Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2378735

EP2378735 - Method for operating a mobile wireless network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2019Change: Appeal number 
05.03.2019New entry: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IPCom GmbH & Co. KG
Zugspitzstrasse 15
82049 Pullach / DE
[2011/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Hans, Martin
Lavesring 10
31162, Bad Salzdetfurth / DE
02 / Beckmann, Mark
Helene-Engelbrecht-Strasse 107
38124, Braunschweig / DE
 [2011/42]
Representative(s)Molnia, David
Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[2017/06]
Former [2011/42]Molnia, David
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date10182497.719.09.2000
[2011/42]
Priority number, dateDE1999105065321.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19950653
[2011/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2378735
Date:19.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2378735
Date:14.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2378735
Date:08.02.2017
Language:DE
[2017/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04W28/06, // H04W28/16, H04W80/00, H04W80/02, H04W80/04, H04W88/18
[2014/20]
Former International [2011/42]H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04W28/06, // H04W80/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2017/06]
Former [2011/42]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Mobilfunknetzes[2011/42]
English:Method for operating a mobile wireless network[2011/42]
French:Procédé destiné au fonctionnement d'un réseau hertzien mobile[2011/42]
Examination procedure08.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
10.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2015Observations by third parties
21.12.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.2016Observations by third parties
01.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2016Observations by third parties
09.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2016Observations by third parties
06.07.2016Fee for grant paid
06.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.10.2016Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00967581.0  / EP1226692
EP06113477.1  / EP1686760
Opposition(s)09.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03]
Appeal following opposition21.12.2018Appeal received No.  T0660/19
28.02.2019Statement of grounds filed
06.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0831/17
18.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
25.05.2018Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2018/21]
03.08.2018Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
28.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:14.03.2013
[2013/17]
Documents cited:Search[I]DE19847679  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [I] 1-15 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 26 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [I]WO9748212  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 19 * * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 31 * * figures 2A,2B *;
 [I]WO9621984  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2, line 34 - page 7, line 27 * * page 16, line 9 - line 27 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [AP]  - ETSI, "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS);Packet Data Convergence Protocol (PDCP) Specification", ADVANCES IN THE PRODUCTION AND USE OF STEEL WITH IMPROVED INTERNAL CLEANLINESS,XX,XX, (1999), XP002161638 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *
otherDE19847679
 EP2890082