blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2288187

EP2288187 - Mobile communications subscriber profile matching system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.04.2019  [2019/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2015/32]
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2011/08]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Fraccaroli, Frederico
8237 Ranch View 1062
Irving, TX 75063 / US
 [2011/08]
Representative(s)Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/08]Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate Derby
DE1 1GY / GB
Application number, filing date10184472.817.08.2000
[2011/08]
Priority number, dateUS1999038232824.08.1999         Original published format: US 382328
[2011/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2288187
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2288187
Date:05.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2012
ClassificationIPC:H04W4/02, H04L12/58
[2012/36]
CPC:
H04W4/02 (EP); H04W4/029 (US); H04L51/222 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US); H04L67/306 (EP,US); H04M3/42008 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US); G08B2001/085 (EP,US); H04L51/214 (EP,US);
H04L51/52 (EP,US); H04M2207/18 (EP,US); H04M2242/14 (EP,US);
H04M2242/30 (EP,US); H04M3/42068 (EP,US); H04M3/4211 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2011/08]H04W4/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT [2011/08]
TitleGerman:System zum Vergleichen von Mobilfunkteilnehmerprofilen[2011/08]
English:Mobile communications subscriber profile matching system[2011/08]
French:Système d'appariement de profils pour abonnés à un réseau mobile de communications[2011/08]
Examination procedure02.10.2012Examination requested  [2012/46]
04.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2018
14.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/14]
24.11.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/14]
10.12.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00955618.4  / EP1212910
EP04100550.5  / EP1434459
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000955618) is  28.08.2003
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
19.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
19.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
19.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
19.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
19.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 18
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 19
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0795991  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-12,16* column 1, line 3 - column 10, line 4 *;
 [Y]CA2241711  (MOVO MEDIA INC [US]) [Y] 1-12,16 * page 4, line 5 - page 20, line 8 *;
 [Y]DE29904686U  (MESZAROS ARPAD G DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 1-12,16 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - MARTIN KROPAT ET AL, "Mobile Dating", 19990401, (19990401), vol. 2, no. 3, page 122, XP007001828 [X] 1-12,16 * the whole document *
by applicantBE700119
 US5610972
 US5832381
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.