Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2298891

EP2298891 - Method for isolating small RNA molecules [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/12]Methods and compositions for isolating small RNA molecules
[2013/13]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Life Technologies Corporation
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
[2016/47]
Former [2011/48]For all designated states
Life Technologies Corporation
5791 Van Allen Way
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
Former [2011/12]For all designated states
Ambion, Inc.
2130 Woodward Street
Austin, TX 78744-1832 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CONRAD, Richard
6814 La Concha Pass
Austin, TX 78749-1740 / US
 [2013/36]
Former [2011/12]01 / CONRAD, Richard
6814 La Concha Pass
Austin, TX 78749-1740 / US
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/36]Weber, Birgit
Life Technologies GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 129 B
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2011/31]Weber, Birgit
Life Technologies Frankfurter Strasse 129 B
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2011/12]Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date10183646.826.07.2004
[2011/12]
Priority number, dateUS20030490325P25.07.2003         Original published format: US 490325 P
US2003066712619.09.2003         Original published format: US 667126
[2011/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2298891
Date:23.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2298891
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/10
[2011/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen zur Isolation von kleinen RNA-Molekülen[2016/23]
English:Method for isolating small RNA molecules[2013/13]
French:Procédés et compositions pour isoler des petites molécules d'ARN[2016/23]
Former [2011/12]Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen zur Isolation von kleinen RNA-Molekülen
Former [2011/12]Methods and compositions for isolating small RNA molecules
Former [2011/12]Procédés et compositions pour isoler des petites molécules d'ARN
Examination procedure15.08.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/38]
23.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2013Fee for grant paid
18.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04779084.5  / EP1651761
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040779084) is  02.06.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.06.2014  09.10.2019  WITHDRAWN
Qiagen GmbH
Qiagen Str. 1
40724 Hilden / DE
Opponent's representative
Roth, Carla, et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Straße 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2019/48]
Former [2014/28]
Opponent(s)01  04.06.2014   
Qiagen GmbH
Qiagen Str. 1
40724 Hilden / DE
Opponent's representative
Roth, Carla, et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Straße 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
10.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
24.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.06.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.10.2019Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.11.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Appeal following opposition24.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1976/16
24.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
09.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.07.2004
AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
TR04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU26.07.2004
AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
Former [2016/25]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
Former [2016/21]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
Former [2015/37]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
Former [2015/13]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
LU26.07.2014
Former [2014/41]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/24]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/23]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/22]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY10.07.2013
AT04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY10.07.2013
AT04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY10.07.2013
AT04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]  - "RIBOPURE TM-WBC INSTUCTION MANUAL", INTERNET CITATION, (20030417), URL: www.ambion.com/techlib/prot/fm_1903.pdf, (20041206), XP002309227 [X] 1-15 * p.1, lines 1-8; p.8 *
 [A]  - STELLRECHT CHRISTINE M ET AL, "Concurrent isolation of ribosomal, messenger, and low molecular weight RNA.", BIOTECHNIQUES, (200211), vol. 33, no. 5, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 1122 - 1124, XP001204185 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [T]  - "mirVanatm miRNA Isolation Kit", INSTRUCTION MANUAL MIRVANATM MIRNA ISOLATION KIT, page COMPLETE, URL: http://www.ambion.com/techlib/prot/fm_1560.pdg, (2004), XP002309228 [T] 1-15
by applicantUS5155018
 US5990302
 US6043354
 US6110363
 US5234809
 US6180778
 WO8605815
 WO9006045
 US5945525
 US5514545
 US5545522
 US4683195
 US4683202
 US4800159
 EP0320308
 US4883750
 US5912148
 US5843650
 US5846709
 US5846783
 US5849546
 US5849497
 US5849547
 US5858652
 US5866366
 US5916776
 US5922574
 US5928905
 US5928906
 US5932451
 US5935825
 US5939291
 US5916779
 US5942391
 GB2202328
 WO8906700
 WO8810315
 EP0329822
 US2003104468
 US6329209
 US6329140
 US6324479
 US6322971
 US6316193
 US6309823
 US5412087
 US5445934
 US5744305
    - BOOM ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1990), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 495 - 503
    - CARRINGTON ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 301, pages 336 - 338
    - CHOMCZYNSKI; SACCHI, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 162, no. 1, pages 156 - 159
    - DERISI ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1996), vol. 14, pages 457 - 460
    - DUGGAN ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1999), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 10 - 14
    - EFSTRATIADIS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1976), vol. 73, no. 7, pages 2289 - 2293
    - FIRE ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, no. 6669, pages 806 - 811
    - FODOR ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, no. 33, pages 8102 - 8108
    - GUBLER; HOFFMANN, GENE, (1983), vol. 25, pages 263 - 269
    - HACIA ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1996), vol. 14, pages 441 - 449
    - HAMILTON; BAULCOMBE, SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, no. 5441, pages 950 - 952
    - HIGUCHI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1976), vol. 73, no. 9, pages 3146 - 3150
    - INNIS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, no. 24, pages 9436 - 9440
    - KO ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 217 - 227
    - KWOH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 1173
    - LAGOS-QUINTANA ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 294, no. 5543, pages 853 - 858
    - NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1981), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 2251 - 2266
    - LAU ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 294, no. 5543, pages 858 - 862
    - LEE; AMBROS, SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 294, no. 5543, pages 862 - 864
    - LEE ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 75, no. 5, pages 843 - 854
    - MANIATIS ET AL., CELL, (1976), vol. 8, page 163
    - MASKOS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 1679 - 1684
    - OHARA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 5673 - 5677
    - OKAYAMA; BERG, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 161 - 170
    - PASQUINELLI ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 408, no. 6808, pages 86 - 89
    - PATANJALI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, no. 5, pages 1943 - 1947
    - PATTERSON; GUTHRIE, CELL, (1987), vol. 49, no. 5, pages 613 - 624
    - PEACOCK; DINGMAN, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1967), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 1818 - 1827
    - PEASE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 5022 - 5026
    - SCHENA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 467 - 470
    - SHALON ET AL., GENOME RES., (1996), vol. 6, no. 7, pages 639 - 645
    - SHOEMAKER ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1996), vol. 14, pages 450 - 456
    - TANG ET AL., GENES DEV., (2003), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 49 - 63
    - TIMMONS, MOL. CELL, (2002), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 435 - 437
    - WALKER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 392 - 396
    - ZAMORE ET AL., CELL, (2000), vol. 101, no. 1, pages 25 - 33
 WO1987US00880
 WO1989US01025