blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2290097 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2290097



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 237
04.01.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.03.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
03.01.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
03.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.08.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.08.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.08.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
30.08.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
30.08.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
04.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.04.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
04.04.2017 Description Search / examination 7
04.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.04.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.10.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.06.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
13.06.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
13.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.06.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.02.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.02.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
21.07.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
21.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.07.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.06.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.06.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
04.02.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.02.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.01.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.08.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
29.08.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.08.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
07.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.01.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 1
07.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.01.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
16.11.2012 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 2
25.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.07.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.07.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
25.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.01.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.01.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.12.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.12.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 3
27.12.2011 European search report Search / examination 5
05.09.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
05.09.2011 Partial European search report Search / examination 5
10.08.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.05.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
02.02.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
28.09.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
28.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
28.09.2010 Description Search / examination 15
28.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Drawings Search / examination 4
28.09.2010 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 5
28.09.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
09.01.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23