blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2305574

EP2305574 - Resealable food container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.10.2018  [2018/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intercontinental Great Brands LLC
100 Deforest Avenue
East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US
[2013/50]
Former [2011/14]For all designated states
Kraft Foods Global Brands LLC
Three Lakes Drive
Northfield, IL 60093 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sierra-Gomez, Gladys
80 Golden Square
Woodbridge, NJ 07095 / US
02 / Peters, Eva Marie
21 Cole Road
Cedar Grove, NJ 07009 / US
 [2011/14]
Representative(s)Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/18]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2011/14]Murray, Adrian D'Coligny
W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London
WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date10181765.806.01.2006
[2011/14]
Priority number, dateUS2005002962606.01.2005         Original published format: US 29626
[2011/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2305574
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2011
ClassificationIPC:B65D75/00
[2011/14]
CPC:
B65D77/003 (EP,US); B65D75/5838 (EP,US); B65D85/36 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/14]
TitleGerman:Wiederversiegelbarer Lebensmittelbehälter[2011/14]
English:Resealable food container[2011/14]
French:Emballage refermable pour aliments[2011/14]
Examination procedure30.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/45]
04.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/40]
16.02.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.07.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/40]
Appeal following examination11.03.2016Appeal received No.  T1629/16
24.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
03.07.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
03.07.2018Date of oral proceedings
06.07.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06100140.0  / EP1679269
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060100140) is  08.02.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3740238  (GRAHAM S) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-4 *;
 [AD]US4840270  (CAPUTO GARRY L [US], et al) [AD] 1-9* column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 63; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US5945145  (NARSUTIS JO ELLEN NIELSEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 5, paragraph 2 - column 6, line 39; figures 1-7 * * column 9, paragraph L - column 10, line 24; figures 30-34 *;
 [I]US6026953  (NAKAMURA KENJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * column 5, paragraph l - column 8, line 55 *;
 [Y]US6113271  (SCOTT BARRY M [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, paragraph 3 *;
 [XDI]US2004206637  (SIERRA-GOMEZ GLADYS ODETTE [US], et al) [XD] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * [I] 2-9
by applicantUS4840270
 US6026953
 USD447054S
 US2002182359
 US2004206637
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.