Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2301763

EP2301763 - Method for producing imitation branches and imitation branch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/13]Method for producing imitation branches and imitation branch
[2013/22]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.10.2013
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solidor bvba
Lauwbergstraat 124b
8930 Lauwe / BE
[2013/46]
Former [2011/13]For all designated states
Solidor bvba
Lauwbergerstraat 124b
8930 Lauwe / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Dejans, Emmanuel
Lauwbergstraat 124b
8930 Lauwe / BE
02 / Dejans, Olivier
Lauwbergstraat 124b
8930 Lauwe / BE
 [2013/46]
Former [2011/13]01 / Dejans, Emmanuel
Lauwbergstraat 124b
8930 Lauwe / BE
02 / Dejans, Olivier
Lauwbergstraat 124b
8930 Lauwe / BE
Representative(s)Ostyn, Frans
KOB NV
President Kennedypark 31 c
8500 Kortrijk / BE
[N/P]
Former [2013/46]Ostyn, Frans
President Kennedypark 31C
8500 Kortrijk / BE
Former [2011/13]Ostyn, Frans
President Kennedypark 31C
8500 Kortrijk / BE
Application number, filing date10180635.428.09.2010
[2011/13]
Priority number, dateBE2009000059729.09.2009         Original published format: BE 200900597
[2011/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2301763
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2301763
Date:13.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:B44C5/06, A41G1/00, B29C47/88, B29C47/00
[2013/22]
Former International [2011/13]B44C5/06, A41G1/00, B29C47/88
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/13]
Extension statesBA28.09.2011
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Imitationszweigen und Imitation eines Zweiges[2016/44]
English:Method for producing imitation branches and imitation branch[2016/44]
French:Procédé de production de branches d'imitation et branche d'imitation[2016/44]
Former [2011/13]Verfahren zur Herstellung von Imitationszweigen und Imitation eines Zweiges
Former [2011/13]Method for producing imitation branches and imitation branch
Former [2011/13]Procédé de production de branches d'imitation et branche d'imitation
Examination procedure28.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/45]
05.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2013Fee for grant paid
02.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13182673.7  / EP2682277
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.06.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.08.2014  14.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
NMC S.A.
Gert-Noël-Strasse
4731 Eynatten / BE
Opponent's representative
Office Freylinger
P.O. Box 48
8001 Strassen / LU
 [2014/38]
17.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition29.11.2016Appeal received No.  T2597/16
20.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.09.2010
AL13.11.2013
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
MK13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
SM13.11.2013
TR13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
IE28.09.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU28.09.2010
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
MK13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
SM13.11.2013
TR13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
IE28.09.2014
Former [2016/33]HU28.09.2010
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
SM13.11.2013
TR13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
IE28.09.2014
Former [2016/32]HU28.09.2010
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
SM13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
IE28.09.2014
Former [2016/28]BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
MT13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
SM13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
IE28.09.2014
Former [2016/22]CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
SM13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
IE28.09.2014
Former [2015/37]CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
IE28.09.2014
Former [2015/20]CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2015/14]CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/41]CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
PL13.11.2013
RO13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/36]CY13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/26]CY13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/25]FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
LV13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI13.11.2013
HR13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
IS13.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI13.11.2013
LT13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
Former [2014/20]LT13.11.2013
NO13.02.2014
Documents cited:Search[YDA]US3664790  (HOLLANDER IRVIN) [YD] 8-11 * the whole document * [A] 1-7;
 [YA]US5565159  (CYKANA DANIEL [US], et al) [Y] 8-11 * the whole document * [A] 1-7;
 [YD]NL1032935C  (FRESCO DAVID AARON [NL], et al) [YD] 10,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2818057  (TREJO GONZALEZ HUMBERTO) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2005174  (SCHEER & CIE C F) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2738768  (PEYTRAL GINA [FR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4030274  (REAL GMBH) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5562956  (WHITE JR HAVES R [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3280847  (CHISHOLM DOUGLAS S, et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantNL1032935C
 US3664790