Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2314629

EP2314629 - Recombinant production of mixtures of antibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.07.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merus N.V.
Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
[2017/06]
Former [2016/27]For all designated states
Merus N.V.
Padualaan 8, postvak 133
3584 CH Utrecht / NL
Former [2012/09]For all designated states
Merus B.V.
Padualaan 8 (postvak 133)
3584 CH Utrecht / NL
Former [2011/17]For all designated states
Merus B.V.
Uppsalalaan 8
3584 CT Utrecht / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Van Berkel, Patricius Hendrikus
Rodenrijseweg 315
2651 BS Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL
02 / Brus, Ronald Hendrik Peter
Leidseweg 193
2253 AD Voorschoten / NL
03 / Bout, Abraham
Van Swaanswijckstraat 38
2751 XL Moerkapelle / NL
04 / Logtenberg, Ton
Jachtrustlaan 1
3985 MK Werkhoven / NL
 [2011/17]
Representative(s)Lahrtz, Fritz , et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Postfach 86 06 80
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/42]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2011/17]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date10186063.315.07.2003
[2011/17]
Priority number, dateUS20020397066P18.07.2002         Original published format: US 397066 P
EP2002007795318.07.2002         Original published format: EP 02077953
WO2003EP5020127.05.2003         Original published format: PCT/EP0350/201
[2011/17]
Previously filed application, dateWO2003EP0769015.07.2003
[2011/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2314629
Date:27.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2314629
Date:16.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/46, A61K39/00, C12P21/02, G01N33/50, C07K16/00, C07K16/10, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/32, A61K39/395, C12P21/00
[2017/29]
Former International [2013/18]C07K16/46, A61K39/00, C12P21/02, G01N33/50, C07K16/00, C07K16/10, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/32
Former International [2011/17]C07K16/46, A61K39/00, C12P21/02, G01N33/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/17]
TitleGerman:Rekombinante Herstellung von Mischungen aus Aantikörpern[2017/29]
English:Recombinant production of mixtures of antibodies[2011/17]
French:Production recombinante de mélanges d'anticorps[2011/17]
Former [2011/17]Rekombinante Herstellung von Mischungen aus Aantikörpern
Examination procedure01.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/17]
17.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2013Fee for grant paid
06.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03764997.7  / EP1523496
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030764997) is  20.07.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.07.2014  24.12.2018  WITHDRAWN
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2019/07]
Opponent(s)01  15.07.2014  24.12.2018  WITHDRAWN
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2017/31]
Opponent(s)01  15.07.2014  18.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2014/34]
Opponent(s)01  15.07.2014   
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
Bentham, Andrew
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
22.08.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.02.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
27.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
26.09.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.10.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.06.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.06.2017
29.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
25.07.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition02.10.2017Appeal received No.  T2219/17
04.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
29.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2219/17
01.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
05.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
01.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
01.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
01.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
15.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
16.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
15.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.07.2003
AT16.10.2013
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
TR16.10.2013
GR17.01.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU15.07.2003
AT16.10.2013
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
GR17.01.2014
Former [2016/28]AT16.10.2013
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
GR17.01.2014
Former [2016/25]AT16.10.2013
BG16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
Former [2015/14]AT16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SI16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
Former [2014/37]AT16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
CZ16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
RO16.10.2013
SK16.10.2013
Former [2014/36]AT16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
EE16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
Former [2014/26]AT16.10.2013
CY16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
Former [2014/24]AT16.10.2013
FI16.10.2013
Former [2014/22]FI16.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO9850431  (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 9,13 * the whole document * [I] 16-23;
 [XI]  - MERCHANT A M ET AL, "An efficient route to human bispecific IgG", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUB. CO, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199807), vol. 16, no. 7, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 677 - 681, XP002141015 [X] 9,13 * the whole document * [I] 16-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0798-677
 [A]  - LENZ H ET AL, "EXPRESSION OF HETEROBISPECIFIC ANTIBODIES BY GENES TRANSFECTED INTO PRODUCER HYBRIDOMA CELLS", GENE, ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19900315), vol. 87, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 213 - 218, XP000114191 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(90)90304-A
 [A]  - VAUGHAN T J ET AL, "HUMAN ANTIBODIES WITH SUB-NANOMOLAR AFFINITIES ISOLATED FROM A LARGE NON-IMMUNIZED PHAGE DISPLAY LIBRARY", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (19960301), vol. 14, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 309 - 314, XP000196144 [A] 1-23 * table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0396-309
by applicantEP0120694
 EP0314161
 EP0481790
 US4816567
 WO0063403
 WO0119394
 WO9520401
 US5789208
 US6335163
 WO9850431
 WO03004704
 EP0523949
 US4801687
 US5151504
 US4399216
 US6180357
 WO9964582
 WO9936569
 US6265150
 WO0148485
 WO0218948
 EP0724639
 WO0132901
 US5733779
 WO9841645
 WO9108216
 WO9517085
 US6291740
 WO9517500
 WO9839416
 WO0164929
 WO9742313
 US5888789
 US6080560
 WO9747739
 WO9815627
 US5772997
 US5783186
 WO9627011
 EP0402029
 EP0445625
 WO9815833
    - "In vitro selection and evolution of proteins", A. PLOCKTHUN ET AL., Adv. Prot. Chem., ACADEMIC PRESS, (2001), vol. 55, pages 367 - 403
    - "In vitro selection and evolution of protein-ligand interactions by ribosome display", C. SCHAFFITZEL ET AL., Protein-Protein Interactions. A Molecular Cloning Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001), pages 535 - 567
    - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC.
    - JONES H, "Plant Gene Transfer And Expression Protocols", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 49
    - APPEL RD; BAIROCH A; HOCHSTRASSER DF., "A new generation of information retrieval tools for biologists: the example of the ExPASy WWW server", TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (1994), vol. 19, pages 258 - 260
    - BENDIG MM., "The production of foreign proteins in mammalian cells", GENET ENG, (1988), vol. 7, pages 91 - 127
    - BOEL E; VERLAAN S; POPPELIER MJ; WESTERDAAL NA; VAN STRIJP JA; LOGTENBERG T, "Functional human monoclonal antibodies of all isotypes constructed from phage display library-derived single-chain Fv antibody fragments", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2000), vol. 239, pages 153 - 166
    - BRINK MF; BISHOP MD; PIEPER FR., "Developing efficient strategies for the generation of transgenic cattle which produce biopharmaceuticals in milk", THERIOGENOLOGY, (2000), vol. 53, pages 139 - 148
    - CAMPBELL KH; MCWHIR J; RITCHIE WA; WILMUT I., "Sheep cloned by nuclear transfer from a cultured cell line", NATURE, (1996), vol. 380, pages 64 - 66
    - CASELLAS R; SHIH TA; KLEINEWIETFELT M; RAKONIAC J; NEMAZEE D; RAJEWSKI K; NUSSENZWEIG MC, "Contribution of receptor editing to the antibody repertoire", SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 291, pages 1541 - 1544
    - COCKETT MI; BEBBINGTON CR; YARRANTON GT, "igh level expression of tissue inhibitor of metalloproteinases in Chinese hamster ovary cells using glutamate synthetase gene amplification", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, pages 662 - 667
    - DE KRUIF J; TERSTAPPEN L; BOEL E; LOGTENBERG T, "Rapid selection of cell subpopulation-specific human monoclonal antibodies from a synthetic phage antibody library", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1995), vol. 92, page 3938
    - DE KRUIF J; BOEL E; LOGTENBERG T, "Selection and application of human single chain Fv antibody fragments from a semi-synthetic phage antibody display library with designed CDR3 regions", J MOL BIOL, (1995), vol. 248, page 97
    - DINNYES A; DE SOUSA P; KING T; WILMUT I., "Somatic cell nuclear transfer: recent progress and challenges", CLONING STEM CELLS, (2002), vol. 4, pages 81 - 90
    - FLAVELL DJ; NOSS A; PULFORD KA; LING N; FLAVELL SU., "Systemic therapy with 3BIT, a triple combination cocktail of anti-CD19, -CD22, and -CD38-saporin immunotoxins, is curative of human B-cell lymphoma in severe combined immunodeficient mice", CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, pages 4824 - 4829
    - FISHWILD DM; O'DONNELL SL; BENGOECHEA T; HUDSON DV; HARDING F; BERNHARD SL; JONES D; KAY RM; HIGGINS KM; SCHRAMM SR, "High-avidity human IgG kappa monoclonal antibodies from a novel strain of minilocus transgenic mice", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 845 - 51
    - GARNICK RL., "Peptide mapping for detecting variants in protein products", DEVELOP. BIOL. STANDARD, (1992), vol. 76, pages 117 - 130
    - GELPI E., "Biomedical and biochemical applications of liquid chromatography-mass spectrometry", J. CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (1995), vol. 703, pages 59 - 80
    - GHETIE M-A; PODAR EM; ILGEN A; GORDON BE; UHR JW; VITETTA, ES, "Homodimerization of tumor-reactive monoclonal antibodies markedly increases their ability to induce growth arrest or apoptosis of tumor cells", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 7509 - 7514
    - GIDDINGS G; ALLISON G; BROOKS D; CARTER A, "Transgenic plants as factories for biopharmaceuticals", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 18, pages 1151 - 1155
    - GORMAN C; BULLOCK C., "Site-specific gene targeting for gene expression in eukaryotes", CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (2000), vol. 11, pages 455 - 460
    - HIATT A; CAFFERKEY R; BOWDISH K, "Production of antibodies in transgenic plants", NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 76 - 78
    - HULS, G. A.; HEIJNEN, I. A.; CUOMO, M. E.; KONINGSBERGER, J. C.; WIEGMAN, L.; BOEL, E.; VAN DER VUURST DE VRIES, A. R.; LOYSON, S., "A recombinant, fully human monoclonal antibody with antitumor activity constructed from phage-displayed antibody fragments", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1999), vol. 17, pages 276 - 281
    - JESPERS LS; ROBERTS A; MAHLER SM; WINTER G; HOOGENBOOM HR, "Guiding the selection of human antibodies from phage display repertoires to a single epitope of an antigen", BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 12, pages 899 - 903
    - JONES, D.; KROOS, N.; ANEMA, R.; VAN MONTFORT, B.; VOOYS, A.; VAN DER KRAATS, S.; VAN DER HELM, E.; SMITS, S.; SCHOUTEN, J.; BROUW, "High-level expression of recombinant IgG in the human cell line PER.C6TM", BIOTECHNOL PROG., (2003), vol. 19, pages 163 - 168
    - KIM SJ; KIM NS; RYU CJ; HONG HJ; LEE GM, "Characterization of chimeric antibody producing CHO cells in the course of dihydrofolate reductase-mediated gene amplification and their stability in the absence of selective pressure", BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (1998), vol. 58, pages 73 - 84
    - KOHLER G; MILLSTEIN C., "Continuous cultures of fused cells secreting antibody of predefined specificity", NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497
    - KOOPMAN G; REUTELINGSPERGER CP; KUIJTEN GA; KEEHNEN RM; PALS ST; VAN OERS MH, "Annexin V for flow cytometric detection of phosphatidylserine expression on B cells undergoing apoptosis", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 84, pages 1415 - 1420
    - LARRICK JW; THOMAS DW, "Producing proteins in transgenic plants and animals", CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 12, pages 411 - 418
    - MASSENGALE WT; MCBURNEY E; GURTLER J., "CD20-negative relapse of cutaneous B-cell lymphoma after anti-CD20 monoclonal antibody therapy", J. AM. ACAD. DERMATOL., (2002), vol. 46, pages 441 - 443
    - MENDEZ MJ; GREEN LL; CORVALAN JR; JIA XC; MAYNARD-CURRIE CE; YANG XD; GALLO ML; LOUIE DM; LEE DV; ERICKSON KL, "Functional transplant of megabase human immunoglobulin loci recapitulates human antibody response in mice", NAT GENET., (1997), vol. 15, pages 146 - 56
    - MERCHANT AM; ZHU Z; YUAN JQ; GODDARD A; ADAMS CW; PRESTA LG; CARTER P., "An efficient route to human bispecific IgG", NAT. BIOTECH., (1998), vol. 16, pages 677 - 681
    - NEMAZEE D., "Receptor editing in B cells", ADV. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 74, pages 89 - 126
    - NISSIM A; HOOGENBOOM HR; TOMLINSON IM; FLYNN G; MIDGLEY C; LANE D; WINTER G., "Antibody fragments from a "single pot" phage display library as immunological reagents", EMBO J., (1994), vol. 13, pages 692 - 698
    - NOWAKOWSKI A; WANG C; POWERS DB; AMERSDORFER P; SMITH TJ; MONTGOMERY VA; SHERIDAN R; BLAKE R; SMITH LA; MARKS JD, "Potent neutralization of botulinum neurotoxin by recombinant oligoclonal antibody", PROC. NATL. ACAC. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 11346 - 11350
    - PATEL AK; BOYD PN, "An improved assay for antibody dependent cellular cytotoxicity based on time resolved fluorometry", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (1995), vol. 184, pages 29 - 38
    - PEETERS K; DE WILDE C; DE JAEGER G; ANGENON G; DEPICKER A., "Production of antibodies and antibody fragments in plants", VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2756 - 2761
    - POLLOCK DP; KUTZKO JP; BIRCK-WILSON E; WILLIAMS JL; ECHELARD Y; MEADE HM., "Transgenic milk as a method for the production of recombinant antibodies", J IMMUNOL METHODS., (1999), vol. 231, pages 147 - 157
    - RADIC MC; MASCELLI MA; SHAN H; WEIGERT M., "Ig H and L chain contributions to autoimmune specificities", J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 146, pages 176 - 182
    - SCHNIEKE AE; KIND AJ; RITCHIE WA; MYCOCK K; SCOTT AR; RITCHIE M; WILMUT I; COLMAN A; CAMPBELL KH., "Human factor IX transgenic sheep produced by transfer of nuclei from transfected fetal fibroblasts", SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, pages 2130 - 2133
    - SEGAL DM; WEINER GJ; WEINER LM., "Introduction: bispecific antibodies", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, pages 1 - 6
    - SHIELDS, RL; NAMENUK AK; HONG K; GLORIA MENG Y; RAE J; BIGGS J; XIE D; LAI J; STADLEN A; LI B, "High resolution mapping of the binding site on human IgGl for FcgRI, FcgRII, FcgRIII and FcRn and design of IgGl variants with improved binding to the FcgR", J BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 6604
    - SPIRIDON CI; GHETIE MA; UHR J; MARCHES R; LI JL; SHEN GL; VITETTA ES, "Tartgeting multiple her-2 epitopes with monoclonal antibodies results in improved antigrowth activity of a human breast cancer cell line in vitro and in vivo", CLIN. CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 8, pages 1720 - 1730
    - VAN DER VUURST DE VRIES A; LOGTENBERG T., "Dissecting the human peripheral B-cell compartment with phage display- derived antibodies", IMMUNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 98, pages 55 - 62
    - VAUGHAN TJ; WILLIAMS AJ; PRITCHARD K; OSBOURN JK; POPE AR; EARNSHAW JC; MCCAFFERTY J; HODITS RA; WILTON J; JOHNSON KS., "Human antibodies with sub-nanomolar affinities isolated from a large non-immunized phage display library", NAT. BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 14, pages 309 - 314
    - WILMUT I.; CLARK AJ., "Basic techniques for transgenesis", J REPROD FERTIL SUPPL, (1991), vol. 43, pages 265 - 275
    - WILMUT I; SCHNIEKE AE; MCWHIR J; KIND AJ; CAMPBELL KH, "Viable offspring derived from fetal and adult mammalian cells", NATURE, (1997), vol. 385, pages 810 - 813
    - WILSON TJ; KOLA I., "The LoxP/CRE system and genome modification", METHODS MOL BIOL., (2001), vol. 158, pages 83 - 94
    - YELVERTON E; NORTON S; OBIJESKI JF; GOEDDEL DV., "Rabies virus glycoprotein analogs: biosynthesis in Escherichia coli", SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 219, pages 614 - 620
    - YOO EM; COLOMA MJ; TRINH KR; NGUYEN TQ; VUONG LU; MORRISON SL; CHINTALACHARUVU KR, "Structural requirements for polymeric immunoglobulin assembly and association with J chain", J BIOL CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 33771 - 33777