Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2264530

EP2264530 - Lithographic apparatus and device manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.10.2013
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.11.2013  [2013/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASML Netherlands BV
De Run 6501
5504 DR Veldhoven / NL
[2010/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Baselmans, Johannes
De Kruik 1
5688 GG Oirschot / NL
02 / Donders, Sjoerd
Helvoirtseweg 39
5261 CA Vught / NL
03 / Hoogendam, Christiaan
Aan de Heerstraat 28
5563 AR Westerhoven / NL
04 / Mertens, Jeroen
Kerkbeemd 11
5511 AM Knegsel / NL
05 / Mulkens, Johannes
Mahonia 1
5552 MA Valkenswaard / NL
06 / Streefkerk, Bob
Esdoornstraat 31
5038 PE Tilburg / NL
 [2010/51]
Representative(s)van Os, Lodewijk Hubertus
ASML Netherlands B.V.
Corporate Intellectual Property
De Run 6501
P.O. Box 324
5500 AH Veldhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2010/51]van Os, Lodewijk Hubertus
ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O. Box 324
NL-5500 AH Veldhoven / NL
Application number, filing date10180805.319.12.2005
[2010/51]
Priority number, dateUS2004002560330.12.2004         Original published format: US 25603
[2010/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2264530
Date:22.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/20
[2010/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2010/51]
TitleGerman:Lithographischer Apparat und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Vorrichtung[2010/51]
English:Lithographic apparatus and device manufacturing method[2010/51]
French:Appareil lithographique et procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif[2010/51]
Examination procedure15.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/30]
28.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/47]
16.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/47]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05257813.5  / EP1677156
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050257813) is  31.08.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0834773  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1,3-15 * abstract * * figures 1,9,10,11A,11B * * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 27, line 35 - column 31, line 37 *;
 [E]EP1643543  (NIKON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0025] - [0059] *;
 [E]EP1646074  (NIKON CORP [JP]) [E] 1,3-7,9-12 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0022] - [0072] *
by applicantUS4509852
 WO9949504
 US20040844575
 US20030705783
 EP20030257072