Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2324867

EP2324867 - Angioplasty balloons drug-coated in an expanded condition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cook Medical Technologies LLC
750 North Daniels Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/10]For all designated states
Cook Medical Technologies LLC
750 North Daniels Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
Former [2012/05]For all designated states
Cook Medical Technologies LLC
750 North Daniels Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
For all designated states
Med Institute, Inc.
1400 Cumberland Avenue P.O. Box 2402 West Lafayette
Indiana 47906 / US
For all designated states
William Cook Europe ApS
Sandet 6
4632 Bjaeverskov / DK
Former [2011/21]For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
750 N. Daniels Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
For all designated states
Med Institute, Inc.
1400 Cumberland Avenue P.O. Box 2402 West Lafayette
Indiana 47906 / US
For all designated states
William Cook Europe ApS
Sandet 6
4632 Bjaeverskov / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Bates, Brian, L.
3718 Exeter Lane
Bloomington, IN IN 47401 / US
02 / Boatman, Scott, E.
920 E. University Street
Bloomington, IN IN 47401 / US
03 / Burton, David, G.
6524 E. Everett Arnold Drive
Bloomington, IN 47408 / US
04 / Hoffa, Michael, C.
9392 Shady Bend
Brownsburg, IN 46112 / US
05 / Ragheb, Anthony, O.
2719 Manchester Street
West Lafayette, IN IN 47906 / US
06 / Schaeffer, Darin, G.
3011 S. Market Place
Bloomington, IN 47403 / US
07 / Sturgeon, Jason, S.
9490 W. Ratliff Road
Spencer, IN 47460 / US
 [2014/04]
Former [2012/43]01 / Bates, Brian, L.
3718 Exeter Lane
Bloomington, IN IN 47401 / US
02 / Boatman, Scott, E.
920 E. University Street
Bloomington, IN IN 47401 / US
03 / Burton, David, G.
6524 E. Everett Arnold Drive
Bloomington, IN 47408 / US
04 / Hoffa, Michael, C.
4207 Morgan Circle
Ellettsville, IN IN 47429 / US
05 / Ragheb, Anthony, O.
2719 Manchester Street
West Lafayette, IN IN 47906 / US
06 / Schaeffer, Darin, G.
3011 S. Market Place
Bloomington, IN 47403 / US
07 / Sturgeon, Jason, S.
9490 W. Ratliff Road
Spencer, IN 47460 / US
Former [2011/21]01 / Bates, Brian, L.
3718 Exeter Lane
Bloomington, IN IN 47401 / US
02 / Boatman, Scott, E.
920 E. University Street
Bloomington, IN IN 47401 / US
03 / Burton, David, G.
6524 E. Everett Arnold Drive
Bloomington, IN 47408 / US
04 / Hoffa, Michael, C.
4207 Morgan Circle
Ellettsville, IN IN 47429 / US
05 / Ragheb, Anthony, O.
2719 Manchester Street
West Lafayette, IN IN 47906 / US
06 / Schaeffer, Darin, G.
2385 Brandon Court
Bloomington, IN IN 47401 / US
07 / Sturgeon, Jason, S.
9490 W. Ratliff Road
Spencer, IN 47460 / US
Representative(s)Jehan, Robert
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[2014/25]
Former [2011/21]Jehan, Robert
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
Application number, filing date10181983.714.07.2003
[2011/21]
Priority number, dateUS20020395434P12.07.2002         Original published format: US 395434 P
[2011/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2324867
Date:25.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2324867
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61L31/16, A61L29/16, A61L27/54
[2011/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/21]
TitleGerman:Angioplastie-Ballons beschichtet mit Pharmazeutika in expandierter Form[2011/21]
English:Angioplasty balloons drug-coated in an expanded condition[2011/21]
French:Ballons d'angioplastie revêtis d'agents pharmaceutiques en forme expansée[2011/21]
Examination procedure29.09.2010Examination requested  [2011/21]
25.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2012Observations by third parties
01.02.2013Observations by third parties
10.05.2013Observations by third parties
11.06.2013Observations by third parties
23.07.2013Date of oral proceedings
09.08.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2014Fee for grant paid
07.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03764655.1  / EP1521603
Divisional application(s)EP14172561.4  / EP2851097
EP19161024.5   Application withdrawn  : 13.06.2019
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030764655) is  10.05.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.07.2014  05.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Medtronic, Inc./Medtronic Vascular Galway/ Invatec S.p.A.
710 Medtronic Parkway/Parkmore Business Park West/
Via Martiri della Libertà 7
Minneapolis MN 55432 US/Ballybrit Galway IE/
25030 Roncadelle (BS) IT / US
Opponent's representative
August Debouzy
6-8, avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
 02  17.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-Chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 03  18.03.2015  17.08.2018  WITHDRAWN
Hemoteq AG
Adenauerstrasse 15
52146 Würselen / DE
Opponent's representative
Arth, Hans-Lothar
ABK Patent Attorneys
Jasminweg 9
14052 Berlin / DE
 04  18.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BIOTRONIK AG
Ackerstrasse 6
8180 Bülach / CH
Opponent's representative
Arth, Hans-Lothar
ABK Patent Attorneys
Jasminweg 9
14052 Berlin / DE
 05  18.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boston Scientific Limited
Clarendon House
2 Church Street
Hamilton HM11 / BM
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [2018/40]
Former [2017/35]
Opponent(s)01  31.07.2014  05.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Medtronic, Inc./Medtronic Vascular Galway/ Invatec S.p.A.
710 Medtronic Parkway/Parkmore Business Park West/
Via Martiri della Libertà 7
Minneapolis MN 55432 US/Ballybrit Galway IE/
25030 Roncadelle (BS) IT / US
Opponent's representative
August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
 02  17.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-Chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 03  18.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hemoteq AG
Adenauerstrasse 15
52146 Würselen / DE
Opponent's representative
Arth, Hans-Lothar
ABK Patent Attorneys
Jasminweg 9
14052 Berlin / DE
 04  18.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BIOTRONIK AG
Ackerstrasse 6
8180 Bülach / CH
Opponent's representative
Randoll, Sören
Biotronik SE & Co. KG
Corporate Intellectual Property
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
 05  18.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boston Scientific Limited
Clarendon House
2 Church Street
Hamilton HM11 / BM
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2015/18]
Opponent(s)01  31.07.2014  05.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Medtronic, Inc./Medtronic Vascular Galway/ Invatec S.p.A.
710 Medtronic Parkway/Parkmore Business Park West/
Via Martiri della Libertà 7
Minneapolis MN 55432 US/Ballybrit Galway IE/
25030 Roncadelle (BS) IT / US
Opponent's representative
August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
 02  17.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-Chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 03  18.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hemoteq AG
Adenauerstrasse 15
52146 Würselen / DE
Opponent's representative
Arth, Hans-Lothar
ABK Patent Attorneys
Jasminweg 9
14052 Berlin / DE
 04  18.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BIOTRONIK AG
Ackerstrasse 6
8180 Bülach / CH
Opponent's representative
Arth, Hans-Lothar
ABK Patent Attorneys
Jasminweg 9
14052 Berlin / DE
 05  18.03.2015  23.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boston Scientific Limited
Clarendon House
2 Church Street
Hamilton HM11 / BM
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2014/37]
Opponent(s)01  31.07.2014  05.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Medtronic, Inc./Medtronic Vascular Galway/ Invatec S.p.A.
710 Medtronic Parkway/Parkmore Business Park West/
Via Martiri della Libertà 7
Minneapolis MN 55432 US/Ballybrit Galway IE/
25030 Roncadelle (BS) IT / US
Opponent's representative
August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
29.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.04.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1390/17
15.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
20.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
16.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
10.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.07.2003
AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
TR18.06.2014
LU14.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
FR18.08.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU14.07.2003
AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
FR18.08.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2016/25]AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
FR18.08.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/36]AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
FR18.08.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/30]AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
FR18.08.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/25]AT18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
FR18.08.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/22]AT18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/20]AT18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/18]AT18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/12]AT18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY18.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9423787  (RAMMLER DAVID H [US]) [X] 1,3,6,12,14-18 * claim - *;
 [A]US2002087123  (HOSSAINY SYED F A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 3, paragraphs 20,21; claim - *;
 [A]EP1181903  (SORIN BIOMEDICA CARDIO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-18 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0850604  (SORIN BIOMEDICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-18 * claim - *;
 [A]US6099561  (ALT ECKHARD [DE]) [A] 1-18 * claim - *;
 [XP]WO03026718  (COOK INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,3,4,6,12,15,17 * the whole document *;
 [AP]US6451373  (HOSSAINY SYED F A [US], et al) [AP] 1-18 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0806212  (MATRIX MEDICAL B V [NL]) [A] 1-18 * claim - *;
 [A]WO0024437  (ASHBY SCIENT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-18 * claim - *
ExaminationWO9908729
 WO0045744
 WO0032267
 WO0021584
 WO0032238
 WO9640348
 US5102402
    - Sigmund Silber ET AL, "The Boston Scientific Antiproliferative, paclitaxel eluting stents (TAXUS)", Handbook of Coronary Stents 4th Ed., London, Martin Dunitz Publishers Ltd, (20010101), pages 311 - 319, XP055060189

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1201/b16798-39
by applicantUS5380299
 US5609629
 US5824049
 US5873904
 US6096070
 US6299604
    - "Proliferation and Migration in Vitro and in Vivo Using Local Drug Delivery", CIRCULATION, (19970715), vol. 96, no. 2, page 636
    - "Drug Therapy", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (19950413), page 1004
 US19970956715
 US19980027054
 US20010850691
otherWO0045744
 WO0032267
 WO0021584
 WO0032238
 WO9640348
 US5102402
 WO0246509
 WO02076509
 WO2004006976