUKIN-6 RECEPTOR INHIBITS THE DEVELOPMENT OF COLLAGEN ARTHRITIS IN CYNOMOLGUS MONKEYS", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (20010301), vol. 98, no. 3, doi:10.1006/CLIM.2000.4989, ISSN 1521-6616, pages 319 - 326, XP001069970 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/clim.2000.4989
by applicantWO9219759
 WO9611020
 WO9612503
 WO9842377
 WO9947170
 WO0203492
 WO02080969
 EP0325474
 JPH03155795
 JPH03219894
 US5571513
 JPH08291199
 EP0411946
 JPH0159878B
 WO9312227
 WO9203918
 WO9402602
 WO9425585
 WO9634096
 WO9633735
 JPH03139293
 EP0125023
 EP0239400
 WO9201047
 WO9220791
 WO9306213
 WO9311236
 WO9319172
 WO9501438
 WO9515388
 WO9630394
 WO9411523
 WO9618648
 WO9617869
 JPH02188600
 JPH07324097
 JPH08311098
 US5210075
    - HIRANO, T. ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 324, pages 73 - 76
    - AKIRA, S. ET AL., ADV. IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 54, pages 1 - 78
    - LOTZ, M. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1988), vol. 167, pages 1253 - 1258
    - TAGA, T. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1987), vol. 166, pages 967 - 981
    - YAMASAKI, K. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 241, pages 825 - 828
    - MATSUDA, T. ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 18, pages 951 - 956
    - SATO, K. ET AL., THE 21ST PROCEEDINGS OF THE JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 21, page 166
    - EUR. J.BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 168, pages 543 - 550
    - J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 140, pages 1534 - 1541
    - AGR. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 54, pages 2685 - 2688
    - TAMURA, T. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 11924 - 11928
    - HIRATA, Y. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 143, pages 2900 - 2906
    - YASUKAWA, K. ET AL., J. BIOCHEM., vol. 108, pages 673 - 676
    - KEARNEY, J. F. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1979), vol. 123, pages 1548 - 1550
    - CURRENT TOPICS IN MICROBIOLOGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (1978), vol. 81, pages 1 - 7
    - KOHLER, G.; MILSTEIN, C., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 6, pages 511 - 519
    - MARGULIES D.H. ET AL., CELL, (1976), vol. 8, pages 405 - 415
    - SHULMAN, M. ET AL., NATURE, (1978), vol. 276, pages 269 - 270
    - DE ST. GROTH, S.F. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, METHODS, (1980), vol. 35, pages 1 - 21
    - TROWBRIDGE, I.S., J. EXP. MED., (1978), vol. 148, pages 311 - 323
    - GALFRE, G. ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, pages 131 - 133
    - KOHLER G.; MILSTEIN C., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1981), vol. 73, pages 3 - 46
    - CHIRGWIN, J.M. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 18, pages 5294 - 5299
    - CHOMCZYNSKI, P. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 162, pages 156 - 159
    - FROHMAN, M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 8998 - 9002
    - BELYAVSKY A. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 2919 - 2932
    - SATO, K. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 851 - 856
    - MULLIGAN, R. C. ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, pages 108 - 114
    - MIZUSHIMA, S; NAGATA, S., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 5322
    - WARD, E. S. ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546
    - WARD, E. S. ET AL., FASEB J., (1992), vol. 6, pages 2422 - 2427
    - BETTER, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043
    - LEI, S. P. ET AL., BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, pages 4379 - 4383
    - EBERT, K. M. ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 12, pages 699 - 702
    - MAEDA, S. ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, pages 592 - 594
    - JULIAN, K. C.; MA ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 131 - 138
    - CO, M. S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 2968 - 2976
    - BETTER, M.; HORWITZ, A. E., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 178, pages 476 - 496
    - PLUECKTHUN, A.; SKERRA, A., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 178, pages 476 - 496
    - LAMOYI, E., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 121, pages 652 - 663
    - ROUSSEAUX, J. ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 121, pages 663 - 66
    - BIRD, R. E. ET AL., TIBTECH, (1991), vol. 9, pages 132 - 137
    - HUSTON, J. S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883
    - VRIEND ET AL., MOL. GRAPHICS, (1990), vol. 8, pages 52 - 56
    - BRAKENHOFF ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 86 - 93
    - SAVINO ET AL., EMBO J., (1994), vol. 13, pages 1357 - 1367
    - ZOKU IYAKUHIN, KAIHATU, Peptide Gosei, HIROKAWA SHOTEN, (1991), vol. 14
    - YAMASAKI, K. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 825 - 828
    - CHEN, C. ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1987), vol. 7, pages 2745 - 2751
    - URLAUB, G. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220
    - HIRANO, T. ET AL., IMMUNOL. LETT., (1988), vol. 17, page 41
    - Selective Methods in Cellular Immunology, W. H. FREEMAN AND CO., (1980), page 351
    - HIRANO, Y. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 143, pages 2900 - 2906
    - HIRANO, T. ET AL., IMMUNOL. LETT., (1988), vol. 17, pages 41 - 45
    - SAITO, T. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 168 - 173
    - MATSUDA, T. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 18, pages 951 - 956