Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2267669 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2267669



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 391
30.10.2019 Refund of fees Appeal 2
29.10.2019 Refund of fees Appeal 2
23.10.2019 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
23.10.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 12
06.05.2019 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
13.12.2018 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 2
07.05.2018 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 9
07.05.2018 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 2
07.05.2018 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
16.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.04.2018 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.02.2018 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
31.01.2018 Composition of the board Appeal 1
10.01.2018 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
30.12.2017 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 9
30.12.2017 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 9
22.12.2017 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 11
22.11.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 2
21.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
20.11.2017 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 2
16.11.2017 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 4
16.11.2017 General enquiry Appeal 2
03.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.10.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 10
24.10.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.09.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.09.2017 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.09.2017 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 4
23.08.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.08.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
31.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.06.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.06.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
08.06.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.02.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
22.12.2015 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
31.08.2015 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
25.02.2015 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Appeal 2
25.02.2015 Refund of fees Appeal 1
28.01.2015 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
26.01.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.01.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
20.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
20.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
13.06.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
13.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
07.05.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
07.06.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
22.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.02.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.01.2013 Claims Appeal 4
29.01.2013 Claims Appeal 4
29.01.2013 Claims Appeal 4
29.01.2013 Claims Appeal 3
29.01.2013 Claims Appeal 4
29.01.2013 Claims Appeal 4
29.01.2013 Claims Appeal 4
29.01.2013 Claims Appeal 3
29.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.01.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
29.01.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
15.11.2012 General enquiry Appeal 1
07.11.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
19.10.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.10.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
19.10.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
17.10.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.10.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.09.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.09.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
19.09.2012 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
19.09.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
19.09.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
10.09.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.09.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.09.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.08.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
31.07.2012 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.06.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
28.06.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.06.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.06.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.05.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
23.05.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.05.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
15.03.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
30.12.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.12.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.09.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
09.09.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.06.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
29.06.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
29.06.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
29.06.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
29.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.01.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.12.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
01.12.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.11.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.11.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 9
19.11.2010 European search report Search / examination 3
29.09.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
29.09.2010 Description Search / examination 18
29.09.2010 Drawings Search / examination 5
29.09.2010 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 5
26.09.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45