Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2273357

EP2273357 - Virtual loupe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/02]Techniques for displaying digital images on a display
[2015/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2011/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Ubillos, Randy
1209 Portland Avenue
Los Altos CA 94024 / US
02 / Perrodin, Laurent
645 Hermosa Way
Menlo Park CA 94025 / US
03 / Waylonis, Dan
404 Stierlin Road
Mountain View CA 94043 / US
 [2016/20]
Former [2011/02]01 / Ubillos, Randy
1209 Portland Avenue
Los Altos CA 94024 / US
02 / Perrodin, Laurent
645 Hermosa Way
Menlo Park CA 94025 / US
03 / Waylonis, Dan
404 Stierlin Road
Mountain View CA 94043 / US
Representative(s)Wardle, Callum Tarn , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[2012/51]
Former [2011/25]Rooney, John-Paul , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2011/02]Barton, Russell Glen , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date10183762.304.10.2005
[2011/02]
Priority number, dateUS2004096088706.10.2004         Original published format: US 960887
[2011/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2273357
Date:12.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2273357
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0481, G06F3/0483, G06F3/0485
[2015/51]
Former International [2011/02]G06F3/048
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/20]
Former [2011/02]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Virtuelle Loupe[2015/51]
English:Virtual loupe[2015/51]
French:Loupe virtuelle[2015/51]
Former [2011/02]Techniken zur Anzeige digitaler Bilder auf einer Anzeigevorrichtung
Former [2011/02]Techniques for displaying digital images on a display
Former [2011/02]Techniques pour afficher des images numériques sur un écran
Examination procedure30.09.2010Examination requested  [2011/02]
11.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2015
03.11.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2016Fee for grant paid
07.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05805830.6  / EP1805577
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050805830) is  16.10.2007
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.10.2005
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE04.10.2016
LU04.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/33]HU04.10.2005
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE04.10.2016
LU04.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2018/29]HU04.10.2005
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE04.10.2016
LU04.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2018/28]HU04.10.2005
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE04.10.2016
LU04.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/51]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE04.10.2016
LU04.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/40]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
LU04.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[I]JPS6464062  (HITACHI LTD) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5754348  (SOOHOO KENNETH [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 15; figures 3-4 *;
 [A]EP0403125  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 43 - column 6, line 9; figures 2-3 *