Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2378273

EP2378273 - System and method for double sided optical inspection of thin film disks or wafers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2013
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.03.2013  [2013/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Candela Instruments
850 Auburn Court
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
[2011/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Meeks, Steven W.
3130 Belmont Terrace
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
 [2011/42]
Representative(s)Lukaszyk, Szymon , et al
Kancelaria Patentowa Lukaszyk
ul. Glowackiego 8
40-062 Katowice / PL
[N/P]
Former [2012/20]Lukaszyk, Szymon , et al
Kancelaria Patentowa Lukaszyk ul. Glowackiego 8/6
40-062 Katowice / PL
Former [2011/42]Lucke, Andreas
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date10182395.303.12.2004
[2011/42]
Priority number, dateUS2004075427508.01.2004         Original published format: US 754275
[2011/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2378273
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2378273
Date:14.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/21, G01N21/47, G01N21/95, H01L21/66
[2011/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/42]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren für doppelseitige optische Inspektion von Dünnfilmplatten oder Wafern[2011/42]
English:System and method for double sided optical inspection of thin film disks or wafers[2011/42]
French:Système et procédé pour l'inspection optique recto verso de disques à film mince ou de plaquettes[2011/42]
Examination procedure15.09.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/12]
24.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2013/12]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04028745.0  / EP1553406
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040028745) is  29.01.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201007   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2011
31.12.201209   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XP]US2004169850  (MEEKS STEVEN W [US]) [XP] 1-3,6-13,15 * the whole document *;
 [XP]US2004017561  (MEEKS STEVEN W [US]) [XP] 1-3,6-13,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003025905  (MEEKS STEVEN W [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2001000679  (VAEZ-IRAVANI MEHDI [US], et al) [A] 2,4-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0031] , [0032] , [0035] - [0039] - [0042] - [0044] - [0063]; figures 3,4,2A,2B *
by applicantUS4674875
 US5694214
 US5748305
 US6157444
 US20000718054