Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2368553

EP2368553 - Pharmaceutical formulations containing methylnaltrexone [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/39]PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS CONTAINING METHYLNALTREXONE
[2011/41]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
[2015/01]
Former [2011/39]For all designated states
Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sanghvi, Suketu
1 Hancock Drive
Kendall Park, NJ 08824 / US
02 / Boyd, Thomas
279 River Road
Grandview, NJ 10960 / US
 [2011/39]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]Russell, Tim
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2011/39]Hutter, Anton , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London
EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date10184575.808.04.2004
[2011/39]
Priority number, dateUS20030461611P08.04.2003         Original published format: US 461611 P
[2011/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2368553
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2368553
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/485, A61K31/195, A61K31/047, A61K9/19, A61K45/06, A61K47/12, A61K47/18
[2011/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/39]
Extension statesAL28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
MK28.03.2012
TitleGerman:Pharmazeutische Formulierungen enthaltend Methylnaltrexon[2011/41]
English:Pharmaceutical formulations containing methylnaltrexone[2011/41]
French:Formulations pharmaceutiques contenant de la methylnaltrexone[2011/41]
Former [2011/39]PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN ENTHALTEND METHYLNALTREXON
Former [2011/39]PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS CONTAINING METHYLNALTREXONE
Former [2011/39]FORMULATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DE LA METHYLNALTREXONE
Examination procedure28.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/19]
05.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2014Fee for grant paid
21.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04759349.6  / EP1615646
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040759349) is  25.03.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.09.2015   
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Str. 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  30.09.2015   
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 [2015/45]
02.12.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
11.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1609/17
21.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
02.04.2013Request for further processing filed
02.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.04.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2003022909  (MOSS JONATHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0059] , [0 71] , [0 72] , [0 85] * * examples 1,3,4 *;
 [YD]US5972954  (FOSS JOSEPH F [US], et al) [YD] 1-11 * column 4, line 49 - line 51 * * example 1 * * claim 4 *;
 [YD]US5866154  (BAHAL SURENDRA MOHAN [US], et al) [YD] 1-11 * column 2, line 44 - line 51 * * claims 1-4 * * example 1 * * figures 5,6 *;
 [AP]WO03032990  (SHEARWATER CORP [US], et al) [AP] 1-11 * page 2, line 21 - line 23 * * claim 5 * * page 24, line 1 - line 8 * * page 25, line 32 - page 26, line 1 * * page 26, line 2 - line 4 *
by applicantUS4176186
 US4719215
 US4861781
 US5102887
 US5972954
 US6274591
 US5866154
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY
    - H.S. SAWHNEY; C.P. PATHAK; J.A. HUBELL, MACROMOLECULES, (1993), vol. 26, pages 581 - 587