blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2332952

EP2332952 - Modified 2' and 3'-nucleoside prodrugs for treating flaviridae infections [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  25.03.2022
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2022Revocation of patentpublished on 27.04.2022  [2022/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IDENIX Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
320 Bent Street, Floor 4
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.)
3 rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
UNIVERSITA' DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI
Dip. Biologia Sperimentale
Sezione di Microbiologia
Cittadella Universitaria SS 554, Km. 4.500
09042 Monserrato / IT
For all designated states
L'Université Montpellier II
2, Place Eugène Bataillon
34095 Montpellier Cedex 5 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]For all designated states
IDENIX Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
320 Bent Street, Floor 4
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI
Dip. Biologia Sperimentale, Sezione di Microbiologia, Cittadella Universitaria SS 554, Km. 4.500
09042 Monserrato / IT
For all designated states
L'Université Montpellier II
2, Place Eugène Bataillon
34095 Montpellier Cedex 5 / FR
Former [2013/21]For all designated states
IDENIX Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
320 Bent Street, Floor 4
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI
Dip. Biologia Sperimentale, Sezione di Microbiologia, Cittadella Universitaria SS 554, Km. 4.500
09042 Monserrato / IT
For all designated states
L'Université Montpellier II
2, Place Eugène Bataillon
34095 Montpellier Cedex 5 / FR
Former [2011/24]For all designated states
IDENIX Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
60 Hampshire Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI
Dip. Biologia Sperimentale, Sezione di Microbiologia, Cittadella Universitaria SS 554, Km. 4.500
09042 Monserrato / IT
For all designated states
L'Université Montpellier II
2, Place Eugène Bataillon
34095 Montpellier Cedex 5 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Sommadossi, Jean-Pierre
2 Avery Street, Apt. 21e
Boston, MA 02111 / US
02 / La Colla, Poalo
5 Strada no. 11
Poggio dei Pini
I-09012 Capoterra Cagliari / IT
03 / Storer, Richard
Sandgate Point The Leas
Folkestone, Kent CT20 2JE / GB
04 / Gosselin, Gilles
487 rue Celleneuve
St. Hilaire
34070 Montpellier / FR
 [2011/48]
Former [2011/24]01 / Sommadossi, Jean-Pierre
2 Avery Street Apt. 21e
Boston, MA 02111 / US
02 / La Colla, Poalo
5 Strada no. 11 Poggio dei Pini
I-09012 Capoterra Cagliari / IT
03 / Storer, Richard
Sandgate Point The Leas
Folkestone Kent CT20 2JE / GB
04 / Gosselin, Gilles
487 rue Celleneuve St. Hilaire
34070 Montpellier / FR
Representative(s)Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/52]Savic, Bojan, et al
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2012/48]Ritter, Thomas Kurt
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2011/24]Hallybone, Huw George, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date10183144.427.06.2003
[2011/24]
Priority number, dateUS20020392350P28.06.2002         Original published format: US 392350 P
US20020392351P28.06.2002         Original published format: US 392351 P
US20030466194P28.04.2003         Original published format: US 466194 P
US20030470949P14.05.2003         Original published format: US 470949 P
[2011/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2332952
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2332952
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2011
ClassificationIPC:C07H19/10, C07H19/20, A61K31/7084, A61P35/00
[2011/24]
CPC:
C07H19/10 (EP); C07H19/16 (KR); A61K31/7064 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP); A61P1/16 (EP); A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
C07H19/00 (EP); C07H19/04 (KR); C07H19/06 (KR);
C07H19/20 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2011/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL15.12.2011
LT15.12.2011
LV15.12.2011
MK15.12.2011
TitleGerman:Modifizierte 2'- und 3'-Nukleosid-Prodrugs zur Behandlung von Flaviridae-Infektionen[2011/24]
English:Modified 2' and 3'-nucleoside prodrugs for treating flaviridae infections[2011/24]
French:Promédicaments à base de nucléosides modifiés en 2' et 3' pour le traitement d'infections par flavivirus[2011/24]
Examination procedure15.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/04]
10.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2015Fee for grant paid
18.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03761744.6  / EP1523489
Divisional application(s)EP14169110.5  / EP2799442
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030761744) is  19.03.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.01.2016  22.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Gilead Sciences, Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City CA 94404 / US
Opponent's representative
Nieuwenhuys, William Francis
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
 02  29.01.2016  22.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
Waterways House
Grand Canal Quay
Dublin D02 PD39 / IE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/40]
Opponent(s)01  28.01.2016  22.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Gilead Sciences, Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City CA 94404 / US
Opponent's representative
Nieuwenhuys, William Francis
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
 02  29.01.2016  22.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
Former [2016/10]
Opponent(s)01  28.01.2016    ADMISSIBLE
Gilead Sciences, Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City CA 94404 / US
Opponent's representative
Nieuwenhuys, William Francis
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
 02  29.01.2016   
Generics (U.K.) Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Hally, Anna-Louise
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
10.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.09.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
26.04.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.04.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
08.02.2022Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/17]
Appeal following opposition25.06.2018Appeal received No.  T1653/18
24.08.2018Statement of grounds filed
08.02.2022Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
23.03.2022Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
08.02.2022Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
09.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201109   M06   Fee paid on   09.08.2011
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.06.2003
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
TR29.04.2015
IE27.06.2015
LU27.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/37]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE27.06.2015
LU27.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE27.06.2015
LU27.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE27.06.2015
LU27.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/20]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE27.06.2015
LU27.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
LU27.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/08]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL29.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0160315  (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA], et al) [A] 1,10* the whole document *;
 [I]WO0190121  (NOVIRIO PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [KY], et al) [I] 1-13 * page 141 - page 144 *
ExaminationWO2005003147
by applicantUS3798209
 USRE29835E
 US4522811
 DE3512781
 EP0180276
 WO8902733
 EP0350287
 WO9000555
 US4957924
 US5026687
 WO9116920
 WO9118914
 WO9119721
 US5149794
 US5157027
 WO9300910
 US5194654
 US5223263
 US5256641
 WO9426273
 US5372808
 US5411947
 WO9513090
 US5463092
 US5496546
 WO9615132
 US5538865
 US5543389
 US5543390
 US5543391
 US5554728
 JPH08268890
 US5610054
 WO9712033
 US5633358
 US5633388
 WO9736554
 US5676942
 US5711944
 US5725859
 US5738845
 US5738846
 JPH10101591
 WO9817679
 US5747646
 WO9822496
 US5792834
 US5830455
 US5830905
 US5834594
 US5837257
 US5846964
 US5849696
 US5869253
 WO9907734
 WO9915194
 US5891874
 US5908621
 WO9932139
 WO9932140
 US5922757
 US5928636
 US5942223
 WO9943691
 WO9945016
 DE19914474
 US5980884
 US5990276
 WO9959621
 WO9964016
 US6004933
 WO0009531
 US6034134
 US6043077
 US6056961
 WO0024355
 WO0037110
 WO0052015
 WO0118013
 WO0132153
 WO0147935
 WO0160315
 WO0179246
 WO0181359
 US6312662
 WO0190121
 WO0192282
 WO0196353
 WO0208251
 WO0208187
 WO0208256
 WO0208198
 WO0218404
 WO0232414
 WO0232920
 WO0248172
 WO0248157
 WO0248116
 WO0248165
 US6410531
 US6420380
 WO02057425
 WO02057287
 WO02060926
 US6534523
 WO03024461
    - CALISHER ET AL., J. GEN. VIRAL, (1993), vol. 70, pages 37 - 43
    - Fields Virology, LIPPINCOTT-RAVEN PUBLISHERS, (1996), pages 931 - 959
    - HALSTEAD, S. B., REV. INFECT. DIS., (1984), vol. 6, pages 251 - 264
    - HALSTEAD, S. B., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 476 - 481
    - MONATH, T. P., NEW ENG. J. MED, (1988), vol. 319, pages 641 - 643
    - MOENNIG, V. ET AL., ADV. VIR. RES., (1992), vol. 41, pages 53 - 98
    - MEYERS, G.; THIEL, H.-J., ADVANCES IN VIRUS RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 47, pages 53 - 118
    - MOENNIG V. ET AL., ADV. VIR. RES., (1992), vol. 41, pages 53 - 98
    - GORBALENYA ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 333, page 22
    - BAZAN; FLETTERICK, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 171, pages 637 - 639
    - GORBALENYA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 3889 - 3897
    - KOONIN, E.V.; DOLJA, V.V., CRIT. REV. BIOCHEM. MOLEC. BIOL., (1993), vol. 28, pages 375 - 430
    - WISKERCHEN; COLLETT, VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 184, pages 341 - 350
    - BARTENSCHLAGER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 3835 - 3844
    - ECKART ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1993), vol. 192, pages 399 - 406
    - GRAKOUI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 2832 - 2843
    - GRAKOUI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 10583 - 10587
    - HIJIKATA ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 4665 - 4675
    - TOME ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 4017 - 4026
    - BARTENSCHLAGER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 5045 - 5055
    - FAILLA ET AL., J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 3753 - 3760
    - XU ET AL., J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, pages 5312 - 5322
    - KIM ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1995), vol. 215, pages 160 - 166
    - JIN; PETERSON, ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1995), vol. 323, pages 47 - 53
    - WARRENER; COLLETT, J. VIROL., (1995), vol. 69, pages 1720 - 1726
    - BEHRENS ET AL., EMBO J., (1996), vol. 15, pages 12 - 22
    - LCHMANN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, pages 8416 - 8428
    - YUAN ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1997), vol. 232, pages 231 - 235
    - ZHONG ET AL., J VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 9365 - 9369
    - BOYER, N. ET AL., J. HEPATOL., (2000), vol. 32, pages 98 - 112
    - DI BESCEGLIE, A. M.; BACON, B. R., SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (199910), pages 80 - 85
    - The Merck Manual, (1992), page 901
    - GARY L. DAVIS., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2000), vol. 118, pages 5104 - S114
    - The Merck Index, MERCK & CO., INC., (1989), page 1304
    - GARY L. DAVIS, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2000), vol. 118, pages S104 - S114
    - GARY L. DAVIS, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2000), vol. 1L8, pages S104 - S114
    - BATTAGLIA, A.M. ET AL., ANN. PHARMACOTHER., (2000), vol. 34, pages 487 - 494
    - BERENGUER, M. ET AL., ANTIVIR. THER., (1998), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 125 - 136
    - GARY L. DAVIS, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2000), vol. 118, pages 104 - 5114
    - BYMOCK ET AL., ANTIVIRAL CHEMISTRY & CHEMOTHERAPY, (2000), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 79 - 95
    - DE FRANCESCO ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 58, pages 1 - 16
    - ATTWOOD ET AL., ANTIVIRAL CHEMISTRY AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 259 - 273
    - SUDO K. ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1997), vol. 238, pages 643 - 647
    - SUDO K. ET AL., ANTIVIRAL CHEMISTRY AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1998), vol. 9, page 186
    - CHU M. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1996), vol. 37, pages 7229 - 7232
    - CHU M. ET AL., BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, vol. 9, pages 1949 - 1952
    - QASIM M.A. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 1598 - 1607
    - SUDO K. ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 32, pages 9 - 18
    - KAKIUCHI N. ET AL., J. EBS LETTERS, vol. 421, pages 217 - 220
    - TAKESHITA N. ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 247, pages 242 - 246
    - FERRARI R. ET AL., JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1999), vol. 73, pages 1649 - 1654
    - LOHMANN V. ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 249, pages 108 - 118
    - ALT M. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1995), vol. 22, pages 707 - 717
    - ALT M. ET AL., ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY, (1997), vol. 142, pages 589 - 599
    - GALDERISI U. ET AL., JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 181, pages 251 - 257
    - MACCJAK, D. J. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1999), vol. 30, page 995
    - BHAT ET AL., "Oral Session V, Hepatitis C Virus, Flaviviridae, 2003 (Oral Session V, Hepatitis C Virus, Flaviviridae", 16TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (20030427), page A75
    - OLSEN ET AL., "Oral Session V, Hepatitis C Virus, Flaviviridae", 16TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (20030427), page A76
    - FERRARI ET AL., JNL. OF VIR., (1999), vol. 73, pages 1649 - 1654
    - ISHII ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1999), vol. 29, pages 1227 - 1235
    - LOHMANN ET AL., JNL. OF BIO. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 10807 - 10815
    - YAMASHITA ET AL., JNL. OFBIO. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 15479 - 15486
    - R. JONES; N. BISCHOFERGER, ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 27, pages 1 - 17
    - KUCERA, L.S.; N. IYER; E. LEAKE; A. RABEN; MODEST E.K.; D.L.W.; C. PIANTADOSI, "Novel membrane-interactive ether lipid analogs that inhibit infectious HIV-1 production and induce defective virus formation.", AIDS RES. HUM. RETRO VIRUSES, (1990), vol. 6, pages 491 - 501
    - PIANTADOSI, C.; J. MARASCO C.J.; S.L. MORRIS-NATSCHKE; K.L. MEYER; F. GUMUS; J.R. SURLES; K.S. ISHAQ; L.S. KUCERA; N. IYER; C.A. W, "Synthesis and evaluation of novel ether lipid nucleoside conjugates for anti-HIV activity.", J. MED. CHEM., (1991), vol. 34, pages 1408 - 1414
    - HOSTELLER, K.Y.; D.D. RICHMAN; D.A. CARSON; L.M. STUHMILLER; G.M. T. VAN WIJK; H. VAN DEN BOSCH, "Greatly enhanced inhibition of human immunodeficiency virus type 1 replication in CEM and HT4-6C cells by 3'-deoxythymine diphosphate dimyristoylglycerol, a lipid prodrug of 3,-deoxythymine.", ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1992), vol. 36, pages 2025 - 2029
    - HOSETLER, K.Y.; L.M. STUHMILLER; H.B. LENTING; H. VAN DEN BOSCH; D.D. RICHMAN, "Synthesis and antiretroviral activity of phospholipid analogs of azidothymine and other antiviral nucleosides.", J BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, page 61127
    - DELAMBERT ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, page 498
    - KHAMNEI; TORRENCE, J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 4109 - 4115
    - MITCHELL ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS., (1992), page 12345
    - HUNSTON ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1984), vol. 27, pages 440 - 444
    - STARRETT ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 1857 - 1864
    - MEIER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1979), vol. 22, pages 811 - 815
    - MEIER ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1997), vol. 7, pages 99 - 104
    - FARQUHAR ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1983), vol. 26, page 1153
    - FARQUHAR ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1985), vol. 28, page 1358
    - FREED ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMAC, (1989), vol. 38, page 3193
    - ZON, PROGRESS IN MED. CHEM., (1982), vol. 19, page 1205
    - NIFANTYEV ET AL., PHOSPHORUS, SULFUR SILICON AND RELATED EELEMENTS, (1996), vol. 113, page 1
    - KRYUCHKOV ET AL., IZV. AKAD. NAUK SSSR, SER. KHIM., (1987), vol. 6, page 1244
    - SHIH ET AL., BULL. INST. CHEM. ACAD. SIN, (1994), vol. 41, page 9
    - EDMUNDSON ET AL., J. CHEM. RES. SYNOP., (1989), vol. 5, page 122
    - NEIDLEIN ET AL., HETEROCYCLES, (1993), vol. 35, page 1185
    - QASIM M.A., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 1598 - 1607
    - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1978), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 327 - 333
    - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1999), vol. 121, no. 24, pages 5661 - 5664
    - J. FARKAS; F. SORM, "Nucleic acid components and their analogues. XCIV. Synthesis of 6-amino-9-(1-deoxy-?-D-psicofuranosyl)purine", COLLECT. CZECH. CHEM. COMMUN., (1967), vol. 32, pages 2663 - 2667
    - J. FARKAS, COLLECT. CZECH. CHEM. COMMUN., (1966), vol. 31, page 1535
    - R.E. HARRY-O'KURU; J.M. SMITH; M.S. WOLFE, "A short, flexible route toward 2'-C-branched ribonucleosides", J:ORG. CHEM., (1997), vol. 62, pages 1754 - 1759
    - R.F. NUTT; M.J. DICKINSON; F.W. HOLLY; E. WALTON, "Branched-chain sugar nucleosides. III. 3'-C-methyladenine", J.ORG. CHEM., (1968), vol. 33, pages 1789 - 1795
    - LEONARD, N. J.; CARRAWAY, K. L., "5-Amino-5-deoxyribose derivatives. Synthesis and use in the preparation of "reversed", NUCLEOSIDES" J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM., (1966), vol. 3, pages 485 - 489
    - "Oxidation of carbohydrates by the sulfoxide-carbodiimide and related methods. Oxidation with dicyclohexylcarbodiimide-DMSO, diisopropylcarbodiimide-DMSO, acetic anhydride-DMSO, and phosphorus pentoxid", JONES, G. H.; MOFFATT, J. G., Methods in Carbohydrate Chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1972), pages 315 - 322
    - LELAND, D. L.; KOTICK, M. P., "Studies on 4-C-(hydroxymethyl)pentofuranoses. Synthesis of 9-[4-C-(hydroxymethyl)-a-L-threo-pentofuranosyl]adenine", CARBOHYDR. RES., (1974), vol. 38, pages C9 - C11
    - JONES, G. H.; TANIGUCHI, M.; TEGG, D.; MOFFATT, J. G., "4'-substituted nucleosides. 5. Hydroxylation of nucleoside 5'-aidehydes", J. ORG. CHEM., (1979), vol. 44, pages 1309 - 1317
    - GUNIC, E.; GIRARDET, J.-L.; PIETRZKOWSKI, Z.; ESLER, C.; WANG, G., "Synthesis and cytotoxicity of 4'-C-and 5'-C-substituted Toyocamycins", BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 9, pages 163 - 170
    - GUNIC, E.; GIRARDET, J.-L.; PIETRZKOWSKI, Z; ESLER, C.; WANG, G., "Synthesis and cytotoxicity of 4'-C-and 5'-C-substituted Toyocamycins", BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 9, pages 163 - 170
    - WAGA, T.; NISHIZAKI, T.; MIYAKAWA, I.; ORHUI, H.; MEGURO, H., "Synthesis of 4'-C-methylnucleosides", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 57, pages 1433 - 1438
    - WAGA, T.; NISHIZAKI, T.; MIYAKAWA, I.; ORHUI, H.; MEGURO, H.; SYNTHESIS OF 4'-C-METHYLNUCLEOSIDES, BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 57, pages 1433 - 1438
    - SOMMADOSSI J-P; CARLISLE R., "Toxicity of 3'-azido-3'-deoxythymidine and 9-(1,3-dihydroxy-2-propoxymethyl)guanine for normal human hematopoietic progenitor cells in vitro", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1987), vol. 31, pages 452 - 454
    - SOMMADOSSI J-P; SCHINAZI RF; CHU CK; XIE M-Y., "Comparison of cytotoxicity of the (-)- and (+)-enantiomer of 2',3'-dideoxy-3'-thiacytidine in normal human bone marrow progenitor cells", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1992), vol. 44, pages 1921 - 1925
    - PAN-ZHOU X-R; CUI L; ZHOU X-J; SOMMADOSSI J-P; DARLEY-USMER VM, "Differential effects of antiretroviral nucleoside analogs on mitochondrial function in HepG2 cells", ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (2000), vol. 44, pages 496 - 503
    - BAGINSKI, S. G.; PEVEAR, D. C.; SEIPEL, M.; SUN, S. C. C.; BENETATOS, C. A.; CHUNDURU, S. K.; RICE, C. M.; M. S. COLLETT, "Mechanism of action of a pestivirus antiviral compound", PNAS USA, (2000), vol. 97, no. 14, pages 7981 - 7986
 EP19930917054
 WO2000CA01316
 WO2001CA00197
 WO2001EP09633
 WO2002US01531
 WO2002US03086
OppositionJPH0368564
 WO9943691
 WO0160315
 WO0190121
 WO02057425
 WO2005003147
 WO0192282
 WO0218369
 WO0218404
 EP1633766
    - ANDREA M BATTAGLIA, "Combination Therapy with Interferon and Ribavirin in the Treatment of Chronic Hepatitis C Infection", Ann Pharmacother, (20000400), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 487 - 494, XP055283785

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1345/aph.19183
    - HARRY-O'KURU ET AL et al., "A SHORT, FLEXIBLE ROUTE TOWARD 2'-C-BRANCHED RIBONUCLEOSIDES", J.Org. Chem., (19970000), vol. 62, no. 6, pages 1754 - 1759, XP002250483

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo961893+
    - LAL et al., "Electrophilic NF Fluorinating Agents", Electrophilic, Chem. Rev., (19960000), vol. 96, pages 1737 - 1755, XP055277022

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr941145p
    - SINGH et al., "RECENT ADVANCES IN NUCLEOPHILIC FLUORINATION REACTIONS OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS USING DEOXOFLUOR AND DAST", Synthesis, (20021200), vol. 17, pages 2561 - 2578, XP001143690
    - YANG et al., "Synthesis of dl-1-deoxy-1-fluoro-6-O-methyl-chiro-inositol: confirmation of a structural-DAST fluorination correlation", Carbohydrate Research, (19931018), vol. 249, no. 1, pages 259 - 263, XP026634454

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6215(93)84074-G
    - JEONG et al., "Unanticipated Retention of Configuration in the DAST Fluorination of Deoxy-4'-thiopyrimidine Nucleosides with Up Hydroxyl Groups", Tetrahedron Letters, (19940000), vol. 35, no. 41, pages 7569 - 7572, XP001098057

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)78345-6
    - CLARK et al., "Design, synthesis, and antiviral activity of 2'-deoxy-2'-fluoro-2'-C-methylcytidine, a potent inhibitor of hepatitis C virus replication", J. Med. Chem., (20050000), vol. 48, pages 5504 - 5508, XP002415215

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0502788
    - CLARK et al., "Synthesis and antiviral activity of 2'-deoxy-2'-fluoro-2'-C-methyl purine nucleosides as inhibitors of hepatitis C virus RNA replication", Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20060315), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 1712 - 1715, XP005280783

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2005.12.002
    - CLARK et al., "Synthesis of 2-deoxy-2-fluoro-2-C-methyl-D-ribofuranoses", J. Carbohydrate Chem., (20060000), vol. 25, no. 6, pages 461 - 470, XP009096828

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/07328300600859783
    - MEIER et al., "2'-O-Acyl-6-thioinosine Cyclic 3'5'-Phosphates as Prodrugs of Thioinosinic Acid", J. Med. Chem., (19790000), vol. 22, pages 811 - 815, XP055277025
    - FURMAN et al., "590] INHIBITION OF HCV REPLICATION BY PSI-6130: MECHANISM OF BIOCHEMICAL ACTIVATION AND INHIBITION", J. Hepatology, (20070000), vol. 46, no. Supp. 1, page S224, XP022087930

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-8278(07)62188-6
    - LAM et al., "Mechanism of HCV replicon resistance to PSI-352938, a cyclic monophosphate prodrug of 2'alpha-F-2'-beta-C-methylguanosine", 46th Annual Meeting of the European Association for the Study of the Liver, EASL, Berlin, Germany, (20110330), URL: http://www.easl.eu, XP055287174
    - Anonymous, "PSI-938 / PSI-661", (20110211), URL: http://www.pharmasset.com, XP055287178
    - Anonymous, "Experimental Hepatitis C Drug PSI-938 Halted In Clinical Trial", HCV New Drugs, (20111216), URL: http://hepatitiscnewdrugs.blogspot.co.uk/2011/12/experimental-hepatitis-c-drug-psi-938.html, XP055277063
    - LINDENBACH, B.D. et al., "Flaviviridae: the Viruses and their Replication", Fields Virology, Philadelphia, pages 991 - 1041, XP003032419
    - STUYVER, L.J. et al., "Inhibition of hepatitis C replicon RNA Synthesis by beta-D-2'-deoxy-2'- fluoro-2'-C-methylcytidine: a specific inhibitor of hepatitis C virus replication", Antiviral Chem & Chemotherapy, (20060000), vol. 17, pages 79 - 87, XP003032420
    - CARROLL et al., "Inhibition of hepatitis C virus RNA replication by 2'-modified nucleoside analogs", J. Biol. Chem., (20030404), vol. 278, no. 14, pages 11979 - 11984, XP002316770

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M210914200
    - DE FRANCESCO et al., "New therapies on the horizon for hepatitis C: are we close?", Clin. Liver Dis., (20030000), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 211 - 242, XP055259285

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1089-3261(02)00069-7
    - DE FRANCE SCO et al., "Approaching a new era for hepatitis C virus therapy: inhibitors of the NS3-4A serine protease and the NS5B RNA-dependent RNA polymerase", Antiviral Research, (20030000), vol. 58, pages 1 - 16, XP002414639

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-3542(03)00028-7
    - WALKER et al., "HCV RNA-DEPENDENT RNA POLYMERASE AS A TARGET FOR ANTIVIRAL DEVELOPMENT", Current Opinion in Pharmacology, (20020000), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 534 - 540, XP001155567

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1471-4892(02)00195-9
    - MATSUDA, AKIRA et al., "Alkyl Addition Reaction of Pyrimidine 2'-Ketonucleosides: Synthesis of 2'-Branched-Chain Sugar Pyrimidine Nucleosides", Chem. Pharm. Bull., (19880000), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 945 - 953, XP002189356
    - PANKIEWICZ K.W., "Fluorinated nucleosides", Carbohydrate Research, (20000710), vol. 327, no. 1-2, pages 87 - 105, XP004215278

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(00)00089-6
    - LOHMANN, V. et al., "Replication of subgenomic hepatitis C virus RNAs in a hepatoma cell line", Science, (19990000), vol. 285, pages 110 - 113, XP00096069
    - TAN, S.L. et al., "HEPATITIS C THERAPEUTICS: CURRENT STATUS AND EMERGING STRATEGIES", Nature Reviews, (20021100), vol. I, no. 11, pages 867 - 881, XP001204206

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd937
    - CONDIT, R.C. et al., "Principles of Virology", CONDIT, R.C. et al., Knipe, D.M. et al, eds., Fields Virology, Philadelphia, Philadelphia, Lippincott Williams & Wilkins, pages 25 - 57, XP055288380
    - STUYVER, L.J. et al., "Ribonucleoside Analogue That Blocks Replication of Bovine Viral Diarrhea and Hepatitis C Viruses in Culture", Antimicrob Agents Chemother, (20030000), vol. 47, no. 1, pages 244 - 254, XP055169861

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.47.1.244-254.2003
    - GUO, J.-T. et al., "Effect of Alpha Interferon on the Hepatitis C virus Replicon", J Virology, (20010900), vol. 75, no. 18, pages 8516 - 8523, XP002983354

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.75.18.8516-8523.2001
    - STUYVER, L.J. et al., "Inhibition of the Subgenomic Hepatitis C Virus Replicon in Huh-7 Cells by 2′-Deoxy-2′-Fluorocytidine", Antimicrob Agents Chemother, (20040200), vol. 48, no. 2, pages 651 - 654, XP055288381
    - DHANAK, D. et al., "Identification and Biological Characterization of Heterocyclic Inhibitors of the Hepatitis C Virus RNA-dependent RNA Polymerase", J Biol Chem, (20021011), vol. 277, no. 41, pages 38322 - 38327, XP008101484

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M205566200
    - SHIM, J. et al., "CANONICAL 3'-DEOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDES AS A CHAIN TERMINATOR FOR HCV NS5B RNA-DEPENDENT RNA POLYMERASE", Antiviral Res, (20030501), vol. 58, no. 3, pages 243 - 251, XP008071383

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-3542(03)00007-X
    - ZUCK, P. et al., "A cell-based beta-lactamase reporter gene assay for the identification of inhibitors of hepatitis C virus replication", Analytical Biochemistry, (20041115), vol. 334, no. 2, pages 344 - 355, XP027187500
    - KRIEGER, N. et al., "Enhancement of Hepatitis C Virus RNA Replications by Cell Culture- Adaptive Mutations", J Virol, (20010501), vol. 75, no. 10, pages 4614 - 4624, XP001029798

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.75.10.4614-4624.2001
    - YI et al., "Subgenomic hepatitis C virus replicons inducing expression of a secreted enzymatic reporter protein", Virology, (20021220), vol. 304, no. 2, pages 197 - 210, XP002427338

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.2002.1652
    - BOURNE N et al., "Screening for hepatitis C virus antiviral activity with a cell-based secreted alkaline phosphatase reporter replicon system", Antiviral Res, (20050801), vol. 67, no. 2, pages 76 - 82, XP005010188

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.antiviral.2005.03.006
    - WAKITA, T. et al., "Production of infectious hepatitis C virus in tissue culture from a cloned viral genome", Nat Med, (20050701), vol. 11, no. 7, pages 791 - 796,905, XP002993378

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1268
    - CONDIT, R.C. et al., "Principles of Virology", Fields Virology. Chapter 2, Philadelphia, Lippincott Williams G Wilkins, pages 19 - 51, XP055288393
    - O'BOYLE II, D.R. et al., "Development of a Cell-Based High-Throughput Specificity Screen Using a Hepatitis C Virus-Bovine Viral Diarrhea Virus Dual Replicon Assay", Antimicrob Agents Chemother, (20050401), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 1346 - 1353, XP055043289

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.49.4.1346-1353.2005
    - CODINGTON et al., "Nucleosides. XVIII. Synthesis of 2'-fluorothymidine, 2'-fluorodeoxythymidine and other 2'-halogeno-2'-deoxy nucleosides", J. Org. Chem., (19640000), vol. 29, pages 558 - 564, XP002175523

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01026a009
    - Jerry March, "Aliphatic nucleophilic substitution", Advanced Organic Chemistry 4th Edition, (19920101), page 432, XP055288398
    - Jerry March, "Aliphatic Nucleophilic Substitution", March's Advanced Organic Chemistry Fifth Edition, pages 518 - 519,634, XP055288409
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.