Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2324805

EP2324805 - Absorbent core for an absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.10.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2011/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Busam, Ludwig
Talstr. 17
65510, Hünstetten / DE
02 / Stiehl, Gabriele
Prof. Much-Str. 10
65812, Bad Soden / DE
03 / Tombuelt-Meyer, Thomas
Auf dem Hielig 16
53947, Nettersheim / DE
04 / Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes
Taunusstr. 10 c
65812, Bad Soden / DE
05 / Divo, Michael
Feldbergstr. 14
61381, Friedrichsdorf / DE
06 / Becker, Uwe Jürgen
Kirchheimer Str. 78
53881, Euskirchen / DE
07 / Engel, Roland
Kelkheimer Str. 8
65823, Sulzbach / DE
08 / Lindner, Torsten
Berliner Platz 4
61476, Kronberg / DE
09 / Link, Siegfried
In der Höll 4
53937, Schleiden / DE
10 / Maier, Volker
In den Essigbenden 61
53879, Euskirchen / DE
11 / Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir
40, Champ du Roi
1040, Etterbeek / BE
 [2013/46]
Former [2011/21]01 / Busam, Ludwig
Talstr. 17
65510, Hünstetten / DE
02 / Stiehl, Gabriele
Prof. Much-Str. 10
65812, Bad Soden / DE
03 / Tombuelt-Meyer, Thomas
Auf dem Hielig 16
53947, Nettersheim / DE
04 / Ehrnsperger, Bruno Johannes
Taunusstr. 10 c
65812, Bad Soden / DE
05 / Divo, Michael
Feldbergstr. 14
61381, Friedrichsdorf / DE
06 / Becker, Uwe Jürgen
Kirchheimer Str. 78
53881, Euskirchen / DE
07 / Engel, Roland
Kelkheimer Str. 8
65823, Sulzbach / DE
08 / Lindner, Torsten
Berliner Platz 4
61476, Kronberg / DE
09 / Link, Siegfried
In der Höll 4
53937, Schleiden / DE
10 / Maier, Volker
In den Essigbenden 61
53879, Euskirchen / DE
11 / Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir
40, Champ du Roi
1040, Etterbeek / BE
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/46]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2011/21]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date10182065.212.02.2003
[2011/21]
Previously filed application, dateEP2007012217312.02.2003
[2011/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2324805
Date:25.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2324805
Date:13.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/532, A61F13/536, A61F13/15, A61F13/53, A61F13/539
[2016/19]
Former International [2013/21]A61F13/536, A61F13/539, A61F13/15, A61F13/53
Former International [2011/21]A61F13/15
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/21]
TitleGerman:Saugfähiger Kern für einen saugfähigen Artikel[2011/21]
English:Absorbent core for an absorbent article[2011/21]
French:Partie centrale absorbante pour un article absorbant[2011/21]
Examination procedure14.11.2011Examination requested  [2011/51]
04.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
12.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2013Fee for grant paid
02.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03002678.5  / EP1447067
EP07122173.3  / EP1913912
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030002678) is  07.04.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.08.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Essity Hygiene and Health AB
Essity IP Department
405 03 Göteborg / SE
 [2018/31]
Former [2014/39]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.2014  19.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
22.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition21.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1467/16
30.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
05.04.2013Request for further processing filed
05.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.04.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
12.03.2012Request for further processing filed
12.03.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.03.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
08.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
07.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.02.2003
AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
IE12.02.2014
LU12.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT13.03.2014
ES13.02.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2016/32]HU12.02.2003
AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
IE12.02.2014
LU12.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2016/28]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
IE12.02.2014
LU12.02.2014
GR14.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2016/25]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
BG13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
IE12.02.2014
LU12.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2015/14]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SI13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
IE12.02.2014
LU12.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
IE12.02.2014
LU12.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/46]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
LU12.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/44]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
MC13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
LU12.02.2014
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/41]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
DK13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
CZ13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
SK13.11.2013
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
EE13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
PT13.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT13.11.2013
BE13.11.2013
CY13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
Former [2014/24]AT13.11.2013
FI13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
Former [2014/22]FI13.11.2013
SE13.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US5425725  (TANZER RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 19, line 53 - column 22, line 29; figure - * * column 13, line 28 - column 14, line 37 * * column 28, line 66 - column 29, line 6 *;
 [X]US2002102392  (FISH JEFFREY E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-12,15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0069]; figure - *;
 [X]US3670731  (HARMON CARLYLE) [X] 1,3-5,10-13,15 * column 4, line 71 - column 6, line 6; figures 4-6 *;
 [X]US2002115969  (MAEDA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0120]; figure - *;
 [X]US4055180  (KARAMI HAMZEH) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * column 3, line 23 - line 48 * * column 6, line 25 - line 51; figure - *;
 [AD]US4381783  (ELIAS ROBERT T) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9517868
 EP0724418
 US5425725