blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2283933

EP2283933 - POWDER APPLYING STATION, ARRANGEMENT FOR COATING TEMPERATURE-SENSITIVE MATERIALS, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/07]Powder applying station, arrangement for coating temperature-sensitive materials, and associated method
[2011/22]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2014
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.06.2014  [2014/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TGC Technologie- Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH
Schwabacher Strasse 18
91126 Rednitzhembach / DE
[2011/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Brendel, Gerhard
Glückaufstraße 34
91275 Auerbach / DE
 [2011/07]
Representative(s)Lang, Christian, et al
LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm
Ingolstädter Straße 5
80807 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/28]Lang, Christian, et al
LangPatent IP Law Firm
Anwaltskanzlei
Rosenheimer Strasse 139
81671 München / DE
Former [2012/29]Lösch, Christoph Ludwig Klaus, et al
Patentanwaltkanzlei LÖSCH Äussere Bayreuther Strasse 230
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2011/07]Lang, Christian, et al
LangRaible GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rosenheimerstrasse 139
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date10184168.206.12.2005
[2011/07]
Priority number, dateDE2004105963410.12.2004         Original published format: DE102004059634
DE2005100380226.01.2005         Original published format: DE102005003802
[2011/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2283933
Date:16.02.2011
Language:DE
[2011/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2283933
Date:01.06.2011
[2011/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2011
ClassificationIPC:B05D3/02, B05D3/06, B05D7/06, B05C9/14, F26B3/30
[2011/07]
CPC:
F26B25/004 (EP,US); B05D3/0209 (EP,US); B05D3/0263 (EP,US);
B05D7/06 (EP,US); F26B15/12 (EP,US); F26B3/283 (EP,US);
B05D2401/32 (EP,US); B05D3/0272 (EP,US); B05D3/067 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/07]
TitleGerman:PULVERAUFTRAGSSTATION UND ANORDNUNG ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON TEMPERATURSENSIBLEN MATERIALIEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN[2011/22]
English:POWDER APPLYING STATION, ARRANGEMENT FOR COATING TEMPERATURE-SENSITIVE MATERIALS, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD[2011/22]
French:POSTE D'APPLICATION DE POUDRE ET SYSTEME POUR APPLIQUER UN REVETEMENT SUR DES MATERIAUX SENSIBLES A LA TEMPERATURE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE[2011/22]
Former [2011/07]Pulverauftragsstation und Anordnung zur Beschichtung von Temperatursensiblen Materialien und zugehöriges Verfahren
Former [2011/07]Powder applying station, arrangement for coating temperature-sensitive materials, and associated method
Former [2011/07]Poste d'application de poudre et système pour appliquer un revetement sur des matériaux sensibles à la temperature et procédé associé
Examination procedure01.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/02]
03.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/26]
11.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/26]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05845527.0  / EP1725341
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050845527) is  10.01.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201309   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO9745591  (WINDSOR TECHNOLOGIES LTD [BS], et al) [X] 12,13 * page 14, lines 20-22; claim 1 *[I] 15;
 [XI]DE19622921  (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]) [X] 12-14 * examples 6, 10; claim 1 * [I] 15;
 [X]WO03074199  (SOLARONICS TECHNOLOGIES [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 10, lines 26-30; figures 2,3,5; claims 16,20-23,29 * * page 12, line 24 - page 14, line 26 * * page 1, line 13 *
ExaminationWO9201517
by applicantDE102004012889
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.