Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2309244

EP2309244 - Apparatus and methods for providing sex-sorted animal sperm [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.10.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inguran, LLC
22575 State Highway 6 South
Navasota, TX 77868 / US
[2011/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Durack, Gary
2505 Appaloosa Lane
Mahomet, IL 61853 / US
02 / Hatcher, Jeremy, T.
509 East Shurts Street
Urbana, IL 61801 / US
03 / Westfall, Lon A.
1007 Timber Drive
Mahomet, IL 61853 / US
04 / Helbing, David R.
904 South Fawn Drive
Mahomet, IL 61853 / US
05 / Wallace, Jeffrey D.
666 Autumn Fields Lane
Rantoul, IL 61866 / US
06 / Vandre, Gary P.
105 Sharon Drive
Mahomet, IL 61853 / US
07 / Didion, Bradley
Minitube International Center for Biotechnology 2633 State Road 78
Mt. Horeb, WI 53572 / US
08 / Nayak, Niraj V.
504 Avenue G, Apt 24
Redondon Beach, CA 90277 / US
09 / Anzar, Muhammad
14506 Tienda Drive
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
10 / Ludwig, Cindy L.
1412 Dautel Lane
St. Louis, MO 63146 / US
11 / Graham, Jeffrey A.
49 Picardy Hill Drive
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
12 / Crowley, Kathleen S.
315 Carmel
Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US
 [2011/15]
Representative(s)Jacob, Reuben Ellis , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/15]Jacob, Reuben Ellis , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London
SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date10183913.229.03.2004
[2011/15]
Priority number, dateUS20030458607P28.03.2003         Original published format: US 458607 P
US20030458731P28.03.2003         Original published format: US 458731 P
[2011/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2309244
Date:13.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2309244
Date:04.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01N15/14, C12N5/00, A61D19/00
[2011/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von geschlechtssortierten Tierspermien[2011/15]
English:Apparatus and methods for providing sex-sorted animal sperm[2011/15]
French:Appareil et procédés pour fournir du sperme d'animaux triés selon le sexe[2011/15]
Examination procedure04.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/33]
25.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.07.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination25.09.2015Appeal received No.  T2266/15
25.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04749513.0  / EP1608963
EP09014407.2  / EP2194379
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040749513) is  29.09.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[I]WO9958955  (LUMINEX CORP [US]) [I] 1-23 * the whole document, in particular page 29, line 28; page 55, lines 6-10 *;
 [XA]  - LEE G-B ET AL, "Multi-cell-line micro flow cytometers with buried SU-8/SOG optical waveguides category: Optical MEMS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS), (2002), pages 503 - 506, XP002627528 [X] 1,2,8,10,12,13,21 * the whole document, in particular abstract; section "principle and design" on page 503; last sentence of section "conclusions" on page 506; figures 2, 3, 9, 11 * [A] 3-7,9,11,14-20,22,23
 [XI]  - SHAPIRO H M ET AL, "Multistation multiparameter flow cytometry: some influences of instrumental factors on system performance.", CYTOMETRY, (198307), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 11 - 19, XP002627529 [X] 1-4,8,12,13,15,16,21 * the whole document, in particular abstract; page 16, paragraph spanning the columns * [I] 5-7,9-11,14,17-20,22,23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.990040103
 [I]  - MANSBERG H P ET AL, "The Hemalog D white cell differential system.", THE JOURNAL OF HISTOCHEMISTRY AND CYTOCHEMISTRY, (197407), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 711 - 724, XP002627530 [I] 1-23 * the whole document, in particular abstract; page 711, column 1, lines 1-5; page 712, column 1, line 5 to column 2, line 5; page 713, column 1, line 27 to column 2, line 30; page 716, column 1, line 10 to page 717, column 1, line 40; page 719, column 1, lines 19-26; figure 2; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/22.7.711
 [A]  - ROBERT A HOFFMAN AND DAVID W HOUCK, "Cell separation using flow cytometric cell sorting", CELL SEPARATION METHODS AND APPLICATIONS,, (19970101), pages 237 - 269, XP009144803 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6357307
 US5985216
 US5135759
 WO0243574
 US2003157475
 WO9958955
 US4896966
 US4896967
 WO0241906
 US6372506
 US5643796
 US5249610
 US4395397
 US6432246
 US4756427
 US3791517
    - SHAPIRO ET AL., "Multistation Multiparameter Flow Cytometry: Some Influences of Instrumental Factors on System Performance", CYTOMETRY, (1983), vol. 4, pages 11 - 19
    - MANSBERG ET AL., "The Hemalog D White Cell Differential System", THE JOURNAL OF HISTOCHEMISTRY AND CYTOCHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 711 - 724
    - Practical Flow Cytometry
    - FARRELL ET AL., THERIOGENOLOGY, (1998), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 871 - 9
    - JOHNSON ET AL., GAMETE RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 17, pages 203 - 212
    - SALISBURY; GRAVES, J. REPROD. FERTIL., (1963), vol. 6, pages 351 - 359
    - KACHEL ET AL., HISTOCHEMISTRY AND CYTOCHEMISTRY, (1977), vol. 25, no. 7, pages 774 - 80
    - "Very Fast EM-based Mixture Model Clustering using Multiresolution kd-trees", MOORE, A., Advances in Neural Information Processing Systems, MORGAN KAUFMAN, (1999), pages 543 - 549
    - MAXWELL ET AL., REPROD. FERT. DEV., (1998), vol. 10, pages 433 - 440
    - FARRELL ET AL., THERIOGENOLOGY, (199803), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 871 - 9