blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2287394

EP2287394 - Method for working polymeric and inorganic materials with plasma [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.11.2014
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universita' Degli Studi di Milano-Bicocca
P.zza dell'Ateneo Nuovo, 1
20126 Milano / IT
For all designated states
Innovhub - Stazioni Sperimentali per l'Industria
Via Meravigli 9b
20123 Milano / IT
[2013/01]
Former [2011/08]For all designated states
Universita' Degli Studi di Milano-Bicocca
P.zza dell'Ateneo Nuovo, 1
20126 Milano / IT
For all designated states
Stazione Sperimentale per la Seta
Via Giuseppe Colombo, 83
20133 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Riccardi, Claudia
Università degli Studi di Milano-Bicocca
Via Albino, 2
20147, Milano / IT
02 / Piselli, Moreno
Università Degli Studi di Milano-Bicocca
Via Marchionni, 31
20161, Milano / IT
03 / Addamo, Antonino, Raffaele
Università Degli Studi di Milano-Bicocca
Via Corriidoni, 22C
21054, Fagnano Olona / IT
04 / Massafra, Maria, Rosaria
Stazione Sperimentale per la Seta
Via Serraglio, 22
20031, Cesano Maderno / IT
05 / Marcandalli, Bruno
Stazione Sperimentale per la Seta
Via Magenta, 10
20069, Vaprio D'Adda / IT
 [2014/01]
Former [2011/08]01 / Riccardi, Claudia
Università degli Studi di Milano-Bicocca Via Albino, 2
20147, Milano / IT
02 / Piselli, Moreno
Università Degli Studi di Milano-Bicocca Via Marchionni, 31
20161, Milano / IT
03 / Addamo, Antonino, Raffaele
Università Degli Studi di Milano-Bicocca Via Corriidoni, 22C
21054, Fagnano Olona / IT
04 / Massafra, Maria, Rosaria
Stazione Sperimentale per la Seta Via Serraglio, 22
20031, Cesano Maderno / IT
05 / Marcandalli, Bruno
Stazione Sperimentale per la Seta Via Magenta, 10
20069, Vaprio D'Adda / IT
Representative(s)Acco, Stefania, et al
Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
[2011/08]
Application number, filing date10184545.125.07.2003
[2011/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2287394
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2287394
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2010
ClassificationIPC:D06M10/02, D06M14/18, D06B19/00, B05D7/24, C23C16/50, D06M10/04, D06M13/513
[2012/13]
CPC:
D06M10/04 (EP); D06B19/00 (EP); D06M10/025 (EP);
D06M13/513 (EP); D06M14/18 (EP); D06M2400/01 (EP);
D06P5/2011 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2011/08]D06M10/02, D06M14/18, D06B19/00, B05D7/24, C23C16/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verarbeitung polymerischer und anorganischer Materialien mit Plasma[2011/08]
English:Method for working polymeric and inorganic materials with plasma[2011/08]
French:Procédé pour le travail de matériaux polymères et inorganiques avec du plasma[2011/08]
Examination procedure10.08.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/38]
14.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2012Fee for grant paid
11.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03817632.7  / EP1649100
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030817632) is  09.05.2007
Opposition(s)02.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
26.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
26.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.07.2003
AT01.01.2014
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
TR01.01.2014
GR02.04.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE25.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU25.07.2003
AT01.01.2014
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
GR02.04.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE25.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/28]AT01.01.2014
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
GR02.04.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE25.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/25]AT01.01.2014
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE25.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/21]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE25.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/37]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE25.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/24]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
PT02.05.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
PT02.05.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/13]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
PT02.05.2014
LU25.07.2014
Former [2014/50]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/49]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/37]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
PT02.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US6103068  (MERTEN THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,14,16,18,19 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 8; example -; claim - *;
 [XI]WO9858117  (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al) [X] 1,12,16 * page 5, line 14 - line 27 * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 29; claim - * [I] 1-20;
 [XI]EP0985741  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,12,16,19 * the whole document * [I] 1-20
by applicantWO2002IT00335
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.