Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2267669

EP2267669 - Public transport method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hurpin, Patrick
18 rue Piat
75020 Paris / FR
[2015/14]
Former [2010/52]For all designated states
Hurpin, Patrick
23, rue de l'Ingénieur Robert Keller
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2010/52]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2012/50]Dossmann, Gérard
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
Former [2010/52]Dossmann, Gérard
Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse 8 Avenue Percier
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date10181612.202.03.2007
[2010/52]
Priority number, dateFR2006000184802.03.2006         Original published format: FR 0601848
[2010/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2267669
Date:29.12.2010
Language:FR
[2010/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/00, E04H6/14, G07B15/00
[2010/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/52]
Extension statesAL29.06.2011
BA29.06.2011
HR29.06.2011
MK29.06.2011
RS29.06.2011
TitleGerman:Kollektives Transportverfahren und -system[2010/52]
English:Public transport method and system[2010/52]
French:Procédé et système de transport collectif[2010/52]
Examination procedure29.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/32]
09.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.09.2012
12.09.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
19.09.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/52]
21.09.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/52]
Appeal following examination17.10.2012Appeal received No.  T0369/13
29.01.2013Statement of grounds filed
21.09.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
21.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
29.09.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Petition(s) for review:22.12.2017Petition for review received
 Number:  R0001/18
 for appeal No.  T0369/13-3403
 Petitioner:  APPR
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07731071.2  / EP1989688
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070731071) is  07.01.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
18.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
18.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
23.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201408   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.2014
31.03.201812   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201913   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]CH668324  (SABRINA SA) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0985574  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0024] - [0028] - [0036] - [0041] - [0044] - [0054] - [0058] * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0991031  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0019] - [0022] - [0025] - [0036] - [0045] * * figure - *;
 [A]GB2405634  (THORNTON FREDERICK ALAN [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, lines 5-31 * * figure - *;
 [A]NL1009447C  (VERSTRAETEN BEHEERSMIJ BV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 6 * * figure - *;
 [A]US3587878  (STRANDBERG LENNART, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9827295  (BURATTO FILHO GERALDO FELICIO [BR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 9 * * figure - *;
 [Y]US3136431  (COLBERT CHARLES R) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 42 *;
 [A]US1887245  (BRADLEY MURRAY JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]FR1052294  (MAFFEIS FRANCESCO ITALO) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]CH283670  (VOGLER HEINRICH [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR664603  (BOUZOU ÉLIE-VICTOR) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2830714  (YOUTZ PHILIP N) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE640752  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1841530  (ERNST GEIGER) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantEP0991031