Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2264911

EP2264911 - Spread-spectrum system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/51]Spread-spectrum system and method
[2011/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2018/42]
Former [2012/50]For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
Former [2010/51]For all designated states
INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building
Wilmington, DE 19810 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lomp, Gary R.
130 Washington Drive
Centerport, NY 11721 / US
 [2018/42]
Former [2010/51]01 / Lomp, Gary R.
130 Washington Drive
Centerport, NY 11721 / US
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[2018/42]
Former [2012/50]Harrison Goddard Foote
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield
S1 2JA / GB
Former [2010/51]Johansson, Magnus
Awapatent AB Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Application number, filing date10182945.522.12.1995
[2010/51]
Priority number, dateUS1995036871004.01.1995         Original published format: US 368710
[2010/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2264911
Date:22.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2264911
Date:12.01.2011
[2011/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2264911
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005
[2010/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2018/42]
Former [2010/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Steuerung der Sendeleistung in einem beweglichen Fernsprechzellensystem mit Kodemultiplex-Vielfachzugriff[2010/51]
English:Spread-spectrum system and method[2018/21]
French:Procédé et appareil de commande de la puissance de transmission dans un système de radiocommunications cellulaire AMDC[2010/51]
Former [2010/51]Spread-spectrum system and method
Examination procedure30.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/51]
14.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2018Fee for grant paid
10.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00114941.8  / EP1043844
EP05010690.5  / EP1569360
EP95943981.1  / EP0801856
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950943981) is  05.02.1999
Opposition(s)18.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
27.03.2018Request for further processing filed
27.03.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.04.2018Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
14.07.2011Request for further processing filed
14.07.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.08.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
14.07.2011Request for further processing filed
14.07.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.08.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 15
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 16
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 17
25.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 18
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 19
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 20
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201218   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
IE22.12.2018
GR18.01.2019
PT17.02.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/26]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
IE22.12.2018
GR18.01.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
IE22.12.2018
GR18.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
IE22.12.2018
Former [2019/09]IE22.12.2018
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0682417  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP] NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [XP] 1-16 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 4 * * page 3, line 29 - line 55 * * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 45 * * figure 2 *
Examination   - SZU-LIN SU ET AL, "Reverse-link power control strategies for CDMA cellular network", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS 1995 PIMRC ' 95, IEEE, US, (19950927), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/PIMRC.1995.480911, ISBN 978-0-7803-3002-3, pages 461 - 465, XP010150929

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.1995.480911