Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2281978

EP2281978 - Method of attaching a strip to a floorboard [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Välinge Innovation AB
Prästavägen 513
263 65 Viken / SE
[2016/41]
Former [2011/37]For all designated states
Välinge Innovation AB
Prästavägen 513
263 65 Viken / SE
Former [2011/06]For all designated states
Välinge Innovation AB
Prästavägen 513
260 40 Viken / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Pervan, Darko
Bygatan 30
260 40 Viken / SE
 [2016/41]
Former [2011/06]01 / Pervan, Darko
Bygatan 30
260 40 Viken / SE
Representative(s)Engstrand, Ola , et al
Välinge Innovation AB
Patent Department
Prästavägen 513
263 65 Viken / SE
[2013/24]
Application number, filing date10182278.131.03.2003
[2011/06]
Priority number, dateSE2002000100903.04.2002         Original published format: SE 0201009
SE2003000027131.01.2003         Original published format: SE 0300271
[2011/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2281978
Date:09.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2281978
Date:26.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2281978
Date:12.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/02, B27M3/00, B27M3/04
[2011/43]
Former International [2011/06]E04F15/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/41]
Former [2011/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Befestigung eines Streifens an einer Bodenplatte[2011/06]
English:Method of attaching a strip to a floorboard[2011/06]
French:Procédé de fixation d'une bande à un panneau de plancher[2011/06]
Examination procedure06.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/06]
23.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2016Fee for grant paid
01.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03713157.0  / EP1495197
EP10154336.1  / EP2189590
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030713157) is  11.10.2005
Opposition(s)13.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
06.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
06.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.03.2003
CY12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
PT13.02.2017
IE31.03.2017
LU31.03.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU31.03.2003
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
PT13.02.2017
IE31.03.2017
LU31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
PT13.02.2017
IE31.03.2017
LU31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
PT13.02.2017
LU31.03.2017
Former [2018/01]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/38]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/35]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
GR13.01.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/29]FI12.10.2016
GR13.01.2017
PT13.02.2017
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO0020705  (PERSTORP FLOORING AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2810060  (YKK FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE3343601  (BUETEC GES FUER BUEHNENTECHNIS [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE138992  (DIETRICH, GEBHARD [AT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE142293  (WÄCHTER-LEUZINGER, A. [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9426999
 WO9966151
 WO9966152
 DE4215273
 US4819932
 US4169688
 US5295341
 DE3343601
 JPH06146553
 EP1146182
 WO9627721
 WO0020705
 SE20010000100
 SE20010000101