Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2276175

EP2276175 - Synchronous mirror delay (SMD) circuit and method including a ring oscillator for timing coarse and fine delay intervals technical field [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.11.2013
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
8000 South Federal Way
Boise, ID 83716-9632 / US
[2011/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Kirsch, Howard, C.
479 West Bogus View Drive
Eagle, IN 83616 / US
 [2013/04]
Former [2011/03]01 / Kirsch, Howard, C.
479 West Bogus View Drive
Eagle, IN 83616 / US
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/04]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2011/03]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date10182346.627.08.2003
[2011/03]
Priority number, dateUS2002023247529.08.2002         Original published format: US 232475
[2011/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2276175
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2276175
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:H03L7/00, G11C7/10
[2011/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/03]
TitleGerman:Schaltung mit Synchron-Spiegelverzögerung (SMD) und Verfahren mit einem Ringoszillator zur Zeitsteuerung grober und feiner Verzögerungsintervalle[2011/03]
English:Synchronous mirror delay (SMD) circuit and method including a ring oscillator for timing coarse and fine delay intervals technical field[2011/03]
French:Procédé et circuit à retard, symétrique et synchrone comprenant un oscillateur en anneau pour le cadencement d'intervalles grossiers et fins[2011/03]
Examination procedure04.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/33]
03.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2012Fee for grant paid
11.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03791912.3  / EP1537668
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030791912) is  09.02.2006
Opposition(s)24.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.08.2003
AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
GB27.08.2013
IE27.08.2013
LU27.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR02.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
GB27.08.2013
IE27.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR02.09.2013
Former [2014/37]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
GB27.08.2013
IE27.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR02.09.2013
Former [2014/34]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
GB27.08.2013
IE27.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/33]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE27.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/20]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/03]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
Former [2013/35]BE23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
Former [2013/34]SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US6060928  (JUN ET AL) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 33; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]US5955905  (IDEI ET AL) [A] 1-16 * column 6, line 18 - column 9, line 42; figures 5-8 *;
 [A]US6310822  (SHEN CHIUN-CHI) [A] 1-16 * column 6, line 51 - column 12, line 22; compounds 3-6 *