Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2266573 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2266573



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3396
31.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 6
31.01.2019 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 5
30.01.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.01.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.01.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
21.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.01.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 52
21.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
21.01.2019 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 57
21.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.01.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
16.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
16.01.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.01.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.01.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.01.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
07.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
21.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
21.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
21.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.12.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
14.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.12.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 6
14.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
14.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.12.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
14.12.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
06.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
06.12.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 17
06.12.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 18
06.12.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 27
06.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.12.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
15.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
15.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
15.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
15.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
15.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
15.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
11.10.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
26.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.09.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.09.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
10.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
10.09.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 19
10.09.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.09.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.09.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 36
22.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.05.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 6
16.05.2018 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
16.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
16.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
14.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
11.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
11.05.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.05.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.05.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
11.05.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.05.2018 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 3
09.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.05.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
04.05.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
04.05.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
04.05.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
04.05.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
04.05.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
04.05.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
30.04.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
30.04.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
30.04.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
30.04.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
26.04.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.04.2018 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 6
16.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.04.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 39
16.04.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 41
16.04.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 38
16.04.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
16.04.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
16.04.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 18
08.03.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
12.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
08.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.02.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 39
08.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.02.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
06.12.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 5
30.11.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.11.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 16
28.11.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 42
28.11.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 17
28.11.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 42
28.11.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 33
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.11.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 45
21.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
10.08.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.08.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 6
26.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
20.07.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
20.07.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 36
20.07.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
20.07.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
20.07.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
20.07.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.07.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.07.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.07.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
06.06.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
10.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
10.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
10.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
10.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
08.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 30
08.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 30
08.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 30
08.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 30
08.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 30
08.05.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
05.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
05.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
05.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
05.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
04.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.05.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.05.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.05.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.05.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.05.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
16.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 84
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 64
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
08.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 193
08.03.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.03.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
08.03.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 50
07.03.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.02.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.02.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 18
30.11.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.11.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.11.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
24.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 32
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 93
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
21.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
18.11.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
18.11.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 30
17.11.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
17.11.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 3
17.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.11.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
06.10.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
19.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
08.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.09.2016 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 34
28.04.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
28.04.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.04.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.04.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.04.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.04.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.03.2016 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
17.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
17.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
17.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
17.03.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
17.03.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
16.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.03.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
16.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
14.03.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
08.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
08.03.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.03.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
08.03.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
26.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.02.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
16.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
16.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.02.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.02.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
16.02.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
12.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.11.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
29.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
29.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
29.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
29.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.10.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
29.10.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
29.10.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
17.06.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.05.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.05.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
22.04.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
22.04.2015 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 28
16.04.2015 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 9
16.04.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 15
16.04.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
23.12.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.12.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
23.12.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
23.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.12.2014 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 14
08.12.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 11
08.12.2014 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
05.12.2014 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 3
01.12.2014 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.11.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.07.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
25.03.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.03.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.01.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.01.2014 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
13.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
13.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
13.12.2013 Request for further processing Search / examination 9
03.12.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.11.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
14.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.11.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
07.10.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.07.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.06.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.03.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 16
01.03.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
01.03.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
01.03.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.12.2011 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
14.12.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
20.10.2011 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
11.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.10.2011 Annex Search / examination 2
11.10.2011 Annex Search / examination 2
11.10.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
11.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 15
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
11.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 15
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
11.10.2011 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
11.10.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
11.10.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
01.08.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
21.06.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.06.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.04.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.04.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.04.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
17.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
17.12.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.12.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.12.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 European search report Search / examination 4
28.09.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
28.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
28.09.2010 Description Search / examination 19
28.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Drawings Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 General authorisation Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
06.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 22
06.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 22