Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2325304

EP2325304 - Modified DNA polymerases for improved incorporation of nucleotide analogues [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.04.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illumina Cambridge Limited
Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden
Essex CB10 1XL / GB
[2011/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Smith, Geoffrey Paul
Illumina Cambridge Limited
Chesterford Research Park
Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
02 / Bailey, David Mark Dunstan
Illumina Cambridge Limited
Chesterford Research Park
Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
03 / Earnshaw, David James
Illumina Cambridge Limited
Chesterford Research Park
Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
04 / Sanches, Raquel Maria
Illumina Cambridge Limited
Chesterford Research Park
Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
05 / Swerdlow, Harold
Illumina Cambridge Limited
Chesterford Research Park
Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
 [2012/19]
Former [2011/21]01 / Smith, Geoffrey Paul
Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
02 / Bailey, David Mark Dunstan
Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
03 / Earnshaw, David James
Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
04 / Sanches, Raquel Maria
Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
05 / Swerdlow, Harold
Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2013/24]Murphy, Colm Damien
Ipulse (IP) Ltd. Carrington House 123-130-Regent Street
London W1B 5SE / GB
Former [2012/19]Barnes, Colin Lloyd
Stratagem IPM Limited
Forsters Wing, Anstey Hall
Maris Lane
Trumpington
Cambridge CB2 9LG / GB
Former [2011/21]Barnes, Colin Lloyd
Stratagem IPM Limited Forsters Wing, Anstey Hall Maris Lane Trumpington
Cambridge CB2 9LG / GB
Application number, filing date10180445.810.09.2004
[2011/21]
Priority number, dateGB2003002130611.09.2003         Original published format: GB 0321306
[2011/21]
Previously filed application, dateWO2004GB0389110.09.2004
[2011/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2325304
Date:25.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2325304
Date:09.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/12
[2011/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/21]
TitleGerman:Modifizierte DNA-Polymerasen zur verbesserten Inkorporation von Nukleotidanaloga[2011/21]
English:Modified DNA polymerases for improved incorporation of nucleotide analogues[2011/21]
French:ADN polymérases modifiées pour une meilleure intégration d'analogues de nucléotides[2011/21]
Examination procedure08.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.2011Examination requested  [2011/51]
03.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2012Fee for grant paid
05.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04768438.6  / EP1664287
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040768438) is  02.05.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.02.2013  15.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kilger, Christian
c/o Fanelli Haag & Kilger PLLC
Fasanenstr. 29
10719 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Fasanenstrasse 29
10719 Berlin / DE
 02  08.02.2013  15.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Froud, Clive
Clive Froud & Co Limited
7 Hurst Close
Tenterden
Kent Tn30 6UG / GB
Opponent's representative
Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2014/29]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2013  15.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kilger, Christian
c/o Fanelli Haag & Kilger PLLC
Fasanenstr. 29
10719 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Fanelli Haag Kilger PLLC
Fasanenstrasse 29
10719 Berlin / DE
 02  08.02.2013  15.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Froud, Clive
Clive Froud & Co Limited
7 Hurst Close
Tenterden
Kent Tn30 6UG / GB
Opponent's representative
Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2013/14]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2013   
Kilger, Christian
c/o Fanelli Haag & Kilger PLLC
Fasanenstr. 29
10719 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Fanelli Haag Kilger PLLC
Fasanenstrasse 29
10719 Berlin / DE
 02  08.02.2013   
Froud, Clive
Clive Froud & Co Limited
7 Hurst Close
Tenterden
Kent Tn30 6UG / GB
22.03.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.10.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.12.2014Appeal received No.  T2248/14
20.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
26.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
27.09.201003   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2011
27.09.201004   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2011
27.09.201005   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2011
27.09.201006   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2011
30.09.201007   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2011
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.09.2004
AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
CZ09.05.2012
EE09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
IT09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
RO09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
SK09.05.2012
TR09.05.2012
BG09.08.2012
GR10.08.2012
ES20.08.2012
IE10.09.2012
LU10.09.2012
PT10.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
CZ09.05.2012
EE09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
IT09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
RO09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
SK09.05.2012
TR09.05.2012
BG09.08.2012
GR10.08.2012
ES20.08.2012
IE10.09.2012
LU10.09.2012
PT10.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2014/21]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
CZ09.05.2012
EE09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
IT09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
RO09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
SK09.05.2012
TR09.05.2012
BG09.08.2012
GR10.08.2012
ES20.08.2012
IE10.09.2012
PT10.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2013/34]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
CZ09.05.2012
EE09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
IT09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
RO09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
SK09.05.2012
BG09.08.2012
GR10.08.2012
ES20.08.2012
IE10.09.2012
PT10.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2013/33]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
CZ09.05.2012
EE09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
IT09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
RO09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
SK09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
ES20.08.2012
IE10.09.2012
PT10.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2013/11]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
CZ09.05.2012
EE09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
IT09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
RO09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
SK09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
Former [2013/10]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
CZ09.05.2012
EE09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
RO09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
SK09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
Former [2013/09]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
EE09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
Former [2013/04]BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
Former [2013/01]CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
SI09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
Former [2012/49]CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
PL09.05.2012
Former [2012/48]FI09.05.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03054139  (HOGREFE HOLLY ; HANSEN CONNI JO (US); SORGE JOSEPH A (US); STRATAGENE) [A] 1-15 * page 6, line 10 - line 28 *;
 [A]WO0132887  (STRATAGENE INC) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 24 *;
 [A]WO0123411  (NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS INC ; JACK WILLIAM E (US); GARDNER ANDREW F (US)) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0701000  (NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS INC) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [AP]WO2004039947  (HOGREFE HOLLY ; AREZI BAHRAM (US); SORGE JOSEPH A (US); STRATAGENE INC) [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GARDNER ANDREW F ET AL, "Determinants of nucleotide sugar recognition in an archaeon DNA polymerase", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19990615), vol. 27, no. 12, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2545 - 2553, XP002163101 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/27.12.2545
 [A]  - QUN DONG ET AL, "Mutational studies of human DNA polymerase alpha: Identification of residues critical for deoxynucleotide binding and misinsertion fidelity of DNA synthesis", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 268, no. 32, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 24163 - 24174, XP002309457 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - RODRIGUEZ A C ET AL, "Crystal structure of a pol alpha family DNA polymerase from the hyperthermophilic archaeon Thermococcus sp. 9N-7", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20000602), vol. 299, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 447 - 462, XP004469030 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2000.3728
 [A]  - SOUTHWORTH M W ET AL, "CLONING OF THERMOSTABLE DNA POLYMERASES FROM HYPERTHERMOPHILIC MARINE ARCHEA WITH EMPHASIS ON THERMOCOCCUS SP. 9 N-7 AND MUTATIONS AFFECTING 3'-5' EXONUCLEASE ACTIVITY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19960528), vol. 93, no. 11, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5281 - 5285, XP000652319 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.11.5281
 [A]  - GARDNER ANDREW F ET AL, "Acyclic and dideoxy terminator preferences denote divergent sugar recognition by archaeon and Taq DNA polymerases", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20020115), vol. 30, no. 2, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 605 - 613, XP002309458 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LUTZ M J ET AL, "Recognition of a Non-Standard Base Pair by thermostable DNA Polymerases", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19980519), vol. 8, no. 10, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1149 - 1152, XP004137037 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00177-2