Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2267762 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2267762



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 403
07.05.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.05.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.05.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.04.2020 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 12
01.04.2020 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 12
01.04.2020 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.03.2020 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.03.2020 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
19.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.02.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.02.2020 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
03.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
03.02.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
03.02.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
03.02.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
03.02.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
03.02.2020 Amended description with annotations Appeal 10
03.02.2020 Amended description with annotations Appeal 10
03.02.2020 Amended description with annotations Appeal 9
03.02.2020 Amended description with annotations Appeal 9
03.02.2020 Claims Appeal 1
03.02.2020 Claims Appeal 2
03.02.2020 Claims Appeal 1
03.02.2020 Claims Appeal 2
03.02.2020 Description Appeal 4
03.02.2020 Description Appeal 4
03.02.2020 Description Appeal 5
03.02.2020 Description Appeal 5
03.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.02.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
18.11.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
20.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.09.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.09.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
30.08.2019 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.04.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
10.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.04.2019 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Appeal 1
10.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.11.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
22.11.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
24.07.2017 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
24.07.2017 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.04.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.11.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
07.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
01.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
01.07.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.05.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.05.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
20.05.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
20.05.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
20.05.2016 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
20.05.2016 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
20.05.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
20.05.2016 Means of redress Search / examination 2
19.05.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
19.05.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
19.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.05.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.05.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.04.2016 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 18
25.02.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
24.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
24.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
24.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
24.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.02.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 10
02.10.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.09.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.09.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.09.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.06.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
30.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.07.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
30.07.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
30.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.07.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.07.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.07.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
03.07.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
24.04.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.04.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.01.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.01.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 23
22.01.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
22.01.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
22.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.08.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.07.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.07.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 1
23.07.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
27.01.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
04.01.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
28.12.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.12.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
01.12.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
02.11.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
30.09.2010 Annex Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
30.09.2010 Description Search / examination 30
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Drawings Search / examination 6
30.09.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
08.03.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 17