Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2298188

EP2298188 - Surgical stapling device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2013
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2015New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2012/52]
Former [2011/12]For all designated states
Tyco Healthcare Group LP
150 Glover Avenue
Norwalk, CT 06856 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Racenet, David
1390 Bartholomew Road
Middletown, CT, 06457 / US
02 / Wells, Timothy N.
82 Jacqueline Drive
Manchester, CT, 06040 / US
 [2013/13]
Former [2011/12]01 / Racenet, David
1390 Bartholomew Road
Middletown, CT, 06457 / US
02 / Wells, Timothy N.
82 Jacqueline Drive
Manchester, CT, 06040 / US
Representative(s)Maschio, Antonio
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Maschio, Antonio
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
20 Carlton Crescent
Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB
Former [2013/13]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2011/12]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10180926.712.10.2001
[2011/12]
Priority number, dateUS2000068781513.10.2000         Original published format: US 687815
[2011/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2298188
Date:23.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2298188
Date:27.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/072
[2011/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2011/12]
TitleGerman:Chirurgische Klammervorrichtung[2011/12]
English:Surgical stapling device[2011/12]
French:Dispositif d'agrafe chirurgicale[2011/12]
Examination procedure13.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/43]
21.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2013Fee for grant paid
04.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01979759.6  / EP1324707
EP08005473.7  / EP1938763
EP10165207.1  / EP2233083
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010979759) is  09.03.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.12.2013  09.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US
Opponent's representative
Tunstall, Christopher Stephen
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [2014/07]
04.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
09.04.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.04.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition09.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1176/15
19.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT27.03.2013
ES08.07.2013
[2014/11]
Former [2013/48]ES08.07.2013
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4930503  (PRUITT J CRAYTON [US]) [AD] 1-11 * column 6, lines 21-68; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]US5137198  (NOBIS RUDOLPH H [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 6, line 17 - column 8, line 3; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US5413267  (SOLYNTJES ALAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 9, line 37 - column 11, line 46; figures 2,3 *
by applicantUS4930503
 US5697543
 US5480089