Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2305574 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2305574



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 406
11.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.09.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.08.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 2
22.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 19
13.08.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.07.2018 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 2
06.07.2018 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 2
06.07.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.07.2018 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 3
29.05.2018 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
25.05.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
11.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Claims Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Claims Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Claims Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Claims Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Claims Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Claims Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Claims Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Claims Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.05.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.05.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
11.05.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 43
12.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.04.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
29.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.03.2018 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
29.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.03.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.03.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.03.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 9
15.03.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.02.2018 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
19.08.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.07.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.07.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.06.2016 Claims Appeal 2
24.06.2016 Claims Appeal 2
24.06.2016 Claims Appeal 2
24.06.2016 Claims Appeal 2
24.06.2016 Description Appeal 2
24.06.2016 Description Appeal 2
24.06.2016 Description Appeal 2
24.06.2016 Description Appeal 2
24.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.06.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
25.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.04.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.03.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.02.2016 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
16.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
16.02.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
16.02.2016 Means of redress Search / examination 2
16.02.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.02.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.01.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.01.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.01.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.01.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
23.12.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
26.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.08.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.08.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.08.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.08.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.03.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
06.03.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.11.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
31.10.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 17
22.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.03.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
11.12.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
11.12.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.07.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
29.06.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
04.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
04.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.05.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
30.01.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.01.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.10.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.10.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.10.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.10.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
04.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.09.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.04.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.03.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
02.03.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.03.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 1
02.03.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
24.02.2011 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
14.02.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
21.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.12.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.11.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.09.2010 Description Search / examination 15
29.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.09.2010 Drawings Search / examination 4
29.09.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
15.02.2006 Priority document Search / examination 25